California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR35 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/20/2019

                    Enrolled  May 20, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 06, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  May 16, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 35Introduced by Senator Rubio(Coauthor: Assembly Member Quirk)March 26, 2019 Relative to State Scientist Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 35, Rubio. State Scientist Day.This measure would recognize May 8, 2019, as the 31st Annual State Scientist Day and would declare that this day shall be a tribute to the dedication and professionalism of the state scientists who work on behalf of all the residents of California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The state employs nearly 3,000 professional scientists in over 30 state departments working in more than 81 scientific classifications; andWHEREAS, State scientists hold graduate degrees in virtually every scientific discipline, including biology, nematology, virology, seismology, epidemiology, toxicology, and many others; andWHEREAS, State scientists are required to make critical decisions every day based on rigorous scientific fact-finding, and these decisions ultimately impact the lives and property of all Californians; andWHEREAS, State scientists perform important work in the areas of infectious disease prevention, oil spill prevention and cleanup, public health drinking water monitoring, the protection of agricultural crops, brownfields mitigation, chemical and radiological disaster response, and much more; andWHEREAS, State scientists are represented by the California Association of Professional Scientists (CAPS), which is dedicated to professionalism, independence, and responsible advocacy; andWHEREAS, CAPS is featuring its members in a statewide media campaign with the slogan Science Matters to educate the public and policymakers about the important work state scientists perform to protect the public from life-threatening diseases, safeguard our wildlife and abundant natural resources, and protect our air and water from toxic waste and pollution; andWHEREAS, CAPS cosponsors the Sacramento Regional STEM Fair, one of Californias 14 regional science and engineering fairs, serving hundreds of middle and high schools in 12 California counties; andWHEREAS, State scientists host an annual State Scientist Day at the State Capitol to increase public awareness and recognition of the significant contributions made by scientists working in state government while entertaining and educating over 3,500 elementary school students with fun, hands-on science exhibits; andWHEREAS, State Scientist Day has sparked an interest in science for thousands of California schoolchildren, legislators, state employees, and members of the public who attend the special event; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Senate recognizes May 8, 2019, as the 31st Annual State Scientist Day and that this day shall be a tribute to the dedication and professionalism of the state scientists who work on behalf of all the residents of California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  May 20, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 06, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  May 16, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 35Introduced by Senator Rubio(Coauthor: Assembly Member Quirk)March 26, 2019 Relative to State Scientist Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 35, Rubio. State Scientist Day.This measure would recognize May 8, 2019, as the 31st Annual State Scientist Day and would declare that this day shall be a tribute to the dedication and professionalism of the state scientists who work on behalf of all the residents of California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  May 20, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 06, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  May 16, 2019

Enrolled  May 20, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  May 06, 2019
Passed IN  Assembly  May 16, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 35

Introduced by Senator Rubio(Coauthor: Assembly Member Quirk)March 26, 2019

Introduced by Senator Rubio(Coauthor: Assembly Member Quirk)
March 26, 2019

 Relative to State Scientist Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 35, Rubio. State Scientist Day.

This measure would recognize May 8, 2019, as the 31st Annual State Scientist Day and would declare that this day shall be a tribute to the dedication and professionalism of the state scientists who work on behalf of all the residents of California.

This measure would recognize May 8, 2019, as the 31st Annual State Scientist Day and would declare that this day shall be a tribute to the dedication and professionalism of the state scientists who work on behalf of all the residents of California.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The state employs nearly 3,000 professional scientists in over 30 state departments working in more than 81 scientific classifications; and

WHEREAS, State scientists hold graduate degrees in virtually every scientific discipline, including biology, nematology, virology, seismology, epidemiology, toxicology, and many others; and

WHEREAS, State scientists are required to make critical decisions every day based on rigorous scientific fact-finding, and these decisions ultimately impact the lives and property of all Californians; and

WHEREAS, State scientists perform important work in the areas of infectious disease prevention, oil spill prevention and cleanup, public health drinking water monitoring, the protection of agricultural crops, brownfields mitigation, chemical and radiological disaster response, and much more; and

WHEREAS, State scientists are represented by the California Association of Professional Scientists (CAPS), which is dedicated to professionalism, independence, and responsible advocacy; and

WHEREAS, CAPS is featuring its members in a statewide media campaign with the slogan Science Matters to educate the public and policymakers about the important work state scientists perform to protect the public from life-threatening diseases, safeguard our wildlife and abundant natural resources, and protect our air and water from toxic waste and pollution; and

WHEREAS, CAPS cosponsors the Sacramento Regional STEM Fair, one of Californias 14 regional science and engineering fairs, serving hundreds of middle and high schools in 12 California counties; and

WHEREAS, State scientists host an annual State Scientist Day at the State Capitol to increase public awareness and recognition of the significant contributions made by scientists working in state government while entertaining and educating over 3,500 elementary school students with fun, hands-on science exhibits; and

WHEREAS, State Scientist Day has sparked an interest in science for thousands of California schoolchildren, legislators, state employees, and members of the public who attend the special event; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Senate recognizes May 8, 2019, as the 31st Annual State Scientist Day and that this day shall be a tribute to the dedication and professionalism of the state scientists who work on behalf of all the residents of California; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.