California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR97 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/06/2022

                    Enrolled  September 06, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 30, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 97Introduced by Senator CaballeroJune 27, 2022 Relative to probation.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 97, Caballero. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Probation utilizes an accountability lens to be a connector and bridge for justice-involved individuals to receive the individualized rehabilitative services they need to be successful; andWHEREAS, Probation is an alternative to incarceration, and Californias probation mission is to deliver a seamless approach to providing effective supervision and rehabilitation services to justice-involved individuals; andWHEREAS, Probation professionals play a unique and essential role in our justice system and communities. Probation is focused on helping justice-involved individuals transition out of the system permanently through transformative and evidence-based rehabilitation; andWHEREAS, Probation officers are trained experts who are prepared to manage trauma and other needs of justice-involved individuals and safely connect them to the resources they need; andWHEREAS, Probation officers in California are diverse, educated, and gender equitable professionals focused on providing collaborative safety for our communities; andWHEREAS, Probation connects services and needs to enhance community safety and the restoration of justice-involved individuals. Probation departments are a connector in the justice system: bridging the gap and maximizing the resources available within the courts, local governments, law enforcement, social services, behavioral health, schools, crime survivor organizations, nonprofit organizations, and the community to reduce recidivism by carefully balancing direct human services and research-based deterrents and interventions; andWHEREAS, Probation departments in California focus on supporting and advocating for policies that help justice-involved individuals transition back to our communities safely and apply an equity lens to ensure these policies will effectively address the diverse needs of the people those probation departments serve; andWHEREAS, Probation balances the need for accountability with individualized rehabilitative treatment and services and provide justice-involved individuals the support and opportunities needed to move onto a healthier and safer life pathway; andWHEREAS, By delivering sustainable community safety, probation departments have a profound impact on the health and safety of our communities by working to reduce recidivism through evidence-based programming and supervision. Probations success ensures that our states communities are safer for all Californians to live and prosper; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate proclaims July 17, 2022, to July 23, 2022, inclusive, as Probation Services Week to highlight the immense contributions probation departments and their officers provide to our communities and state; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  September 06, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 30, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 97Introduced by Senator CaballeroJune 27, 2022 Relative to probation.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 97, Caballero. Digest Key

 Enrolled  September 06, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 30, 2022

Enrolled  September 06, 2022
Passed IN  Senate  August 30, 2022

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 97

Introduced by Senator CaballeroJune 27, 2022

Introduced by Senator Caballero
June 27, 2022

 Relative to probation.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 97, Caballero. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Probation utilizes an accountability lens to be a connector and bridge for justice-involved individuals to receive the individualized rehabilitative services they need to be successful; and

WHEREAS, Probation is an alternative to incarceration, and Californias probation mission is to deliver a seamless approach to providing effective supervision and rehabilitation services to justice-involved individuals; and

WHEREAS, Probation professionals play a unique and essential role in our justice system and communities. Probation is focused on helping justice-involved individuals transition out of the system permanently through transformative and evidence-based rehabilitation; and

WHEREAS, Probation officers are trained experts who are prepared to manage trauma and other needs of justice-involved individuals and safely connect them to the resources they need; and

WHEREAS, Probation officers in California are diverse, educated, and gender equitable professionals focused on providing collaborative safety for our communities; and

WHEREAS, Probation connects services and needs to enhance community safety and the restoration of justice-involved individuals. Probation departments are a connector in the justice system: bridging the gap and maximizing the resources available within the courts, local governments, law enforcement, social services, behavioral health, schools, crime survivor organizations, nonprofit organizations, and the community to reduce recidivism by carefully balancing direct human services and research-based deterrents and interventions; and

WHEREAS, Probation departments in California focus on supporting and advocating for policies that help justice-involved individuals transition back to our communities safely and apply an equity lens to ensure these policies will effectively address the diverse needs of the people those probation departments serve; and

WHEREAS, Probation balances the need for accountability with individualized rehabilitative treatment and services and provide justice-involved individuals the support and opportunities needed to move onto a healthier and safer life pathway; and

WHEREAS, By delivering sustainable community safety, probation departments have a profound impact on the health and safety of our communities by working to reduce recidivism through evidence-based programming and supervision. Probations success ensures that our states communities are safer for all Californians to live and prosper; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate proclaims July 17, 2022, to July 23, 2022, inclusive, as Probation Services Week to highlight the immense contributions probation departments and their officers provide to our communities and state; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.