California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR20 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/06/2021

                    Enrolled  May 06, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  May 03, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 20Introduced by Senator ArchuletaMarch 15, 2021 Relative to Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 20, Archuleta. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Many people with serious, chronic mental illness, such as schizophrenia and other schizoaffective disorders, bipolar disorder, or severe depression, require treatment with medications that work as dopamine receptor blocking agents (DRBAs), including antipsychotics; andWHEREAS, While ongoing treatment with these medications can be very helpful, and even lifesaving, for many people, it can also lead to Tardive Dyskinesia (TD); andWHEREAS, Many people who have gastrointestinal disorders, including gastroparesis, nausea, and vomiting, also require treatment with DRBAs; andWHEREAS, Treatment of gastrointestinal disorders with DRBAs can be very helpful, but for many patients can lead to TD; andWHEREAS, TD is a movement disorder that is characterized by random, involuntary, and uncontrolled movements of different muscles in the face, trunk, and extremities. In some cases, people may experience movement of the arms, legs, fingers, and toes. In some case, it may affect the tongue, lips, and jaw. In other cases, symptoms may include swaying movements of the trunk or hips and may impact the muscles associated with walking, speech, eating, and breathing; andWHEREAS, TD can develop months, years, or decades after a person starts taking DRBAs, and even after they have discontinued use of those medications. Not everyone who takes a DRBA develops TD, but if it develops it is often permanent; andWHEREAS, Common risk factors for TD include advanced age and alcoholism or other substance abuse disorders. Postmenopausal women and people with a mood disorder are also at higher risk of developing TD; and WHEREAS, A person is at higher risk for TD after taking DRBAs for three months or longer, but the longer the person is on these medications, the higher the risk of developing TD; andWHEREAS, Studies suggest that overall risk of developing TD is between 10 and 30 percent; andWHEREAS, It is estimated that over 500,000 Americans suffer from TD. According to the National Alliance for Mental Illness, one in every four patients receiving long-term treatment with an antipsychotic medication will experience TD; andWHEREAS, Years of difficult and challenging research have resulted in recent scientific breakthroughs, with two new treatments for TD approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration; andWHEREAS, TD is often unrecognized and patients suffering from the illness are commonly misdiagnosed. Regular screening for TD in patients taking DRBA medications is recommended by the American Psychiatric Association; andWHEREAS, Patients suffering from TD often suffer embarrassment due to abnormal and involuntary movements, which leads them to withdraw from society and increasingly isolate themselves as the disease progresses; andWHEREAS, Caregivers of patients with TD face many challenges and are often responsible for the overall care of the TD patient; andWHEREAS, The Senate can raise awareness of TD in the public and medical community; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate proclaims the week of May 2, 2021, as Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week, and encourages everyone in the United States to become better informed about, and aware of, Tardive Dyskinesia; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  May 06, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  May 03, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 20Introduced by Senator ArchuletaMarch 15, 2021 Relative to Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 20, Archuleta. Digest Key

 Enrolled  May 06, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  May 03, 2021

Enrolled  May 06, 2021
Passed IN  Senate  May 03, 2021

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 20

Introduced by Senator ArchuletaMarch 15, 2021

Introduced by Senator Archuleta
March 15, 2021

 Relative to Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 20, Archuleta. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Many people with serious, chronic mental illness, such as schizophrenia and other schizoaffective disorders, bipolar disorder, or severe depression, require treatment with medications that work as dopamine receptor blocking agents (DRBAs), including antipsychotics; and

WHEREAS, While ongoing treatment with these medications can be very helpful, and even lifesaving, for many people, it can also lead to Tardive Dyskinesia (TD); and

WHEREAS, Many people who have gastrointestinal disorders, including gastroparesis, nausea, and vomiting, also require treatment with DRBAs; and

WHEREAS, Treatment of gastrointestinal disorders with DRBAs can be very helpful, but for many patients can lead to TD; and

WHEREAS, TD is a movement disorder that is characterized by random, involuntary, and uncontrolled movements of different muscles in the face, trunk, and extremities. In some cases, people may experience movement of the arms, legs, fingers, and toes. In some case, it may affect the tongue, lips, and jaw. In other cases, symptoms may include swaying movements of the trunk or hips and may impact the muscles associated with walking, speech, eating, and breathing; and

WHEREAS, TD can develop months, years, or decades after a person starts taking DRBAs, and even after they have discontinued use of those medications. Not everyone who takes a DRBA develops TD, but if it develops it is often permanent; and

WHEREAS, Common risk factors for TD include advanced age and alcoholism or other substance abuse disorders. Postmenopausal women and people with a mood disorder are also at higher risk of developing TD; and 

WHEREAS, A person is at higher risk for TD after taking DRBAs for three months or longer, but the longer the person is on these medications, the higher the risk of developing TD; and

WHEREAS, Studies suggest that overall risk of developing TD is between 10 and 30 percent; and

WHEREAS, It is estimated that over 500,000 Americans suffer from TD. According to the National Alliance for Mental Illness, one in every four patients receiving long-term treatment with an antipsychotic medication will experience TD; and

WHEREAS, Years of difficult and challenging research have resulted in recent scientific breakthroughs, with two new treatments for TD approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration; and

WHEREAS, TD is often unrecognized and patients suffering from the illness are commonly misdiagnosed. Regular screening for TD in patients taking DRBA medications is recommended by the American Psychiatric Association; and

WHEREAS, Patients suffering from TD often suffer embarrassment due to abnormal and involuntary movements, which leads them to withdraw from society and increasingly isolate themselves as the disease progresses; and

WHEREAS, Caregivers of patients with TD face many challenges and are often responsible for the overall care of the TD patient; and

WHEREAS, The Senate can raise awareness of TD in the public and medical community; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate proclaims the week of May 2, 2021, as Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week, and encourages everyone in the United States to become better informed about, and aware of, Tardive Dyskinesia; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.