California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR50 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/01/2019

                    Enrolled  July 01, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  June 27, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  June 25, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 50Introduced by Senator McGuire(Coauthors: Senators Archuleta, Roth, and Umberg)June 13, 2019Relative to Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 50, McGuire. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Throughout our nations history, the members of the United States Armed Forces have preserved our freedom, protected our security, and upheld our democratic values. From the battles of the American Revolution through the crucible of two world wars to the wars in Iraq and Afghanistan today, our soldiers in uniform have stood proudly in defense of the United States and the cause of liberty; andWHEREAS, The brave members of the United States Armed Forces, who proudly serve the United States, risk their lives to protect the freedom of the United States and deserve the investment of every reasonable resource to ensure their lasting physical, mental, and emotional well-being; andWHEREAS, The incidence of post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD) in members of the military is rising as soldiers return home after serving overseas in Iraq and Afghanistan, where they have been exposed to traumatic, life-threatening events; andWHEREAS, The United States Department of Veterans Affairs estimates that as many as 23 percent of veterans returning from combat in Iraq and Afghanistan have some form of PTSD; andWHEREAS, Symptoms of PTSD include nightmares, feeling numb, having difficulty experiencing love or closeness with others, feeling jittery or overly alert, having difficulty sleeping, experiencing anger or irritability, having difficulty concentrating, substance problems, and having feelings of despair or hopelessness; andWHEREAS, Although the United States Department of Defense and the Department of Veterans Affairs have made significant advances in the prevention, diagnosis, and treatment of PTSD and the symptoms of PTSD, many challenges remain; andWHEREAS, According to the National Institute of Mental Health, PTSD is an anxiety disorder that can develop after exposure to a terrifying event or ordeal in which grave physical harm occurred or was threatened; andWHEREAS, The Secretary of Veterans Affairs and the Secretary of Defense should continue to work to educate service members, veterans, the families of service members and veterans, and the public about the causes, symptoms, and treatment of PTSD; andWHEREAS, It is important to all citizens of the State of California that those who served our country in the military are aware of the symptoms of PTSD and are able to seek help; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate pause in its deliberations to proclaim June 27, 2019, as Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Awareness Day in the state, fully confident that such procedure mirrors our shared commitment to preserve, to ensure, and to yet effect that patrimony of freedom which is our American heritage; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  July 01, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  June 27, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  June 25, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 50Introduced by Senator McGuire(Coauthors: Senators Archuleta, Roth, and Umberg)June 13, 2019Relative to Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 50, McGuire. Digest Key

 Enrolled  July 01, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  June 27, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  June 25, 2019

Enrolled  July 01, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  June 27, 2019
Amended IN  Senate  June 25, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 50

Introduced by Senator McGuire(Coauthors: Senators Archuleta, Roth, and Umberg)June 13, 2019

Introduced by Senator McGuire(Coauthors: Senators Archuleta, Roth, and Umberg)
June 13, 2019

Relative to Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Awareness Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 50, McGuire. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Throughout our nations history, the members of the United States Armed Forces have preserved our freedom, protected our security, and upheld our democratic values. From the battles of the American Revolution through the crucible of two world wars to the wars in Iraq and Afghanistan today, our soldiers in uniform have stood proudly in defense of the United States and the cause of liberty; and

WHEREAS, The brave members of the United States Armed Forces, who proudly serve the United States, risk their lives to protect the freedom of the United States and deserve the investment of every reasonable resource to ensure their lasting physical, mental, and emotional well-being; and

WHEREAS, The incidence of post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD) in members of the military is rising as soldiers return home after serving overseas in Iraq and Afghanistan, where they have been exposed to traumatic, life-threatening events; and

WHEREAS, The United States Department of Veterans Affairs estimates that as many as 23 percent of veterans returning from combat in Iraq and Afghanistan have some form of PTSD; and

WHEREAS, Symptoms of PTSD include nightmares, feeling numb, having difficulty experiencing love or closeness with others, feeling jittery or overly alert, having difficulty sleeping, experiencing anger or irritability, having difficulty concentrating, substance problems, and having feelings of despair or hopelessness; and

WHEREAS, Although the United States Department of Defense and the Department of Veterans Affairs have made significant advances in the prevention, diagnosis, and treatment of PTSD and the symptoms of PTSD, many challenges remain; and

WHEREAS, According to the National Institute of Mental Health, PTSD is an anxiety disorder that can develop after exposure to a terrifying event or ordeal in which grave physical harm occurred or was threatened; and

WHEREAS, The Secretary of Veterans Affairs and the Secretary of Defense should continue to work to educate service members, veterans, the families of service members and veterans, and the public about the causes, symptoms, and treatment of PTSD; and

WHEREAS, It is important to all citizens of the State of California that those who served our country in the military are aware of the symptoms of PTSD and are able to seek help; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate pause in its deliberations to proclaim June 27, 2019, as Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Awareness Day in the state, fully confident that such procedure mirrors our shared commitment to preserve, to ensure, and to yet effect that patrimony of freedom which is our American heritage; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.