California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB308 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/26/2019

                    Enrolled  June 26, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  April 04, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  June 24, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  March 21, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 308Introduced by Senator JonesFebruary 15, 2019 An act to amend Section 45 of the Probate Code, relating to estates and trusts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 308, Jones. Estates and trusts: instrument.Existing law defines instrument for purposes of the Probate Code to mean a will, trust, deed, or other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property. Existing law, the Trust Law, regulates the creation, modification, and termination of trusts and the administration of trusts by trustees on behalf of beneficiaries.This bill would revise the definition of instrument under the Probate Code to mean a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 45 of the Probate Code is amended to read:45. Instrument means a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.

 Enrolled  June 26, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  April 04, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  June 24, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  March 21, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 308Introduced by Senator JonesFebruary 15, 2019 An act to amend Section 45 of the Probate Code, relating to estates and trusts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 308, Jones. Estates and trusts: instrument.Existing law defines instrument for purposes of the Probate Code to mean a will, trust, deed, or other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property. Existing law, the Trust Law, regulates the creation, modification, and termination of trusts and the administration of trusts by trustees on behalf of beneficiaries.This bill would revise the definition of instrument under the Probate Code to mean a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  June 26, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  April 04, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  June 24, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  March 21, 2019

Enrolled  June 26, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  April 04, 2019
Passed IN  Assembly  June 24, 2019
Amended IN  Senate  March 21, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Bill No. 308

Introduced by Senator JonesFebruary 15, 2019

Introduced by Senator Jones
February 15, 2019

 An act to amend Section 45 of the Probate Code, relating to estates and trusts. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SB 308, Jones. Estates and trusts: instrument.

Existing law defines instrument for purposes of the Probate Code to mean a will, trust, deed, or other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property. Existing law, the Trust Law, regulates the creation, modification, and termination of trusts and the administration of trusts by trustees on behalf of beneficiaries.This bill would revise the definition of instrument under the Probate Code to mean a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.

Existing law defines instrument for purposes of the Probate Code to mean a will, trust, deed, or other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property. Existing law, the Trust Law, regulates the creation, modification, and termination of trusts and the administration of trusts by trustees on behalf of beneficiaries.

This bill would revise the definition of instrument under the Probate Code to mean a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 45 of the Probate Code is amended to read:45. Instrument means a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 45 of the Probate Code is amended to read:45. Instrument means a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.

SECTION 1. Section 45 of the Probate Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

45. Instrument means a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.

45. Instrument means a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.

45. Instrument means a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.



45. Instrument means a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.