California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR89 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/02/2022

                    Enrolled  June 02, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  June 02, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  May 17, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 89Introduced by Senators Skinner and Hertzberg(Coauthors: Senators Archuleta, Becker, Dodd, Durazo, Glazer, Gonzalez, Hueso, Leyva, Limn, Newman, Portantino, Rubio, Umberg, and Wiener)May 09, 2022Relative to National Gun Violence Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 89, Skinner. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Every day, more than 110 Americans are killed by gun violence, alongside more than 200 who are shot and wounded, and on average there are nearly 16,000 gun homicides every year; andWHEREAS, Americans are 26 times more likely to die by gun homicide than people in other high-income countries; andWHEREAS, California has 3,160 gun deaths every year, with a rate of 7.8 deaths per 100,000 people. California has the 45th highest rate of gun deaths in the United States; andWHEREAS, Protecting public safety in the communities they serve is among a legislators highest responsibilities; andWHEREAS, Support for the Second Amendment rights of law-abiding citizens goes hand-in-hand with keeping guns away from people that should not have them; andWHEREAS, Gun violence prevention is more important than ever as the COVID-19 pandemic continues to exacerbate gun violence after more than two years of increased gun sales, increased calls to suicide and domestic violence hotlines, and increased city gun violence; andWHEREAS, In January 2013, Hadiya Pendleton was tragically shot and killed at age 15; and on June 3, 2022, to recognize the 25th birthday of Hadiya Pendleton (born: June 2, 1997), people across the United States will recognize National Gun Violence Awareness Day and wear orange in tribute to Hadiya Pendleton, other victims of gun violence, and the loved ones of those victims; andWHEREAS, The idea was inspired by a group of Hadiyas friends, who asked their classmates to commemorate her life by wearing orange; they chose this color because hunters wear orange to announce themselves to other hunters when out in the woods and orange is a color that symbolizes the value of human life; andWHEREAS, Anyone can join this campaign by pledging to wear orange on June 3, the first Friday in June in 2022, to help raise awareness about gun violence; andWHEREAS, By wearing orange on June 3, 2022, Americans will raise awareness about gun violence and honor the lives of gun violence victims and survivors; andWHEREAS, We renew our commitment to reduce gun violence and pledge to do all we can to keep firearms out of the wrong hands and encourage responsible gun ownership to help keep our children safe; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate declares the first Friday in June, June 3, 2022, to be National Gun Violence Awareness Day, and encourages all citizens to support their communities efforts to prevent the tragic effects of gun violence and to honor and value human lives; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for distribution.

 Enrolled  June 02, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  June 02, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  May 17, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 89Introduced by Senators Skinner and Hertzberg(Coauthors: Senators Archuleta, Becker, Dodd, Durazo, Glazer, Gonzalez, Hueso, Leyva, Limn, Newman, Portantino, Rubio, Umberg, and Wiener)May 09, 2022Relative to National Gun Violence Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 89, Skinner. Digest Key

 Enrolled  June 02, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  June 02, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  May 17, 2022

Enrolled  June 02, 2022
Passed IN  Senate  June 02, 2022
Amended IN  Senate  May 17, 2022

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 89

Introduced by Senators Skinner and Hertzberg(Coauthors: Senators Archuleta, Becker, Dodd, Durazo, Glazer, Gonzalez, Hueso, Leyva, Limn, Newman, Portantino, Rubio, Umberg, and Wiener)May 09, 2022

Introduced by Senators Skinner and Hertzberg(Coauthors: Senators Archuleta, Becker, Dodd, Durazo, Glazer, Gonzalez, Hueso, Leyva, Limn, Newman, Portantino, Rubio, Umberg, and Wiener)
May 09, 2022

Relative to National Gun Violence Awareness Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 89, Skinner. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Every day, more than 110 Americans are killed by gun violence, alongside more than 200 who are shot and wounded, and on average there are nearly 16,000 gun homicides every year; and

WHEREAS, Americans are 26 times more likely to die by gun homicide than people in other high-income countries; and

WHEREAS, California has 3,160 gun deaths every year, with a rate of 7.8 deaths per 100,000 people. California has the 45th highest rate of gun deaths in the United States; and

WHEREAS, Protecting public safety in the communities they serve is among a legislators highest responsibilities; and

WHEREAS, Support for the Second Amendment rights of law-abiding citizens goes hand-in-hand with keeping guns away from people that should not have them; and

WHEREAS, Gun violence prevention is more important than ever as the COVID-19 pandemic continues to exacerbate gun violence after more than two years of increased gun sales, increased calls to suicide and domestic violence hotlines, and increased city gun violence; and

WHEREAS, In January 2013, Hadiya Pendleton was tragically shot and killed at age 15; and on June 3, 2022, to recognize the 25th birthday of Hadiya Pendleton (born: June 2, 1997), people across the United States will recognize National Gun Violence Awareness Day and wear orange in tribute to Hadiya Pendleton, other victims of gun violence, and the loved ones of those victims; and

WHEREAS, The idea was inspired by a group of Hadiyas friends, who asked their classmates to commemorate her life by wearing orange; they chose this color because hunters wear orange to announce themselves to other hunters when out in the woods and orange is a color that symbolizes the value of human life; and

WHEREAS, Anyone can join this campaign by pledging to wear orange on June 3, the first Friday in June in 2022, to help raise awareness about gun violence; and

WHEREAS, By wearing orange on June 3, 2022, Americans will raise awareness about gun violence and honor the lives of gun violence victims and survivors; and

WHEREAS, We renew our commitment to reduce gun violence and pledge to do all we can to keep firearms out of the wrong hands and encourage responsible gun ownership to help keep our children safe; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate declares the first Friday in June, June 3, 2022, to be National Gun Violence Awareness Day, and encourages all citizens to support their communities efforts to prevent the tragic effects of gun violence and to honor and value human lives; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for distribution.