California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1145 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/22/2022

                    Enrolled  August 22, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  May 26, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 18, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  May 19, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  March 01, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1145Introduced by Senator Laird(Coauthors: Senators Becker, Hertzberg, Kamlager, Limn, McGuire, and Wieckowski)February 16, 2022 An act to add Section 38560.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to climate change.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 1145, Laird. California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: greenhouse gas emissions: dashboard.The California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006 designates the State Air Resources Board as the state agency charged with monitoring and regulating sources of emissions of greenhouse gases. The state board is required to approve a statewide greenhouse gas emissions limit equivalent to the statewide greenhouse gas emissions level in 1990 to be achieved by 2020 and to ensure that statewide greenhouse gas emissions are reduced to at least 40% below the 1990 level by 2030. The act requires the state board to prepare and approve a scoping plan for achieving the maximum technologically feasible and cost-effective reductions in greenhouse gas emissions and to update the scoping plan at least once every 5 years.This bill would require the state board to create, and maintain on its internet website, a greenhouse gas emissions dashboard that provides updated publicly available information regarding how the state is progressing toward meeting its statewide climate change goals.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 38560.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:38560.7. The state board shall create, and maintain on its internet website, a greenhouse gas emissions dashboard that provides updated publicly available information regarding how the state is progressing toward meeting its statewide climate change goals.

 Enrolled  August 22, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  May 26, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 18, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  May 19, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  March 01, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1145Introduced by Senator Laird(Coauthors: Senators Becker, Hertzberg, Kamlager, Limn, McGuire, and Wieckowski)February 16, 2022 An act to add Section 38560.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to climate change.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 1145, Laird. California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: greenhouse gas emissions: dashboard.The California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006 designates the State Air Resources Board as the state agency charged with monitoring and regulating sources of emissions of greenhouse gases. The state board is required to approve a statewide greenhouse gas emissions limit equivalent to the statewide greenhouse gas emissions level in 1990 to be achieved by 2020 and to ensure that statewide greenhouse gas emissions are reduced to at least 40% below the 1990 level by 2030. The act requires the state board to prepare and approve a scoping plan for achieving the maximum technologically feasible and cost-effective reductions in greenhouse gas emissions and to update the scoping plan at least once every 5 years.This bill would require the state board to create, and maintain on its internet website, a greenhouse gas emissions dashboard that provides updated publicly available information regarding how the state is progressing toward meeting its statewide climate change goals.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  August 22, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  May 26, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 18, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  May 19, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  March 01, 2022

Enrolled  August 22, 2022
Passed IN  Senate  May 26, 2022
Passed IN  Assembly  August 18, 2022
Amended IN  Senate  May 19, 2022
Amended IN  Senate  March 01, 2022

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Bill 

No. 1145

Introduced by Senator Laird(Coauthors: Senators Becker, Hertzberg, Kamlager, Limn, McGuire, and Wieckowski)February 16, 2022

Introduced by Senator Laird(Coauthors: Senators Becker, Hertzberg, Kamlager, Limn, McGuire, and Wieckowski)
February 16, 2022

 An act to add Section 38560.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to climate change.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SB 1145, Laird. California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: greenhouse gas emissions: dashboard.

The California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006 designates the State Air Resources Board as the state agency charged with monitoring and regulating sources of emissions of greenhouse gases. The state board is required to approve a statewide greenhouse gas emissions limit equivalent to the statewide greenhouse gas emissions level in 1990 to be achieved by 2020 and to ensure that statewide greenhouse gas emissions are reduced to at least 40% below the 1990 level by 2030. The act requires the state board to prepare and approve a scoping plan for achieving the maximum technologically feasible and cost-effective reductions in greenhouse gas emissions and to update the scoping plan at least once every 5 years.This bill would require the state board to create, and maintain on its internet website, a greenhouse gas emissions dashboard that provides updated publicly available information regarding how the state is progressing toward meeting its statewide climate change goals.

The California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006 designates the State Air Resources Board as the state agency charged with monitoring and regulating sources of emissions of greenhouse gases. The state board is required to approve a statewide greenhouse gas emissions limit equivalent to the statewide greenhouse gas emissions level in 1990 to be achieved by 2020 and to ensure that statewide greenhouse gas emissions are reduced to at least 40% below the 1990 level by 2030. The act requires the state board to prepare and approve a scoping plan for achieving the maximum technologically feasible and cost-effective reductions in greenhouse gas emissions and to update the scoping plan at least once every 5 years.

This bill would require the state board to create, and maintain on its internet website, a greenhouse gas emissions dashboard that provides updated publicly available information regarding how the state is progressing toward meeting its statewide climate change goals.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 38560.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:38560.7. The state board shall create, and maintain on its internet website, a greenhouse gas emissions dashboard that provides updated publicly available information regarding how the state is progressing toward meeting its statewide climate change goals.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 38560.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:38560.7. The state board shall create, and maintain on its internet website, a greenhouse gas emissions dashboard that provides updated publicly available information regarding how the state is progressing toward meeting its statewide climate change goals.

SECTION 1. Section 38560.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

38560.7. The state board shall create, and maintain on its internet website, a greenhouse gas emissions dashboard that provides updated publicly available information regarding how the state is progressing toward meeting its statewide climate change goals.

38560.7. The state board shall create, and maintain on its internet website, a greenhouse gas emissions dashboard that provides updated publicly available information regarding how the state is progressing toward meeting its statewide climate change goals.

38560.7. The state board shall create, and maintain on its internet website, a greenhouse gas emissions dashboard that provides updated publicly available information regarding how the state is progressing toward meeting its statewide climate change goals.



38560.7. The state board shall create, and maintain on its internet website, a greenhouse gas emissions dashboard that provides updated publicly available information regarding how the state is progressing toward meeting its statewide climate change goals.