California 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2879 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/21/2024

                    Enrolled  August 21, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  August 15, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  August 19, 2024 Amended IN  Senate  June 06, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2879Introduced by Assembly Member LackeyFebruary 15, 2024 An act to add Section 185036.2 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to high-speed rail. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2879, Lackey. High-Speed Rail Authority: contracting.The California High-Speed Rail Act creates the High-Speed Rail Authority, composed of 11 members, to develop and implement a high-speed rail system in the state, with specified powers and duties. The act authorizes the authority to enter into contracts with private or public entities for the design, construction, and operation of high-speed trains. The act requires the authority to appoint an executive director to administer the affairs of the authority as directed by the authority.This bill, notwithstanding the authoritys ability to delegate power to the executive director, would require any contract change order with a value greater than $100,000,000 to be approved by the authority. Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 185036.2 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read:185036.2. Notwithstanding the authoritys ability to delegate power to the executive director pursuant to subdivision (a) of Section 185024, a contract change order with a value greater than one hundred million dollars ($100,000,000) shall be approved by the authority.

 Enrolled  August 21, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  August 15, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  August 19, 2024 Amended IN  Senate  June 06, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2879Introduced by Assembly Member LackeyFebruary 15, 2024 An act to add Section 185036.2 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to high-speed rail. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2879, Lackey. High-Speed Rail Authority: contracting.The California High-Speed Rail Act creates the High-Speed Rail Authority, composed of 11 members, to develop and implement a high-speed rail system in the state, with specified powers and duties. The act authorizes the authority to enter into contracts with private or public entities for the design, construction, and operation of high-speed trains. The act requires the authority to appoint an executive director to administer the affairs of the authority as directed by the authority.This bill, notwithstanding the authoritys ability to delegate power to the executive director, would require any contract change order with a value greater than $100,000,000 to be approved by the authority. Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  August 21, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  August 15, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  August 19, 2024 Amended IN  Senate  June 06, 2024

Enrolled  August 21, 2024
Passed IN  Senate  August 15, 2024
Passed IN  Assembly  August 19, 2024
Amended IN  Senate  June 06, 2024

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Bill 

No. 2879

Introduced by Assembly Member LackeyFebruary 15, 2024

Introduced by Assembly Member Lackey
February 15, 2024

 An act to add Section 185036.2 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to high-speed rail. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 2879, Lackey. High-Speed Rail Authority: contracting.

The California High-Speed Rail Act creates the High-Speed Rail Authority, composed of 11 members, to develop and implement a high-speed rail system in the state, with specified powers and duties. The act authorizes the authority to enter into contracts with private or public entities for the design, construction, and operation of high-speed trains. The act requires the authority to appoint an executive director to administer the affairs of the authority as directed by the authority.This bill, notwithstanding the authoritys ability to delegate power to the executive director, would require any contract change order with a value greater than $100,000,000 to be approved by the authority. 

The California High-Speed Rail Act creates the High-Speed Rail Authority, composed of 11 members, to develop and implement a high-speed rail system in the state, with specified powers and duties. The act authorizes the authority to enter into contracts with private or public entities for the design, construction, and operation of high-speed trains. The act requires the authority to appoint an executive director to administer the affairs of the authority as directed by the authority.

This bill, notwithstanding the authoritys ability to delegate power to the executive director, would require any contract change order with a value greater than $100,000,000 to be approved by the authority. 

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 185036.2 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read:185036.2. Notwithstanding the authoritys ability to delegate power to the executive director pursuant to subdivision (a) of Section 185024, a contract change order with a value greater than one hundred million dollars ($100,000,000) shall be approved by the authority.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 185036.2 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read:185036.2. Notwithstanding the authoritys ability to delegate power to the executive director pursuant to subdivision (a) of Section 185024, a contract change order with a value greater than one hundred million dollars ($100,000,000) shall be approved by the authority.

SECTION 1. Section 185036.2 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

185036.2. Notwithstanding the authoritys ability to delegate power to the executive director pursuant to subdivision (a) of Section 185024, a contract change order with a value greater than one hundred million dollars ($100,000,000) shall be approved by the authority.

185036.2. Notwithstanding the authoritys ability to delegate power to the executive director pursuant to subdivision (a) of Section 185024, a contract change order with a value greater than one hundred million dollars ($100,000,000) shall be approved by the authority.

185036.2. Notwithstanding the authoritys ability to delegate power to the executive director pursuant to subdivision (a) of Section 185024, a contract change order with a value greater than one hundred million dollars ($100,000,000) shall be approved by the authority.



185036.2. Notwithstanding the authoritys ability to delegate power to the executive director pursuant to subdivision (a) of Section 185024, a contract change order with a value greater than one hundred million dollars ($100,000,000) shall be approved by the authority.