Enrolled August 29, 2022 Passed IN Senate May 24, 2022 Passed IN Assembly August 24, 2022 Amended IN Senate March 03, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1117Introduced by Senator BeckerFebruary 16, 2022 An act to add Section 15421.1 to the Government Code, relating to state government.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 1117, Becker. State Public Defender: grants.Existing law requires the Governor to appoint a State Public Defender, subject to confirmation by the Senate. The primary responsibilities of the State Public Defender are to represent those persons who are entitled to representation at public expense in specified proceedings and to provide assistance and training to specified attorneys. The State Public Defender, among other things, is authorized to represent any person who is not financially able to employ counsel in specified matters and to appear as a friend of the court, as specified.This bill would authorize the State Public Defender to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 15421.1 is added to the Government Code, to read:15421.1. The State Public Defender is authorized to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services. Enrolled August 29, 2022 Passed IN Senate May 24, 2022 Passed IN Assembly August 24, 2022 Amended IN Senate March 03, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1117Introduced by Senator BeckerFebruary 16, 2022 An act to add Section 15421.1 to the Government Code, relating to state government.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 1117, Becker. State Public Defender: grants.Existing law requires the Governor to appoint a State Public Defender, subject to confirmation by the Senate. The primary responsibilities of the State Public Defender are to represent those persons who are entitled to representation at public expense in specified proceedings and to provide assistance and training to specified attorneys. The State Public Defender, among other things, is authorized to represent any person who is not financially able to employ counsel in specified matters and to appear as a friend of the court, as specified.This bill would authorize the State Public Defender to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Enrolled August 29, 2022 Passed IN Senate May 24, 2022 Passed IN Assembly August 24, 2022 Amended IN Senate March 03, 2022 Enrolled August 29, 2022 Passed IN Senate May 24, 2022 Passed IN Assembly August 24, 2022 Amended IN Senate March 03, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1117 Introduced by Senator BeckerFebruary 16, 2022 Introduced by Senator Becker February 16, 2022 An act to add Section 15421.1 to the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1117, Becker. State Public Defender: grants. Existing law requires the Governor to appoint a State Public Defender, subject to confirmation by the Senate. The primary responsibilities of the State Public Defender are to represent those persons who are entitled to representation at public expense in specified proceedings and to provide assistance and training to specified attorneys. The State Public Defender, among other things, is authorized to represent any person who is not financially able to employ counsel in specified matters and to appear as a friend of the court, as specified.This bill would authorize the State Public Defender to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services. Existing law requires the Governor to appoint a State Public Defender, subject to confirmation by the Senate. The primary responsibilities of the State Public Defender are to represent those persons who are entitled to representation at public expense in specified proceedings and to provide assistance and training to specified attorneys. The State Public Defender, among other things, is authorized to represent any person who is not financially able to employ counsel in specified matters and to appear as a friend of the court, as specified. This bill would authorize the State Public Defender to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 15421.1 is added to the Government Code, to read:15421.1. The State Public Defender is authorized to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services. The people of the State of California do enact as follows: ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows: SECTION 1. Section 15421.1 is added to the Government Code, to read:15421.1. The State Public Defender is authorized to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services. SECTION 1. Section 15421.1 is added to the Government Code, to read: ### SECTION 1. 15421.1. The State Public Defender is authorized to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services. 15421.1. The State Public Defender is authorized to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services. 15421.1. The State Public Defender is authorized to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services. 15421.1. The State Public Defender is authorized to administer and award grants to improve indigent defense services.