California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR47 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/01/2019

                    Enrolled  July 01, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 16, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  June 27, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 47Introduced by Senators Rubio and AtkinsMay 07, 2019 Relative to Small Business Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 47, Rubio. California Small Business Month.This measure would declare May as Small Business Month and express the Legislatures support of the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, California is home to the most innovative and competitive firms in the world, placing the state consistently among the top 10 economies; andWHEREAS, Small businesses embody the entrepreneurial spirit that has driven the economy of our state where over one-half of our private sector workforce is employed by small businesses; andWHEREAS, In 2018, there were over 3,900,000 small businesses in this state, representing an overwhelming share of Californias workforce by employing more than 7,000,000 people; andWHEREAS, The 70,350 small firms that exported goods from California generated 43 percent of the states $152 billion in total exports; andWHEREAS, On a national basis, the 30,000,000 small businesses are responsible for creating nearly two out of three new jobs; andWHEREAS, Small businesses are critical to the economic well-being of this state by creating new businesses and employment opportunities and by bringing new and innovative services and products to the marketplace; andWHEREAS, Within the small business community, a growing number of these companies are being started and owned by women, people of color, and immigrants. In 2018, it was estimated that 1,600,000 small businesses were minority-owned; and WHEREAS, The Governor has reaffirmed our commitment to Californias small businesses to thrive and prosper and that supporting small-scale private sector job creators is among our most promising strategies to enhance Californias human capital, expand job opportunities, and increase our competitive advantage in the global marketplace; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature in recognition of the importance of small businesses to the economy of this state declares May as California Small Business Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature adds its support to the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses. 

 Enrolled  July 01, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 16, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  June 27, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 47Introduced by Senators Rubio and AtkinsMay 07, 2019 Relative to Small Business Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 47, Rubio. California Small Business Month.This measure would declare May as Small Business Month and express the Legislatures support of the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  July 01, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 16, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  June 27, 2019

Enrolled  July 01, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  May 16, 2019
Passed IN  Assembly  June 27, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 47

Introduced by Senators Rubio and AtkinsMay 07, 2019

Introduced by Senators Rubio and Atkins
May 07, 2019

 Relative to Small Business Month. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 47, Rubio. California Small Business Month.

This measure would declare May as Small Business Month and express the Legislatures support of the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses.

This measure would declare May as Small Business Month and express the Legislatures support of the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, California is home to the most innovative and competitive firms in the world, placing the state consistently among the top 10 economies; and

WHEREAS, Small businesses embody the entrepreneurial spirit that has driven the economy of our state where over one-half of our private sector workforce is employed by small businesses; and

WHEREAS, In 2018, there were over 3,900,000 small businesses in this state, representing an overwhelming share of Californias workforce by employing more than 7,000,000 people; and

WHEREAS, The 70,350 small firms that exported goods from California generated 43 percent of the states $152 billion in total exports; and

WHEREAS, On a national basis, the 30,000,000 small businesses are responsible for creating nearly two out of three new jobs; and

WHEREAS, Small businesses are critical to the economic well-being of this state by creating new businesses and employment opportunities and by bringing new and innovative services and products to the marketplace; and

WHEREAS, Within the small business community, a growing number of these companies are being started and owned by women, people of color, and immigrants. In 2018, it was estimated that 1,600,000 small businesses were minority-owned; and 

WHEREAS, The Governor has reaffirmed our commitment to Californias small businesses to thrive and prosper and that supporting small-scale private sector job creators is among our most promising strategies to enhance Californias human capital, expand job opportunities, and increase our competitive advantage in the global marketplace; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature in recognition of the importance of small businesses to the economy of this state declares May as California Small Business Month; and be it further

Resolved, That the Legislature adds its support to the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses.