CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 57Introduced by Senator Hueso(Coauthor: Senator Beall)May 29, 2019 Relative to the 50th Anniversary of the Special Olympics. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 57, as introduced, Hueso. 50th Anniversary of the Special Olympics.This measure would commemorate the 50th anniversary of the Special Olympics.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, In June of 1962, Eunice Kennedy Shriver selflessly and honorably started a summer camp for young people with intellectual disabilities in Washington, D.C.; andWHEREAS, This promising premise, after yielding much success, evolved and developed throughout the 1960s, culminating in the first Special Olympics World Games, held at Soldier Field in Chicago, Illinois, in July of 1968; andWHEREAS, On December 2, 1968, the status of Special Olympics was formalized when United States Senator Edward Kennedy held a conference to announce the formation of Special Olympics, Inc.; andWHEREAS, In December of 1971, Special Olympics experienced a triumphant development when the United States Olympic Committee granted the organization official approval as the only other entity permitted to use the name Olympics in the United States; andWHEREAS, By the mid-1980s, Special Olympics programs had attained a global presence, boasting programs in over 50 nations and all major continents; andWHEREAS, In 1986, Special Olympics once again cemented its universal recognition when the United Nations launched the International Year of Special Olympics, commending the organization for uniting the world; andWHEREAS, On December 17, 1998, President Bill Clinton and then First Lady Hillary Rodham Clinton hosted A Very Special Christmas from Washington, D.C., establishing the first time that the White House hosted a Special Olympics gala; andWHEREAS, On October 30, 2004, President George W. Bush signed the Special Olympics Sport and Empowerment Act of 2004 (Public Law 108-406), giving $15,000,000 every year for the next five years to Special Olympics programs; andWHEREAS, On October 2, 2007, Shanghai, China, hosted the 12th summer Special Olympics World Games, drawing over 7,500 athletes from 164 countries; andWHEREAS, In June of 2010, the first Special Olympics Global Congress was held in Marrakesh, Morocco; andWHEREAS, In March of 2012, Special Olympics international influence hit a new record, with over 4,000,000 athletes participating in programs across the globe; and WHEREAS, In July of 2014, President Barack Obama and First Lady Michelle Obama hosted Celebration for Special Olympics and a Unified Generation at the White House, with some of the worlds leading business leaders, sports legends, social activists, and entertainers in attendance; andWHEREAS, In July of 2018, Special Olympics proudly celebrated its 50th anniversary; andWHEREAS, By 2019, Special Olympics has heavily developed and streamlined instrumental initiatives designed to impact everyday students in California, including the Special Olympics Unified Champion Schools Program, the Healthy Athletes Program, and the Community Sports Program; andWHEREAS, Throughout the recent years, these programs have proven successful at creating learning environments which are inclusive for all; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature commemorates the 50th anniversary of the Special Olympics; and be it furtherResolved, That Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 57Introduced by Senator Hueso(Coauthor: Senator Beall)May 29, 2019 Relative to the 50th Anniversary of the Special Olympics. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 57, as introduced, Hueso. 50th Anniversary of the Special Olympics.This measure would commemorate the 50th anniversary of the Special Olympics.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 57 Introduced by Senator Hueso(Coauthor: Senator Beall)May 29, 2019 Introduced by Senator Hueso(Coauthor: Senator Beall) May 29, 2019 Relative to the 50th Anniversary of the Special Olympics. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 57, as introduced, Hueso. 50th Anniversary of the Special Olympics. This measure would commemorate the 50th anniversary of the Special Olympics. This measure would commemorate the 50th anniversary of the Special Olympics. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text WHEREAS, In June of 1962, Eunice Kennedy Shriver selflessly and honorably started a summer camp for young people with intellectual disabilities in Washington, D.C.; and WHEREAS, This promising premise, after yielding much success, evolved and developed throughout the 1960s, culminating in the first Special Olympics World Games, held at Soldier Field in Chicago, Illinois, in July of 1968; and WHEREAS, On December 2, 1968, the status of Special Olympics was formalized when United States Senator Edward Kennedy held a conference to announce the formation of Special Olympics, Inc.; and WHEREAS, In December of 1971, Special Olympics experienced a triumphant development when the United States Olympic Committee granted the organization official approval as the only other entity permitted to use the name Olympics in the United States; and WHEREAS, By the mid-1980s, Special Olympics programs had attained a global presence, boasting programs in over 50 nations and all major continents; and WHEREAS, In 1986, Special Olympics once again cemented its universal recognition when the United Nations launched the International Year of Special Olympics, commending the organization for uniting the world; and WHEREAS, On December 17, 1998, President Bill Clinton and then First Lady Hillary Rodham Clinton hosted A Very Special Christmas from Washington, D.C., establishing the first time that the White House hosted a Special Olympics gala; and WHEREAS, On October 30, 2004, President George W. Bush signed the Special Olympics Sport and Empowerment Act of 2004 (Public Law 108-406), giving $15,000,000 every year for the next five years to Special Olympics programs; and WHEREAS, On October 2, 2007, Shanghai, China, hosted the 12th summer Special Olympics World Games, drawing over 7,500 athletes from 164 countries; and WHEREAS, In June of 2010, the first Special Olympics Global Congress was held in Marrakesh, Morocco; and WHEREAS, In March of 2012, Special Olympics international influence hit a new record, with over 4,000,000 athletes participating in programs across the globe; and WHEREAS, In July of 2014, President Barack Obama and First Lady Michelle Obama hosted Celebration for Special Olympics and a Unified Generation at the White House, with some of the worlds leading business leaders, sports legends, social activists, and entertainers in attendance; and WHEREAS, In July of 2018, Special Olympics proudly celebrated its 50th anniversary; and WHEREAS, By 2019, Special Olympics has heavily developed and streamlined instrumental initiatives designed to impact everyday students in California, including the Special Olympics Unified Champion Schools Program, the Healthy Athletes Program, and the Community Sports Program; and WHEREAS, Throughout the recent years, these programs have proven successful at creating learning environments which are inclusive for all; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature commemorates the 50th anniversary of the Special Olympics; and be it further Resolved, That Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.