California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB577 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/13/2019

                    Enrolled  September 13, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 09, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  September 11, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  March 27, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 577Introduced by Senator HuesoFebruary 22, 2019 An act to amend Section 15570.28 of the Government Code, relating to state government.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 577, Hueso. California Department of Tax and Fee Administration: State Board of Equalization: administrative and personnel services.Existing law establishes, in the Government Operations Agency, the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration (department) and transfers to the department the duty to administer various taxes and fees that had previously been administered by the State Board of Equalization, except for those duties, powers, and responsibilities imposed or conferred upon the board by the California Constitution, as specified. Existing law, for these purposes, also transfers to the department the boards employees serving in civil service, the rights and property of the board, and the boards funding, as provided, and requires the department to provide the board with administrative and personnel services.This bill would require board personnel to provide the department with information and materials, in the form and manner as requested by the department, that are necessary for the department to provide administrative and personnel services.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 15570.28 of the Government Code is amended to read:15570.28. (a) The department shall provide the board with administrative and personnel services.(b) Board personnel shall provide the department with information and materials, in the form and manner as requested by the department, that are necessary for the department to provide the services described in subdivision (a).

 Enrolled  September 13, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 09, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  September 11, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  March 27, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 577Introduced by Senator HuesoFebruary 22, 2019 An act to amend Section 15570.28 of the Government Code, relating to state government.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 577, Hueso. California Department of Tax and Fee Administration: State Board of Equalization: administrative and personnel services.Existing law establishes, in the Government Operations Agency, the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration (department) and transfers to the department the duty to administer various taxes and fees that had previously been administered by the State Board of Equalization, except for those duties, powers, and responsibilities imposed or conferred upon the board by the California Constitution, as specified. Existing law, for these purposes, also transfers to the department the boards employees serving in civil service, the rights and property of the board, and the boards funding, as provided, and requires the department to provide the board with administrative and personnel services.This bill would require board personnel to provide the department with information and materials, in the form and manner as requested by the department, that are necessary for the department to provide administrative and personnel services.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  September 13, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 09, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  September 11, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  March 27, 2019

Enrolled  September 13, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  May 09, 2019
Passed IN  Assembly  September 11, 2019
Amended IN  Senate  March 27, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Bill 

No. 577

Introduced by Senator HuesoFebruary 22, 2019

Introduced by Senator Hueso
February 22, 2019

 An act to amend Section 15570.28 of the Government Code, relating to state government.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SB 577, Hueso. California Department of Tax and Fee Administration: State Board of Equalization: administrative and personnel services.

Existing law establishes, in the Government Operations Agency, the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration (department) and transfers to the department the duty to administer various taxes and fees that had previously been administered by the State Board of Equalization, except for those duties, powers, and responsibilities imposed or conferred upon the board by the California Constitution, as specified. Existing law, for these purposes, also transfers to the department the boards employees serving in civil service, the rights and property of the board, and the boards funding, as provided, and requires the department to provide the board with administrative and personnel services.This bill would require board personnel to provide the department with information and materials, in the form and manner as requested by the department, that are necessary for the department to provide administrative and personnel services.

Existing law establishes, in the Government Operations Agency, the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration (department) and transfers to the department the duty to administer various taxes and fees that had previously been administered by the State Board of Equalization, except for those duties, powers, and responsibilities imposed or conferred upon the board by the California Constitution, as specified. Existing law, for these purposes, also transfers to the department the boards employees serving in civil service, the rights and property of the board, and the boards funding, as provided, and requires the department to provide the board with administrative and personnel services.

This bill would require board personnel to provide the department with information and materials, in the form and manner as requested by the department, that are necessary for the department to provide administrative and personnel services.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 15570.28 of the Government Code is amended to read:15570.28. (a) The department shall provide the board with administrative and personnel services.(b) Board personnel shall provide the department with information and materials, in the form and manner as requested by the department, that are necessary for the department to provide the services described in subdivision (a).

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 15570.28 of the Government Code is amended to read:15570.28. (a) The department shall provide the board with administrative and personnel services.(b) Board personnel shall provide the department with information and materials, in the form and manner as requested by the department, that are necessary for the department to provide the services described in subdivision (a).

SECTION 1. Section 15570.28 of the Government Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

15570.28. (a) The department shall provide the board with administrative and personnel services.(b) Board personnel shall provide the department with information and materials, in the form and manner as requested by the department, that are necessary for the department to provide the services described in subdivision (a).

15570.28. (a) The department shall provide the board with administrative and personnel services.(b) Board personnel shall provide the department with information and materials, in the form and manner as requested by the department, that are necessary for the department to provide the services described in subdivision (a).

15570.28. (a) The department shall provide the board with administrative and personnel services.(b) Board personnel shall provide the department with information and materials, in the form and manner as requested by the department, that are necessary for the department to provide the services described in subdivision (a).



15570.28. (a) The department shall provide the board with administrative and personnel services.

(b) Board personnel shall provide the department with information and materials, in the form and manner as requested by the department, that are necessary for the department to provide the services described in subdivision (a).