CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 35Introduced by Senator GroveMay 05, 2021 Relative to California Peace Officers Memorial Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 35, as introduced, Grove. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Saturday, May 15, 2021, is California Peace Officers Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of those noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; andWHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of their bravery and dedication and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers Memorial Day; andWHEREAS, California peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; andWHEREAS, The peace officers of California have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; andWHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; andWHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic individuals who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes Californias peace officers who died in service to their communities in 2020:Detective Marylou Hernandez Armer, Santa Rosa Police Department, End of Watch: March 31, 2020.Deputy Terrell D. Young, Riverside Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: April 2, 2020.Sergeant Damon Christopher Gutzwiller, Santa Cruz County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: June 6, 2020.Detective Jose Cruz Mora, Fresno County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: September 7, 2020.Sergeant Harry Cohen, Riverside County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: October 18, 2020.Officer Andy Ornelas, Department of the California Highway Patrol, Antelope Valley, End of Watch: December 2, 2020.Officer Angel DeLaFuente, Fresno Police Department, End of Watch: December 28, 2020; and be it furtherResolved, That the Senate designates Saturday, May 15, 2021, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and to express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place in which to live and raise our families; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 35Introduced by Senator GroveMay 05, 2021 Relative to California Peace Officers Memorial Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 35, as introduced, Grove. Digest Key CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 35 Introduced by Senator GroveMay 05, 2021 Introduced by Senator Grove May 05, 2021 Relative to California Peace Officers Memorial Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SR 35, as introduced, Grove. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text WHEREAS, Saturday, May 15, 2021, is California Peace Officers Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of those noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; and WHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of their bravery and dedication and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers Memorial Day; and WHEREAS, California peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; and WHEREAS, The peace officers of California have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; and WHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; and WHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic individuals who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes Californias peace officers who died in service to their communities in 2020: Detective Marylou Hernandez Armer, Santa Rosa Police Department, End of Watch: March 31, 2020. Deputy Terrell D. Young, Riverside Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: April 2, 2020. Sergeant Damon Christopher Gutzwiller, Santa Cruz County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: June 6, 2020. Detective Jose Cruz Mora, Fresno County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: September 7, 2020. Sergeant Harry Cohen, Riverside County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: October 18, 2020. Officer Andy Ornelas, Department of the California Highway Patrol, Antelope Valley, End of Watch: December 2, 2020. Officer Angel DeLaFuente, Fresno Police Department, End of Watch: December 28, 2020; and be it further Resolved, That the Senate designates Saturday, May 15, 2021, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and to express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place in which to live and raise our families; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.