California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR101 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/09/2021

                    Enrolled  September 09, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  September 07, 2021 Passed IN  Assembly  August 23, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 101Introduced by Assembly Members Seyarto and Rodriguez(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Burke, Calderon, Carrillo, Chau, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Megan Dahle, Daly, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Lorena Gonzalez, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Lee, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Smith, Stone, Ting, Villapudua, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, and Wood)August 16, 2021 Relative to California Emergency Preparedness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 101, Seyarto. California Emergency Preparedness Month.This measure would declare the month of September 2021 as California Emergency Preparedness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Launched in 2004, National Preparedness Month is the Federal Emergency Management Agencys national annual preparedness outreach; andWHEREAS, National Preparedness Month aims to educate and empower Americans during the month and throughout the year to prepare for and respond to all types of emergencies, including natural disasters and manmade emergencies; andWHEREAS, California has experienced an uptick over the last decade in emergency situations that require individuals to prepare in advance; andWHEREAS, These disasters include rolling blackouts, wildfires, mudslides, and others that can leave Californians without power or foods for days; andWHEREAS, In the last year, California has suffered 23 declared emergency situations, comprising 9,917 wildfires, dozens of blackouts, hundreds of earthquakes; andWHEREAS, In response to emergencies and disasters, hundreds of thousands of people have been subject to mandatory evacuations; andWHEREAS, It is more critical than ever before that Californians have a plan prior to experiencing these events; andWHEREAS, These plans should include access to adequate shelter, reserves of food and water, backup power for communication devices, plans for pets, and access to transportation; andWHEREAS, September is celebrated as National Preparedness Month; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of September 2021 as California Emergency Preparedness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature encourages Californians to acknowledge the importance of planning for emergencies to protect themselves and their families; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  September 09, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  September 07, 2021 Passed IN  Assembly  August 23, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 101Introduced by Assembly Members Seyarto and Rodriguez(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Burke, Calderon, Carrillo, Chau, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Megan Dahle, Daly, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Lorena Gonzalez, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Lee, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Smith, Stone, Ting, Villapudua, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, and Wood)August 16, 2021 Relative to California Emergency Preparedness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 101, Seyarto. California Emergency Preparedness Month.This measure would declare the month of September 2021 as California Emergency Preparedness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  September 09, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  September 07, 2021 Passed IN  Assembly  August 23, 2021

Enrolled  September 09, 2021
Passed IN  Senate  September 07, 2021
Passed IN  Assembly  August 23, 2021

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Concurrent Resolution 

No. 101

Introduced by Assembly Members Seyarto and Rodriguez(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Burke, Calderon, Carrillo, Chau, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Megan Dahle, Daly, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Lorena Gonzalez, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Lee, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Smith, Stone, Ting, Villapudua, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, and Wood)August 16, 2021

Introduced by Assembly Members Seyarto and Rodriguez(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Burke, Calderon, Carrillo, Chau, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Megan Dahle, Daly, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Lorena Gonzalez, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Lee, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Smith, Stone, Ting, Villapudua, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, and Wood)
August 16, 2021

 Relative to California Emergency Preparedness Month. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 101, Seyarto. California Emergency Preparedness Month.

This measure would declare the month of September 2021 as California Emergency Preparedness Month.

This measure would declare the month of September 2021 as California Emergency Preparedness Month.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Launched in 2004, National Preparedness Month is the Federal Emergency Management Agencys national annual preparedness outreach; and

WHEREAS, National Preparedness Month aims to educate and empower Americans during the month and throughout the year to prepare for and respond to all types of emergencies, including natural disasters and manmade emergencies; and

WHEREAS, California has experienced an uptick over the last decade in emergency situations that require individuals to prepare in advance; and

WHEREAS, These disasters include rolling blackouts, wildfires, mudslides, and others that can leave Californians without power or foods for days; and

WHEREAS, In the last year, California has suffered 23 declared emergency situations, comprising 9,917 wildfires, dozens of blackouts, hundreds of earthquakes; and

WHEREAS, In response to emergencies and disasters, hundreds of thousands of people have been subject to mandatory evacuations; and

WHEREAS, It is more critical than ever before that Californians have a plan prior to experiencing these events; and

WHEREAS, These plans should include access to adequate shelter, reserves of food and water, backup power for communication devices, plans for pets, and access to transportation; and

WHEREAS, September is celebrated as National Preparedness Month; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of September 2021 as California Emergency Preparedness Month; and be it further

Resolved, That the Legislature encourages Californians to acknowledge the importance of planning for emergencies to protect themselves and their families; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.