California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR111 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/08/2022

                    Enrolled  September 08, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 08, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 31, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 111Introduced by Senator Dodd(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Grayson and Wilson)May 27, 2022 Relative to the Congressional Gold Medal Memorial Interchange. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 111, Dodd. Congressional Gold Medal Memorial Interchange.This measure would designate the interchange of Interstate 80 and Interstate 780 in the City of Vallejo in the County of Solano as the Congressional Gold Medal Memorial Interchange. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, The City of Vallejo is the home of the former Mare Island Naval Shipyard and has a large concentration of veterans who have served honorably in the Armed Forces of the United States; andWHEREAS, These service members have served in peacetime and war, including World War I, World War II, the Korean War, the Vietnam War, the Gulf War, and the Global War on Terrorism in Iraq, Afghanistan, the Philippines, and other places; and WHEREAS, Many of these service members are being honored by the United States government for their actions in various theaters of war and conflict, as well as for their distinguished peacetime achievements; andWHEREAS, The soldiers, Marines, sailors, and airmen sent to war to defend our great nation personify the extraordinary commitment, dedication, and sacrifices of these service members and their families; andWHEREAS, The Congressional Gold Medal is the United States Congress highest expression of national appreciation for distinguished achievements and contributions that may be awarded to recognize individuals, groups, or institutions; and WHEREAS, Dedication of a memorial interchange to honor all the Congressional Gold Medal recipients from General George Washington to the African American Hidden Figures NASA mathematicians and engineers, and various other warriors, including the Native American Code Talkers, Tuskegee Airmen, Women Airforce Service Pilots of World War II, Japanese American 100th Infantry Battalion and 442nd Regimental Combat Team, Montford Point Marines, Hispanic 65th Infantry Regiment, Filipino veterans of World War II, and the Chinese American veterans of World War II, would appropriately express our appreciation of and indebtedness to them for their service to our country; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the highway interchange of Interstate 80 and Interstate 780 in the City of Vallejo in the County of Solano as the Congressional Gold Medal Memorial Interchange; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  September 08, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 08, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 31, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 111Introduced by Senator Dodd(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Grayson and Wilson)May 27, 2022 Relative to the Congressional Gold Medal Memorial Interchange. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 111, Dodd. Congressional Gold Medal Memorial Interchange.This measure would designate the interchange of Interstate 80 and Interstate 780 in the City of Vallejo in the County of Solano as the Congressional Gold Medal Memorial Interchange. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES 

 Enrolled  September 08, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 08, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 31, 2022

Enrolled  September 08, 2022
Passed IN  Senate  August 08, 2022
Passed IN  Assembly  August 31, 2022

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Concurrent Resolution 

No. 111

Introduced by Senator Dodd(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Grayson and Wilson)May 27, 2022

Introduced by Senator Dodd(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Grayson and Wilson)
May 27, 2022

 Relative to the Congressional Gold Medal Memorial Interchange. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 111, Dodd. Congressional Gold Medal Memorial Interchange.

This measure would designate the interchange of Interstate 80 and Interstate 780 in the City of Vallejo in the County of Solano as the Congressional Gold Medal Memorial Interchange. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs.

This measure would designate the interchange of Interstate 80 and Interstate 780 in the City of Vallejo in the County of Solano as the Congressional Gold Medal Memorial Interchange. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The City of Vallejo is the home of the former Mare Island Naval Shipyard and has a large concentration of veterans who have served honorably in the Armed Forces of the United States; and

WHEREAS, These service members have served in peacetime and war, including World War I, World War II, the Korean War, the Vietnam War, the Gulf War, and the Global War on Terrorism in Iraq, Afghanistan, the Philippines, and other places; and 

WHEREAS, Many of these service members are being honored by the United States government for their actions in various theaters of war and conflict, as well as for their distinguished peacetime achievements; and

WHEREAS, The soldiers, Marines, sailors, and airmen sent to war to defend our great nation personify the extraordinary commitment, dedication, and sacrifices of these service members and their families; and

WHEREAS, The Congressional Gold Medal is the United States Congress highest expression of national appreciation for distinguished achievements and contributions that may be awarded to recognize individuals, groups, or institutions; and 

WHEREAS, Dedication of a memorial interchange to honor all the Congressional Gold Medal recipients from General George Washington to the African American Hidden Figures NASA mathematicians and engineers, and various other warriors, including the Native American Code Talkers, Tuskegee Airmen, Women Airforce Service Pilots of World War II, Japanese American 100th Infantry Battalion and 442nd Regimental Combat Team, Montford Point Marines, Hispanic 65th Infantry Regiment, Filipino veterans of World War II, and the Chinese American veterans of World War II, would appropriately express our appreciation of and indebtedness to them for their service to our country; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the highway interchange of Interstate 80 and Interstate 780 in the City of Vallejo in the County of Solano as the Congressional Gold Medal Memorial Interchange; and be it further

Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further 

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.