Enrolled August 23, 2024 Passed IN Senate August 21, 2024 Passed IN Assembly May 16, 2024 Amended IN Assembly March 18, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2017Introduced by Assembly Member GraysonJanuary 31, 2024An act to add Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 530) to Division 1 of the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2017, Grayson. Banks and credit unions: nonsufficient funds fees.Existing law, the Banking Law, defines and regulates banks and commits the enforcement of banking laws to the Commissioner of Financial Protection and Innovation. Existing law, the California Credit Union Law, defines and regulates credit unions and commits enforcement of credit union laws to the commissioner. Existing law requires a bank or credit union subject to the examination authority of the commissioner to report annually, on or before March 1, to the commissioner on the amount of revenue earned from overdraft fees and nonsufficient funds fees, as defined, collected in the most recently completed calendar year and the percentage of that revenue as a proportion of the net income of the bank.This bill would prohibit certain banks and credit unions from charging a consumer a nonsufficient funds fee when the consumers attempt to initiate a transaction is declined instantaneously or near instantaneously due to nonsufficient funds, as specified.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 530) is added to Division 1 of the Financial Code, to read: CHAPTER 5.5. Nonsufficient Funds Fees530. A bank or credit union subject to the examination authority of the commissioner shall not charge a consumer a nonsufficient funds fee, as defined in Section 521, when the consumers attempt to initiate a transaction is declined instantaneously or near instantaneously by the bank or credit union due to nonsufficient funds. Enrolled August 23, 2024 Passed IN Senate August 21, 2024 Passed IN Assembly May 16, 2024 Amended IN Assembly March 18, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2017Introduced by Assembly Member GraysonJanuary 31, 2024An act to add Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 530) to Division 1 of the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2017, Grayson. Banks and credit unions: nonsufficient funds fees.Existing law, the Banking Law, defines and regulates banks and commits the enforcement of banking laws to the Commissioner of Financial Protection and Innovation. Existing law, the California Credit Union Law, defines and regulates credit unions and commits enforcement of credit union laws to the commissioner. Existing law requires a bank or credit union subject to the examination authority of the commissioner to report annually, on or before March 1, to the commissioner on the amount of revenue earned from overdraft fees and nonsufficient funds fees, as defined, collected in the most recently completed calendar year and the percentage of that revenue as a proportion of the net income of the bank.This bill would prohibit certain banks and credit unions from charging a consumer a nonsufficient funds fee when the consumers attempt to initiate a transaction is declined instantaneously or near instantaneously due to nonsufficient funds, as specified.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Enrolled August 23, 2024 Passed IN Senate August 21, 2024 Passed IN Assembly May 16, 2024 Amended IN Assembly March 18, 2024 Enrolled August 23, 2024 Passed IN Senate August 21, 2024 Passed IN Assembly May 16, 2024 Amended IN Assembly March 18, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2017 Introduced by Assembly Member GraysonJanuary 31, 2024 Introduced by Assembly Member Grayson January 31, 2024 An act to add Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 530) to Division 1 of the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2017, Grayson. Banks and credit unions: nonsufficient funds fees. Existing law, the Banking Law, defines and regulates banks and commits the enforcement of banking laws to the Commissioner of Financial Protection and Innovation. Existing law, the California Credit Union Law, defines and regulates credit unions and commits enforcement of credit union laws to the commissioner. Existing law requires a bank or credit union subject to the examination authority of the commissioner to report annually, on or before March 1, to the commissioner on the amount of revenue earned from overdraft fees and nonsufficient funds fees, as defined, collected in the most recently completed calendar year and the percentage of that revenue as a proportion of the net income of the bank.This bill would prohibit certain banks and credit unions from charging a consumer a nonsufficient funds fee when the consumers attempt to initiate a transaction is declined instantaneously or near instantaneously due to nonsufficient funds, as specified. Existing law, the Banking Law, defines and regulates banks and commits the enforcement of banking laws to the Commissioner of Financial Protection and Innovation. Existing law, the California Credit Union Law, defines and regulates credit unions and commits enforcement of credit union laws to the commissioner. Existing law requires a bank or credit union subject to the examination authority of the commissioner to report annually, on or before March 1, to the commissioner on the amount of revenue earned from overdraft fees and nonsufficient funds fees, as defined, collected in the most recently completed calendar year and the percentage of that revenue as a proportion of the net income of the bank. This bill would prohibit certain banks and credit unions from charging a consumer a nonsufficient funds fee when the consumers attempt to initiate a transaction is declined instantaneously or near instantaneously due to nonsufficient funds, as specified. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 530) is added to Division 1 of the Financial Code, to read: CHAPTER 5.5. Nonsufficient Funds Fees530. A bank or credit union subject to the examination authority of the commissioner shall not charge a consumer a nonsufficient funds fee, as defined in Section 521, when the consumers attempt to initiate a transaction is declined instantaneously or near instantaneously by the bank or credit union due to nonsufficient funds. The people of the State of California do enact as follows: ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows: SECTION 1. Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 530) is added to Division 1 of the Financial Code, to read: CHAPTER 5.5. Nonsufficient Funds Fees530. A bank or credit union subject to the examination authority of the commissioner shall not charge a consumer a nonsufficient funds fee, as defined in Section 521, when the consumers attempt to initiate a transaction is declined instantaneously or near instantaneously by the bank or credit union due to nonsufficient funds. SECTION 1. Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 530) is added to Division 1 of the Financial Code, to read: ### SECTION 1. CHAPTER 5.5. Nonsufficient Funds Fees530. A bank or credit union subject to the examination authority of the commissioner shall not charge a consumer a nonsufficient funds fee, as defined in Section 521, when the consumers attempt to initiate a transaction is declined instantaneously or near instantaneously by the bank or credit union due to nonsufficient funds. CHAPTER 5.5. Nonsufficient Funds Fees530. A bank or credit union subject to the examination authority of the commissioner shall not charge a consumer a nonsufficient funds fee, as defined in Section 521, when the consumers attempt to initiate a transaction is declined instantaneously or near instantaneously by the bank or credit union due to nonsufficient funds. CHAPTER 5.5. Nonsufficient Funds Fees CHAPTER 5.5. Nonsufficient Funds Fees 530. A bank or credit union subject to the examination authority of the commissioner shall not charge a consumer a nonsufficient funds fee, as defined in Section 521, when the consumers attempt to initiate a transaction is declined instantaneously or near instantaneously by the bank or credit union due to nonsufficient funds. 530. A bank or credit union subject to the examination authority of the commissioner shall not charge a consumer a nonsufficient funds fee, as defined in Section 521, when the consumers attempt to initiate a transaction is declined instantaneously or near instantaneously by the bank or credit union due to nonsufficient funds.