California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR187 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/25/2022

                    Enrolled  August 25, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 23, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  June 16, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 187Introduced by Assembly Member Grayson(Coauthor: Assembly Member Wilson)(Coauthor: Senator Dodd)April 28, 2022 Relative to the Medal of Honor Safety Roadside Rest Area.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 187, Grayson. Medal of Honor Safety Roadside Rest Area.This measure would designate the rest area on Interstate 80 in the City of Vallejo in the County of Solano as the Medal of Honor Safety Roadside Rest Area. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, The City of Vallejo is the home of the former Mare Island Naval Shipyard and has a large concentration of veterans who have served honorably in the Armed Forces of the United States; andWHEREAS, These service members have served in peacetime and war, including World War I, World War II, the Korean War, the Vietnam War, the Gulf War, and the Global War on Terrorism in Iraq, Afghanistan, the Philippines, and other places; andWHEREAS, Many of these service members are being honored by the United States government for their actions in various theaters of war and conflict, as well as for their distinguished peacetime achievements; andWHEREAS, The soldiers, Marines, sailors, and airmen sent to war to defend our great nation personify the extraordinary commitment, dedication, and sacrifices of these service members and their families; andWHEREAS, The Medal of Honor is the United States highest and most prestigious personal military decoration that may be awarded to recognize service members who have distinguished themselves by acts of valor or selfless sacrifice beyond the call of duty; andWHEREAS, Dedication of a rest area to honor the Medal of Honor recipients who were born, entered service, had their last home of record, settled, died, or were buried in the City of Vallejo, including James Cooney, William Halford, Alexander Parker, Richard D. Dunphy, William S. Bond, Patrick J. Burke, George Carter, Anund C. Roark, Robert H. Young, John O. Dahlgren, Frank A. Young, Johan Johansson, Richard Willis, Henry Thompson, Reinhardt J. Keppler, William Johnson, and Thomas Lakin would appropriately express our appreciation of and indebtedness to these heroes for their service to our country; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the rest area on Interstate 80 in the City of Vallejo in the County of Solano as the Medal of Honor Safety Roadside Rest Area; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  August 25, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 23, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  June 16, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 187Introduced by Assembly Member Grayson(Coauthor: Assembly Member Wilson)(Coauthor: Senator Dodd)April 28, 2022 Relative to the Medal of Honor Safety Roadside Rest Area.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 187, Grayson. Medal of Honor Safety Roadside Rest Area.This measure would designate the rest area on Interstate 80 in the City of Vallejo in the County of Solano as the Medal of Honor Safety Roadside Rest Area. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES 

 Enrolled  August 25, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 23, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  June 16, 2022

Enrolled  August 25, 2022
Passed IN  Senate  August 23, 2022
Passed IN  Assembly  June 16, 2022

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Concurrent Resolution 

No. 187

Introduced by Assembly Member Grayson(Coauthor: Assembly Member Wilson)(Coauthor: Senator Dodd)April 28, 2022

Introduced by Assembly Member Grayson(Coauthor: Assembly Member Wilson)(Coauthor: Senator Dodd)
April 28, 2022

 Relative to the Medal of Honor Safety Roadside Rest Area.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 187, Grayson. Medal of Honor Safety Roadside Rest Area.

This measure would designate the rest area on Interstate 80 in the City of Vallejo in the County of Solano as the Medal of Honor Safety Roadside Rest Area. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.

This measure would designate the rest area on Interstate 80 in the City of Vallejo in the County of Solano as the Medal of Honor Safety Roadside Rest Area. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The City of Vallejo is the home of the former Mare Island Naval Shipyard and has a large concentration of veterans who have served honorably in the Armed Forces of the United States; and

WHEREAS, These service members have served in peacetime and war, including World War I, World War II, the Korean War, the Vietnam War, the Gulf War, and the Global War on Terrorism in Iraq, Afghanistan, the Philippines, and other places; and

WHEREAS, Many of these service members are being honored by the United States government for their actions in various theaters of war and conflict, as well as for their distinguished peacetime achievements; and

WHEREAS, The soldiers, Marines, sailors, and airmen sent to war to defend our great nation personify the extraordinary commitment, dedication, and sacrifices of these service members and their families; and

WHEREAS, The Medal of Honor is the United States highest and most prestigious personal military decoration that may be awarded to recognize service members who have distinguished themselves by acts of valor or selfless sacrifice beyond the call of duty; and

WHEREAS, Dedication of a rest area to honor the Medal of Honor recipients who were born, entered service, had their last home of record, settled, died, or were buried in the City of Vallejo, including James Cooney, William Halford, Alexander Parker, Richard D. Dunphy, William S. Bond, Patrick J. Burke, George Carter, Anund C. Roark, Robert H. Young, John O. Dahlgren, Frank A. Young, Johan Johansson, Richard Willis, Henry Thompson, Reinhardt J. Keppler, William Johnson, and Thomas Lakin would appropriately express our appreciation of and indebtedness to these heroes for their service to our country; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the rest area on Interstate 80 in the City of Vallejo in the County of Solano as the Medal of Honor Safety Roadside Rest Area; and be it further

Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.