California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR37 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/14/2019

                    Enrolled  May 14, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 13, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 37Introduced by Senator Rubio(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Chang, Hurtado, Leyva, and Skinner)April 30, 2019 Relative to the Day of the Teacher. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 37, Rubio. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, An educated citizenry serves as the very foundation of our democracy; andWHEREAS, Todays teachers mold the minds and train the workforce of the future; andWHEREAS, No other profession touches as many persons with such a lasting effect; andWHEREAS, Good teaching grows in value and pays dividends far beyond the classroom; andWHEREAS, California long ago recognized the immeasurable value of our teachers, and the second Wednesday in May has traditionally been recognized as the Day of the Teacher, a special observance that honors teachers and the teaching profession; andWHEREAS, The Day of the Teacher has been sponsored by the California Teachers Association and the Association of Mexican American Educators and was first recognized in 1982; andWHEREAS, California has patterned its celebration after the traditional El Dia del Maestro festivities observed in Mexico and other Latin American countries; andWHEREAS, The Day of the Teacher should be a day for school districts, parents, public officials, and the community to recognize the dedication and commitment of teachers who are educating our children; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the day of May 8, 2019, be proclaimed the Day of the Teacher; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature hereby urges all Californians to observe the Day of the Teacher by taking the time to remember and honor all individuals who give the gift of knowledge through teaching; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  May 14, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 13, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 37Introduced by Senator Rubio(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Chang, Hurtado, Leyva, and Skinner)April 30, 2019 Relative to the Day of the Teacher. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 37, Rubio. Digest Key

 Enrolled  May 14, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 13, 2019

Enrolled  May 14, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  May 13, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Resolution No. 37

Introduced by Senator Rubio(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Chang, Hurtado, Leyva, and Skinner)April 30, 2019

Introduced by Senator Rubio(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Chang, Hurtado, Leyva, and Skinner)
April 30, 2019

 Relative to the Day of the Teacher. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 37, Rubio. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, An educated citizenry serves as the very foundation of our democracy; and

WHEREAS, Todays teachers mold the minds and train the workforce of the future; and

WHEREAS, No other profession touches as many persons with such a lasting effect; and

WHEREAS, Good teaching grows in value and pays dividends far beyond the classroom; and

WHEREAS, California long ago recognized the immeasurable value of our teachers, and the second Wednesday in May has traditionally been recognized as the Day of the Teacher, a special observance that honors teachers and the teaching profession; and

WHEREAS, The Day of the Teacher has been sponsored by the California Teachers Association and the Association of Mexican American Educators and was first recognized in 1982; and

WHEREAS, California has patterned its celebration after the traditional El Dia del Maestro festivities observed in Mexico and other Latin American countries; and

WHEREAS, The Day of the Teacher should be a day for school districts, parents, public officials, and the community to recognize the dedication and commitment of teachers who are educating our children; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the day of May 8, 2019, be proclaimed the Day of the Teacher; and be it further

Resolved, That the Legislature hereby urges all Californians to observe the Day of the Teacher by taking the time to remember and honor all individuals who give the gift of knowledge through teaching; and be it further 

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.