California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB233 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/01/2022

                    Enrolled  September 01, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 30, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 18, 2022 Amended IN  Assembly  June 16, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  March 01, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 233Introduced by Senator UmbergJanuary 19, 2021An act to repeal Sections 367.5 and 367.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to repeal Sections 72010 and 72011 of the Government Code, relating to civil procedure.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 233, Umberg. Civil actions: appearance by telephone.Existing law authorizes a party who has provided notice to appear by telephone at specified conferences, hearings, or proceedings in civil cases. Existing law requires the Judicial Council to adopt rules effectuating those policies and provisions. Existing law also requires the Judicial Council to establish statewide, uniform fees to be paid by a party for appearing by telephone.Existing law requires the Judicial Council to enter into one or more master agreements with a vendor or vendors to provide for telephone appearances in civil cases pursuant to the above-described provisions. Existing law requires a portion of the fees collected by vendors or courts providing for appearances by telephone to be transmitted to the State Treasury for deposit in the Trial Court Trust Fund. Existing law requires the Judicial Council to determine the method and amount of allocation to eligible courts, as specified.This bill would repeal those provisions.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 367.5 of the Code of Civil Procedure is repealed.SEC. 2. Section 367.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure is repealed.SEC. 3. Section 72010 of the Government Code is repealed.SEC. 4. Section 72011 of the Government Code is repealed.

 Enrolled  September 01, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 30, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 18, 2022 Amended IN  Assembly  June 16, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  March 01, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 233Introduced by Senator UmbergJanuary 19, 2021An act to repeal Sections 367.5 and 367.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to repeal Sections 72010 and 72011 of the Government Code, relating to civil procedure.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 233, Umberg. Civil actions: appearance by telephone.Existing law authorizes a party who has provided notice to appear by telephone at specified conferences, hearings, or proceedings in civil cases. Existing law requires the Judicial Council to adopt rules effectuating those policies and provisions. Existing law also requires the Judicial Council to establish statewide, uniform fees to be paid by a party for appearing by telephone.Existing law requires the Judicial Council to enter into one or more master agreements with a vendor or vendors to provide for telephone appearances in civil cases pursuant to the above-described provisions. Existing law requires a portion of the fees collected by vendors or courts providing for appearances by telephone to be transmitted to the State Treasury for deposit in the Trial Court Trust Fund. Existing law requires the Judicial Council to determine the method and amount of allocation to eligible courts, as specified.This bill would repeal those provisions.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  September 01, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 30, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 18, 2022 Amended IN  Assembly  June 16, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  March 01, 2021

Enrolled  September 01, 2022
Passed IN  Senate  August 30, 2022
Passed IN  Assembly  August 18, 2022
Amended IN  Assembly  June 16, 2022
Amended IN  Senate  March 01, 2021

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Bill 

No. 233

Introduced by Senator UmbergJanuary 19, 2021

Introduced by Senator Umberg
January 19, 2021

An act to repeal Sections 367.5 and 367.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to repeal Sections 72010 and 72011 of the Government Code, relating to civil procedure.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SB 233, Umberg. Civil actions: appearance by telephone.

Existing law authorizes a party who has provided notice to appear by telephone at specified conferences, hearings, or proceedings in civil cases. Existing law requires the Judicial Council to adopt rules effectuating those policies and provisions. Existing law also requires the Judicial Council to establish statewide, uniform fees to be paid by a party for appearing by telephone.Existing law requires the Judicial Council to enter into one or more master agreements with a vendor or vendors to provide for telephone appearances in civil cases pursuant to the above-described provisions. Existing law requires a portion of the fees collected by vendors or courts providing for appearances by telephone to be transmitted to the State Treasury for deposit in the Trial Court Trust Fund. Existing law requires the Judicial Council to determine the method and amount of allocation to eligible courts, as specified.This bill would repeal those provisions.

Existing law authorizes a party who has provided notice to appear by telephone at specified conferences, hearings, or proceedings in civil cases. Existing law requires the Judicial Council to adopt rules effectuating those policies and provisions. Existing law also requires the Judicial Council to establish statewide, uniform fees to be paid by a party for appearing by telephone.

Existing law requires the Judicial Council to enter into one or more master agreements with a vendor or vendors to provide for telephone appearances in civil cases pursuant to the above-described provisions. Existing law requires a portion of the fees collected by vendors or courts providing for appearances by telephone to be transmitted to the State Treasury for deposit in the Trial Court Trust Fund. Existing law requires the Judicial Council to determine the method and amount of allocation to eligible courts, as specified.

This bill would repeal those provisions.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 367.5 of the Code of Civil Procedure is repealed.SEC. 2. Section 367.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure is repealed.SEC. 3. Section 72010 of the Government Code is repealed.SEC. 4. Section 72011 of the Government Code is repealed.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 367.5 of the Code of Civil Procedure is repealed.

SECTION 1. Section 367.5 of the Code of Civil Procedure is repealed.

### SECTION 1.



SEC. 2. Section 367.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure is repealed.

SEC. 2. Section 367.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure is repealed.

### SEC. 2.



SEC. 3. Section 72010 of the Government Code is repealed.

SEC. 3. Section 72010 of the Government Code is repealed.

### SEC. 3.



SEC. 4. Section 72011 of the Government Code is repealed.

SEC. 4. Section 72011 of the Government Code is repealed.

### SEC. 4.