California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB551 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/02/2022

                    Enrolled  September 02, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 29, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 31, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  June 28, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  May 09, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 551Introduced by Assembly Member RodriguezFebruary 10, 2021An act to amend Section 7523.2 of the Government Code, relating to retirement.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 551, Rodriguez. Disability retirement: COVID-19: presumption.Existing law, until January 1, 2023, establishes a disability retirement presumption that is applicable to the members of various public employee retirement systems who are employed in certain firefighter, public safety officer, and health care job classifications, among others, who test positive for COVID-19, as specified. Existing law requires, if the member retires for disability on the basis, in whole or in part, of a COVID-19-related illness, that it be presumed that the disability arose out of, or in the course of, the members employment, unless rebutted. This bill would extend the operation of the provisions described above until January 1, 2024.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 7523.2 of the Government Code is amended to read:7523.2. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2024, and as of that date is repealed.

 Enrolled  September 02, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 29, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 31, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  June 28, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  May 09, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 551Introduced by Assembly Member RodriguezFebruary 10, 2021An act to amend Section 7523.2 of the Government Code, relating to retirement.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 551, Rodriguez. Disability retirement: COVID-19: presumption.Existing law, until January 1, 2023, establishes a disability retirement presumption that is applicable to the members of various public employee retirement systems who are employed in certain firefighter, public safety officer, and health care job classifications, among others, who test positive for COVID-19, as specified. Existing law requires, if the member retires for disability on the basis, in whole or in part, of a COVID-19-related illness, that it be presumed that the disability arose out of, or in the course of, the members employment, unless rebutted. This bill would extend the operation of the provisions described above until January 1, 2024.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  September 02, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 29, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 31, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  June 28, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  May 09, 2022

Enrolled  September 02, 2022
Passed IN  Senate  August 29, 2022
Passed IN  Assembly  August 31, 2022
Amended IN  Senate  June 28, 2022
Amended IN  Senate  May 09, 2022

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Bill 

No. 551

Introduced by Assembly Member RodriguezFebruary 10, 2021

Introduced by Assembly Member Rodriguez
February 10, 2021

An act to amend Section 7523.2 of the Government Code, relating to retirement.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 551, Rodriguez. Disability retirement: COVID-19: presumption.

Existing law, until January 1, 2023, establishes a disability retirement presumption that is applicable to the members of various public employee retirement systems who are employed in certain firefighter, public safety officer, and health care job classifications, among others, who test positive for COVID-19, as specified. Existing law requires, if the member retires for disability on the basis, in whole or in part, of a COVID-19-related illness, that it be presumed that the disability arose out of, or in the course of, the members employment, unless rebutted. This bill would extend the operation of the provisions described above until January 1, 2024.

Existing law, until January 1, 2023, establishes a disability retirement presumption that is applicable to the members of various public employee retirement systems who are employed in certain firefighter, public safety officer, and health care job classifications, among others, who test positive for COVID-19, as specified. Existing law requires, if the member retires for disability on the basis, in whole or in part, of a COVID-19-related illness, that it be presumed that the disability arose out of, or in the course of, the members employment, unless rebutted. 

This bill would extend the operation of the provisions described above until January 1, 2024.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 7523.2 of the Government Code is amended to read:7523.2. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2024, and as of that date is repealed.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 7523.2 of the Government Code is amended to read:7523.2. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2024, and as of that date is repealed.

SECTION 1. Section 7523.2 of the Government Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

7523.2. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2024, and as of that date is repealed.

7523.2. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2024, and as of that date is repealed.

7523.2. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2024, and as of that date is repealed.



7523.2. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2024, and as of that date is repealed.