California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1437 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/19/2022

                    Amended IN  Senate  April 19, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1437Introduced by Senator RothFebruary 18, 2022 An act to amend Section 5810 of, and to repeal Section 5811 of of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 1437, as amended, Roth. Interior designers.Existing law provides a comprehensive scheme for the certification and regulation of interior designers. Under Existing law provides that these provisions are repealed on January 1, 2023.This bill would instead repeal those provisions on January 1, 2027.Under existing law, a stamp from an interior design organization certifies that an interior designer has passed a specified examination and has met certain other education or experience requirements. Existing law requires, by September 1, 2008, an interior design organization issuing stamps to provide to the Joint Committee on Boards, Commissions, and Consumer Protection a report that reviews and assesses the costs and benefits associated with the examination and explores feasible alternatives to it.This bill would repeal that reporting requirement.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NOYES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 5810 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read:5810. (a) This chapter shall be subject to review by the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature.(b) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2023, 2027, and as of that date is repealed.SECTION 1.SEC. 2. Section 5811 of the Business and Professions Code is repealed.

 Amended IN  Senate  April 19, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1437Introduced by Senator RothFebruary 18, 2022 An act to amend Section 5810 of, and to repeal Section 5811 of of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 1437, as amended, Roth. Interior designers.Existing law provides a comprehensive scheme for the certification and regulation of interior designers. Under Existing law provides that these provisions are repealed on January 1, 2023.This bill would instead repeal those provisions on January 1, 2027.Under existing law, a stamp from an interior design organization certifies that an interior designer has passed a specified examination and has met certain other education or experience requirements. Existing law requires, by September 1, 2008, an interior design organization issuing stamps to provide to the Joint Committee on Boards, Commissions, and Consumer Protection a report that reviews and assesses the costs and benefits associated with the examination and explores feasible alternatives to it.This bill would repeal that reporting requirement.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NOYES  Local Program: NO 

 Amended IN  Senate  April 19, 2022

Amended IN  Senate  April 19, 2022

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Bill 

No. 1437

Introduced by Senator RothFebruary 18, 2022

Introduced by Senator Roth
February 18, 2022

 An act to amend Section 5810 of, and to repeal Section 5811 of of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SB 1437, as amended, Roth. Interior designers.

Existing law provides a comprehensive scheme for the certification and regulation of interior designers. Under Existing law provides that these provisions are repealed on January 1, 2023.This bill would instead repeal those provisions on January 1, 2027.Under existing law, a stamp from an interior design organization certifies that an interior designer has passed a specified examination and has met certain other education or experience requirements. Existing law requires, by September 1, 2008, an interior design organization issuing stamps to provide to the Joint Committee on Boards, Commissions, and Consumer Protection a report that reviews and assesses the costs and benefits associated with the examination and explores feasible alternatives to it.This bill would repeal that reporting requirement.

Existing law provides a comprehensive scheme for the certification and regulation of interior designers. Under Existing law provides that these provisions are repealed on January 1, 2023.

This bill would instead repeal those provisions on January 1, 2027.

Under existing law, a stamp from an interior design organization certifies that an interior designer has passed a specified examination and has met certain other education or experience requirements. Existing law requires, by September 1, 2008, an interior design organization issuing stamps to provide to the Joint Committee on Boards, Commissions, and Consumer Protection a report that reviews and assesses the costs and benefits associated with the examination and explores feasible alternatives to it.

This bill would repeal that reporting requirement.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 5810 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read:5810. (a) This chapter shall be subject to review by the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature.(b) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2023, 2027, and as of that date is repealed.SECTION 1.SEC. 2. Section 5811 of the Business and Professions Code is repealed.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 5810 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read:5810. (a) This chapter shall be subject to review by the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature.(b) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2023, 2027, and as of that date is repealed.

SECTION 1. Section 5810 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

5810. (a) This chapter shall be subject to review by the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature.(b) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2023, 2027, and as of that date is repealed.

5810. (a) This chapter shall be subject to review by the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature.(b) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2023, 2027, and as of that date is repealed.

5810. (a) This chapter shall be subject to review by the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature.(b) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2023, 2027, and as of that date is repealed.



5810. (a) This chapter shall be subject to review by the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature.

(b) This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2023, 2027, and as of that date is repealed.

SECTION 1.SEC. 2. Section 5811 of the Business and Professions Code is repealed.

SECTION 1.SEC. 2. Section 5811 of the Business and Professions Code is repealed.

### SECTION 1.SEC. 2.