California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB259 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/23/2019

                    Enrolled  August 23, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  August 22, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  August 15, 2019 Amended IN  Assembly  June 18, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  May 17, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  March 25, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 259Introduced by Senator NielsenFebruary 12, 2019 An act to add Section 13012.7 to the Penal Code, relating to crime statistics. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 259, Nielsen. Department of Justice: crime statistics reporting.Existing law requires the Department of Justice to annually present a report to the Governor containing the statewide criminal statistics of the preceding year. Existing law also requires specified local agencies, including chiefs of police and sheriffs, to report statistical data to the department at the time and in the manner the department prescribes.This bill would require that report, commencing with the report that includes data from 2022, to the extent the data is available, to include statistics on lewd or lascivious felonies, as defined, consistent with those reported for rape.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 13012.7 is added to the Penal Code, to read:13012.7. (a) The annual report published by the department pursuant to Section 13010, commencing with the report that includes data from 2022, shall, to the extent the data is available, include statistics on lewd or lascivious felonies consistent with those reported for rape, including the number of offenses reported and the rate per 100,000 population.(b) For purposes of this section, lewd or lascivious felonies means conduct prohibited by Sections 220, 266j, subdivisions (a) to (c), inclusive, of Section 288, and subdivision (a) of Section 288.5.

 Enrolled  August 23, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  August 22, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  August 15, 2019 Amended IN  Assembly  June 18, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  May 17, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  March 25, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 259Introduced by Senator NielsenFebruary 12, 2019 An act to add Section 13012.7 to the Penal Code, relating to crime statistics. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 259, Nielsen. Department of Justice: crime statistics reporting.Existing law requires the Department of Justice to annually present a report to the Governor containing the statewide criminal statistics of the preceding year. Existing law also requires specified local agencies, including chiefs of police and sheriffs, to report statistical data to the department at the time and in the manner the department prescribes.This bill would require that report, commencing with the report that includes data from 2022, to the extent the data is available, to include statistics on lewd or lascivious felonies, as defined, consistent with those reported for rape.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  August 23, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  August 22, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  August 15, 2019 Amended IN  Assembly  June 18, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  May 17, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  March 25, 2019

Enrolled  August 23, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  August 22, 2019
Passed IN  Assembly  August 15, 2019
Amended IN  Assembly  June 18, 2019
Amended IN  Senate  May 17, 2019
Amended IN  Senate  March 25, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Bill 

No. 259

Introduced by Senator NielsenFebruary 12, 2019

Introduced by Senator Nielsen
February 12, 2019

 An act to add Section 13012.7 to the Penal Code, relating to crime statistics. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SB 259, Nielsen. Department of Justice: crime statistics reporting.

Existing law requires the Department of Justice to annually present a report to the Governor containing the statewide criminal statistics of the preceding year. Existing law also requires specified local agencies, including chiefs of police and sheriffs, to report statistical data to the department at the time and in the manner the department prescribes.This bill would require that report, commencing with the report that includes data from 2022, to the extent the data is available, to include statistics on lewd or lascivious felonies, as defined, consistent with those reported for rape.

Existing law requires the Department of Justice to annually present a report to the Governor containing the statewide criminal statistics of the preceding year. Existing law also requires specified local agencies, including chiefs of police and sheriffs, to report statistical data to the department at the time and in the manner the department prescribes.

This bill would require that report, commencing with the report that includes data from 2022, to the extent the data is available, to include statistics on lewd or lascivious felonies, as defined, consistent with those reported for rape.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 13012.7 is added to the Penal Code, to read:13012.7. (a) The annual report published by the department pursuant to Section 13010, commencing with the report that includes data from 2022, shall, to the extent the data is available, include statistics on lewd or lascivious felonies consistent with those reported for rape, including the number of offenses reported and the rate per 100,000 population.(b) For purposes of this section, lewd or lascivious felonies means conduct prohibited by Sections 220, 266j, subdivisions (a) to (c), inclusive, of Section 288, and subdivision (a) of Section 288.5.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 13012.7 is added to the Penal Code, to read:13012.7. (a) The annual report published by the department pursuant to Section 13010, commencing with the report that includes data from 2022, shall, to the extent the data is available, include statistics on lewd or lascivious felonies consistent with those reported for rape, including the number of offenses reported and the rate per 100,000 population.(b) For purposes of this section, lewd or lascivious felonies means conduct prohibited by Sections 220, 266j, subdivisions (a) to (c), inclusive, of Section 288, and subdivision (a) of Section 288.5.

SECTION 1. Section 13012.7 is added to the Penal Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

13012.7. (a) The annual report published by the department pursuant to Section 13010, commencing with the report that includes data from 2022, shall, to the extent the data is available, include statistics on lewd or lascivious felonies consistent with those reported for rape, including the number of offenses reported and the rate per 100,000 population.(b) For purposes of this section, lewd or lascivious felonies means conduct prohibited by Sections 220, 266j, subdivisions (a) to (c), inclusive, of Section 288, and subdivision (a) of Section 288.5.

13012.7. (a) The annual report published by the department pursuant to Section 13010, commencing with the report that includes data from 2022, shall, to the extent the data is available, include statistics on lewd or lascivious felonies consistent with those reported for rape, including the number of offenses reported and the rate per 100,000 population.(b) For purposes of this section, lewd or lascivious felonies means conduct prohibited by Sections 220, 266j, subdivisions (a) to (c), inclusive, of Section 288, and subdivision (a) of Section 288.5.

13012.7. (a) The annual report published by the department pursuant to Section 13010, commencing with the report that includes data from 2022, shall, to the extent the data is available, include statistics on lewd or lascivious felonies consistent with those reported for rape, including the number of offenses reported and the rate per 100,000 population.(b) For purposes of this section, lewd or lascivious felonies means conduct prohibited by Sections 220, 266j, subdivisions (a) to (c), inclusive, of Section 288, and subdivision (a) of Section 288.5.



13012.7. (a) The annual report published by the department pursuant to Section 13010, commencing with the report that includes data from 2022, shall, to the extent the data is available, include statistics on lewd or lascivious felonies consistent with those reported for rape, including the number of offenses reported and the rate per 100,000 population.

(b) For purposes of this section, lewd or lascivious felonies means conduct prohibited by Sections 220, 266j, subdivisions (a) to (c), inclusive, of Section 288, and subdivision (a) of Section 288.5.