California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB254 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/05/2021

                    Enrolled  July 05, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  March 25, 2021 Passed IN  Assembly  July 01, 2021 Amended IN  Senate  March 03, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 254Introduced by Senator BorgeasJanuary 25, 2021 An act to add Section 37222.21 to the Education Code, relating to public schools.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 254, Borgeas. Public schools: September 11th Remembrance Day.Existing law designates particular days each year as having special significance and encourages all public schools and educational institutions to observe those days and to conduct suitable commemorative exercises on those days.This bill would designate and set apart September 11 each year as September 11th Remembrance Day, a day having special significance. The bill would encourage, when September 11th Remembrance Day falls on a schoolday, each public elementary and secondary school to observe a moment of silence at an appropriate time while school is in session.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 37222.21 is added to the Education Code, to read:37222.21. (a) September 11 of each year is designated and set apart as September 11th Remembrance Day, a day having special significance pursuant to Section 37222.(b) When September 11th Remembrance Day falls on a schoolday, each public elementary and secondary school is encouraged to observe a moment of silence at an appropriate time while school is in session.

 Enrolled  July 05, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  March 25, 2021 Passed IN  Assembly  July 01, 2021 Amended IN  Senate  March 03, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 254Introduced by Senator BorgeasJanuary 25, 2021 An act to add Section 37222.21 to the Education Code, relating to public schools.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 254, Borgeas. Public schools: September 11th Remembrance Day.Existing law designates particular days each year as having special significance and encourages all public schools and educational institutions to observe those days and to conduct suitable commemorative exercises on those days.This bill would designate and set apart September 11 each year as September 11th Remembrance Day, a day having special significance. The bill would encourage, when September 11th Remembrance Day falls on a schoolday, each public elementary and secondary school to observe a moment of silence at an appropriate time while school is in session.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  July 05, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  March 25, 2021 Passed IN  Assembly  July 01, 2021 Amended IN  Senate  March 03, 2021

Enrolled  July 05, 2021
Passed IN  Senate  March 25, 2021
Passed IN  Assembly  July 01, 2021
Amended IN  Senate  March 03, 2021

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Bill 

No. 254

Introduced by Senator BorgeasJanuary 25, 2021

Introduced by Senator Borgeas
January 25, 2021

 An act to add Section 37222.21 to the Education Code, relating to public schools.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SB 254, Borgeas. Public schools: September 11th Remembrance Day.

Existing law designates particular days each year as having special significance and encourages all public schools and educational institutions to observe those days and to conduct suitable commemorative exercises on those days.This bill would designate and set apart September 11 each year as September 11th Remembrance Day, a day having special significance. The bill would encourage, when September 11th Remembrance Day falls on a schoolday, each public elementary and secondary school to observe a moment of silence at an appropriate time while school is in session.

Existing law designates particular days each year as having special significance and encourages all public schools and educational institutions to observe those days and to conduct suitable commemorative exercises on those days.

This bill would designate and set apart September 11 each year as September 11th Remembrance Day, a day having special significance. The bill would encourage, when September 11th Remembrance Day falls on a schoolday, each public elementary and secondary school to observe a moment of silence at an appropriate time while school is in session.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 37222.21 is added to the Education Code, to read:37222.21. (a) September 11 of each year is designated and set apart as September 11th Remembrance Day, a day having special significance pursuant to Section 37222.(b) When September 11th Remembrance Day falls on a schoolday, each public elementary and secondary school is encouraged to observe a moment of silence at an appropriate time while school is in session.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 37222.21 is added to the Education Code, to read:37222.21. (a) September 11 of each year is designated and set apart as September 11th Remembrance Day, a day having special significance pursuant to Section 37222.(b) When September 11th Remembrance Day falls on a schoolday, each public elementary and secondary school is encouraged to observe a moment of silence at an appropriate time while school is in session.

SECTION 1. Section 37222.21 is added to the Education Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

37222.21. (a) September 11 of each year is designated and set apart as September 11th Remembrance Day, a day having special significance pursuant to Section 37222.(b) When September 11th Remembrance Day falls on a schoolday, each public elementary and secondary school is encouraged to observe a moment of silence at an appropriate time while school is in session.

37222.21. (a) September 11 of each year is designated and set apart as September 11th Remembrance Day, a day having special significance pursuant to Section 37222.(b) When September 11th Remembrance Day falls on a schoolday, each public elementary and secondary school is encouraged to observe a moment of silence at an appropriate time while school is in session.

37222.21. (a) September 11 of each year is designated and set apart as September 11th Remembrance Day, a day having special significance pursuant to Section 37222.(b) When September 11th Remembrance Day falls on a schoolday, each public elementary and secondary school is encouraged to observe a moment of silence at an appropriate time while school is in session.



37222.21. (a) September 11 of each year is designated and set apart as September 11th Remembrance Day, a day having special significance pursuant to Section 37222.

(b) When September 11th Remembrance Day falls on a schoolday, each public elementary and secondary school is encouraged to observe a moment of silence at an appropriate time while school is in session.