California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2037 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/16/2022

                    Enrolled  August 16, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 08, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 15, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  June 02, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2037Introduced by Assembly Member FloraFebruary 14, 2022 An act to amend Section 12288 of the Elections Code, relating to elections. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2037, Flora. Polling places: alcoholic beverages.Existing law prohibits an establishment where the primary purpose is the sale and dispensation of alcoholic beverages from being used as a polling place.This bill would delete that prohibition.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 12288 of the Elections Code is amended to read:12288. A polling place shall not be accessible by a door, window, or other opening to any place where any alcoholic beverage is sold or dispensed while the polls are open.

 Enrolled  August 16, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 08, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 15, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  June 02, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2037Introduced by Assembly Member FloraFebruary 14, 2022 An act to amend Section 12288 of the Elections Code, relating to elections. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2037, Flora. Polling places: alcoholic beverages.Existing law prohibits an establishment where the primary purpose is the sale and dispensation of alcoholic beverages from being used as a polling place.This bill would delete that prohibition.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  August 16, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 08, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 15, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  June 02, 2022

Enrolled  August 16, 2022
Passed IN  Senate  August 08, 2022
Passed IN  Assembly  August 15, 2022
Amended IN  Senate  June 02, 2022

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Bill 

No. 2037

Introduced by Assembly Member FloraFebruary 14, 2022

Introduced by Assembly Member Flora
February 14, 2022

 An act to amend Section 12288 of the Elections Code, relating to elections. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 2037, Flora. Polling places: alcoholic beverages.

Existing law prohibits an establishment where the primary purpose is the sale and dispensation of alcoholic beverages from being used as a polling place.This bill would delete that prohibition.

Existing law prohibits an establishment where the primary purpose is the sale and dispensation of alcoholic beverages from being used as a polling place.

This bill would delete that prohibition.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 12288 of the Elections Code is amended to read:12288. A polling place shall not be accessible by a door, window, or other opening to any place where any alcoholic beverage is sold or dispensed while the polls are open.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 12288 of the Elections Code is amended to read:12288. A polling place shall not be accessible by a door, window, or other opening to any place where any alcoholic beverage is sold or dispensed while the polls are open.

SECTION 1. Section 12288 of the Elections Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

12288. A polling place shall not be accessible by a door, window, or other opening to any place where any alcoholic beverage is sold or dispensed while the polls are open.

12288. A polling place shall not be accessible by a door, window, or other opening to any place where any alcoholic beverage is sold or dispensed while the polls are open.

12288. A polling place shall not be accessible by a door, window, or other opening to any place where any alcoholic beverage is sold or dispensed while the polls are open.



12288. A polling place shall not be accessible by a door, window, or other opening to any place where any alcoholic beverage is sold or dispensed while the polls are open.