California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1117 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/29/2022

                    Enrolled  August 29, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  May 24, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 24, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  March 03, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1117Introduced by Senator BeckerFebruary 16, 2022 An act to add Section 15421.1 to the Government Code, relating to state government.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 1117, Becker. State Public Defender: grants.Existing law requires the Governor to appoint a State Public Defender, subject to confirmation by the Senate. The primary responsibilities of the State Public Defender are to represent those persons who are entitled to representation at public expense in specified proceedings and to provide assistance and training to specified attorneys. The State Public Defender, among other things, is authorized to represent any person who is not financially able to employ counsel in specified matters and to appear as a friend of the court, as specified.This bill would authorize the State Public Defender to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 15421.1 is added to the Government Code, to read:15421.1. The State Public Defender is authorized to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services.

 Enrolled  August 29, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  May 24, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 24, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  March 03, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1117Introduced by Senator BeckerFebruary 16, 2022 An act to add Section 15421.1 to the Government Code, relating to state government.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 1117, Becker. State Public Defender: grants.Existing law requires the Governor to appoint a State Public Defender, subject to confirmation by the Senate. The primary responsibilities of the State Public Defender are to represent those persons who are entitled to representation at public expense in specified proceedings and to provide assistance and training to specified attorneys. The State Public Defender, among other things, is authorized to represent any person who is not financially able to employ counsel in specified matters and to appear as a friend of the court, as specified.This bill would authorize the State Public Defender to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  August 29, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  May 24, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 24, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  March 03, 2022

Enrolled  August 29, 2022
Passed IN  Senate  May 24, 2022
Passed IN  Assembly  August 24, 2022
Amended IN  Senate  March 03, 2022

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Bill 

No. 1117

Introduced by Senator BeckerFebruary 16, 2022

Introduced by Senator Becker
February 16, 2022

 An act to add Section 15421.1 to the Government Code, relating to state government.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SB 1117, Becker. State Public Defender: grants.

Existing law requires the Governor to appoint a State Public Defender, subject to confirmation by the Senate. The primary responsibilities of the State Public Defender are to represent those persons who are entitled to representation at public expense in specified proceedings and to provide assistance and training to specified attorneys. The State Public Defender, among other things, is authorized to represent any person who is not financially able to employ counsel in specified matters and to appear as a friend of the court, as specified.This bill would authorize the State Public Defender to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services.

Existing law requires the Governor to appoint a State Public Defender, subject to confirmation by the Senate. The primary responsibilities of the State Public Defender are to represent those persons who are entitled to representation at public expense in specified proceedings and to provide assistance and training to specified attorneys. The State Public Defender, among other things, is authorized to represent any person who is not financially able to employ counsel in specified matters and to appear as a friend of the court, as specified.

This bill would authorize the State Public Defender to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 15421.1 is added to the Government Code, to read:15421.1. The State Public Defender is authorized to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 15421.1 is added to the Government Code, to read:15421.1. The State Public Defender is authorized to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services.

SECTION 1. Section 15421.1 is added to the Government Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

15421.1. The State Public Defender is authorized to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services.

15421.1. The State Public Defender is authorized to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services.

15421.1. The State Public Defender is authorized to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services.



15421.1. The State Public Defender is authorized to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services.