California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR49 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/02/2021

                    Enrolled  September 02, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  September 01, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 49Introduced by Senator Leyva(Coauthors: Senators Atkins, Bates, Caballero, Durazo, Eggman, Gonzalez, Hurtado, Kamlager, Limn, Melendez, Ochoa Bogh, Rubio, and Skinner)August 16, 2021 Relative to Womens Equality Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 49, Leyva. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, The first womens rights convention on July 19, 1848, was called by Elizabeth Cady Stanton and Lucretia Mott to win equal rights for women and expand the role of women in society, and it was then that the fight for womens rights came together as an organized effort; andWHEREAS, In 1851, abolitionist and womens rights activist Sojourner Truth delivered her renowned extemporaneous speech Aint I a Woman? at the Ohio Womens Rights Convention in Akron; andWHEREAS, The addition of the Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution on August 26, 1920, secured for women the right to vote; andWHEREAS, The passage of the federal Civil Rights Act of 1964 barred employment discrimination against women; andWHEREAS, The enactment of Title IX of the federal Education Amendments of 1972 guaranteed equal opportunity for women in all aspects of education; andWHEREAS, Many women have planned, organized, lectured, written, marched, lobbied, canvassed voters, staged parades, become candidates for political office, argued court cases, and more in order to irrevocably change for the better the world of todays women and girls; andWHEREAS, Despite important steps to achieve equal access in the workplace and equal access to educational opportunities, women face barriers in education and employment that are not experienced at the same magnitude by men, including the presence of historical male privilege and gender bias; sex discrimination and harassment and sexual violence in the workplace and on campus; the complications of having caregiving duties in the unpaid economy; and being undervalued for their work in the paid economy; andWHEREAS, Women are critical to a strong and vibrant California economy and play a pivotal role in spurring economic growth in California; andWHEREAS, Women comprise almost one-half of the workforce in our state and are primary income earners in many households; andWHEREAS, The lack of affordable, quality childcare and affordable housing makes it difficult for women to provide safe and secure environments for their families; andWHEREAS, Womens earnings are still far too low compared to mens in California, and women are disproportionately employed in jobs that pay the minimum wage; andWHEREAS, Women are also disproportionately disadvantaged by the stresses of poverty and the constraints of the social services system; andWHEREAS, Ensuring the economic security of all California women and their families will benefit people in all communities who count on public policies to meet their basic needs, earn a decent living, and care for their families; andWHEREAS, The women of the United States have designated August 26 as a symbol of the continued fight for equal rights; andWHEREAS, The United States Congress recognizes that August 26 of each year is designated as Womens Equality Day and the President of the United States annually issues a proclamation commemorating August 26, 1920, as the day when the women of the United States were first given the right to vote and recognizes that same date in 1970 when a nationwide demonstration for womens rights took place; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That upon the anniversary of the Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution, the Senate recognizes August 26, 2021, as Womens Equality Day and its historic importance to womens rights, including the battle to attain those rights in the past, present, and future; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  September 02, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  September 01, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 49Introduced by Senator Leyva(Coauthors: Senators Atkins, Bates, Caballero, Durazo, Eggman, Gonzalez, Hurtado, Kamlager, Limn, Melendez, Ochoa Bogh, Rubio, and Skinner)August 16, 2021 Relative to Womens Equality Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 49, Leyva. Digest Key

 Enrolled  September 02, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  September 01, 2021

Enrolled  September 02, 2021
Passed IN  Senate  September 01, 2021

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 49

Introduced by Senator Leyva(Coauthors: Senators Atkins, Bates, Caballero, Durazo, Eggman, Gonzalez, Hurtado, Kamlager, Limn, Melendez, Ochoa Bogh, Rubio, and Skinner)August 16, 2021

Introduced by Senator Leyva(Coauthors: Senators Atkins, Bates, Caballero, Durazo, Eggman, Gonzalez, Hurtado, Kamlager, Limn, Melendez, Ochoa Bogh, Rubio, and Skinner)
August 16, 2021

 Relative to Womens Equality Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 49, Leyva. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The first womens rights convention on July 19, 1848, was called by Elizabeth Cady Stanton and Lucretia Mott to win equal rights for women and expand the role of women in society, and it was then that the fight for womens rights came together as an organized effort; and

WHEREAS, In 1851, abolitionist and womens rights activist Sojourner Truth delivered her renowned extemporaneous speech Aint I a Woman? at the Ohio Womens Rights Convention in Akron; and

WHEREAS, The addition of the Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution on August 26, 1920, secured for women the right to vote; and

WHEREAS, The passage of the federal Civil Rights Act of 1964 barred employment discrimination against women; and

WHEREAS, The enactment of Title IX of the federal Education Amendments of 1972 guaranteed equal opportunity for women in all aspects of education; and

WHEREAS, Many women have planned, organized, lectured, written, marched, lobbied, canvassed voters, staged parades, become candidates for political office, argued court cases, and more in order to irrevocably change for the better the world of todays women and girls; and

WHEREAS, Despite important steps to achieve equal access in the workplace and equal access to educational opportunities, women face barriers in education and employment that are not experienced at the same magnitude by men, including the presence of historical male privilege and gender bias; sex discrimination and harassment and sexual violence in the workplace and on campus; the complications of having caregiving duties in the unpaid economy; and being undervalued for their work in the paid economy; and

WHEREAS, Women are critical to a strong and vibrant California economy and play a pivotal role in spurring economic growth in California; and

WHEREAS, Women comprise almost one-half of the workforce in our state and are primary income earners in many households; and

WHEREAS, The lack of affordable, quality childcare and affordable housing makes it difficult for women to provide safe and secure environments for their families; and

WHEREAS, Womens earnings are still far too low compared to mens in California, and women are disproportionately employed in jobs that pay the minimum wage; and

WHEREAS, Women are also disproportionately disadvantaged by the stresses of poverty and the constraints of the social services system; and

WHEREAS, Ensuring the economic security of all California women and their families will benefit people in all communities who count on public policies to meet their basic needs, earn a decent living, and care for their families; and

WHEREAS, The women of the United States have designated August 26 as a symbol of the continued fight for equal rights; and

WHEREAS, The United States Congress recognizes that August 26 of each year is designated as Womens Equality Day and the President of the United States annually issues a proclamation commemorating August 26, 1920, as the day when the women of the United States were first given the right to vote and recognizes that same date in 1970 when a nationwide demonstration for womens rights took place; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That upon the anniversary of the Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution, the Senate recognizes August 26, 2021, as Womens Equality Day and its historic importance to womens rights, including the battle to attain those rights in the past, present, and future; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.