Enrolled September 11, 2023 Passed IN Senate September 05, 2023 Passed IN Assembly September 07, 2023 Amended IN Senate June 19, 2023 Amended IN Senate May 09, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 349Introduced by Assembly Member Ramos(Coauthors: Assembly Members Bains, Davies, Dixon, Stephanie Nguyen, Petrie-Norris, Rodriguez, and Wilson)(Coauthor: Senator Rubio)January 31, 2023 An act to amend Section 14672.95 of the Government Code, relating to state property.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 349, Ramos. Patton State Hospital: lease: housing and mental health services for homeless individuals.Existing law authorizes the Department of General Services to perform various duties relating to state real property, including by authorizing the Director of General Services to let a building located at Patton State Hospital to a nonprofit corporation or local government, for a period not to exceed 20 years, for the purpose of providing services to elderly persons.This bill would delete the 20-year lease maximum and would additionally authorize the Director of General Services to lease the building described above for the purposes of providing housing to homeless individuals and providing mental health services to those individuals.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 14672.95 of the Government Code is amended to read:14672.95. Notwithstanding Section 14670, the Director of General Services may, with the consent of the State Department of State Hospitals, let a building located at Patton State Hospital to a nonprofit corporation or local government for either of the following purposes:(a) Providing services to elderly persons.(b) Providing housing to homeless individuals and providing mental health services to those individuals. Enrolled September 11, 2023 Passed IN Senate September 05, 2023 Passed IN Assembly September 07, 2023 Amended IN Senate June 19, 2023 Amended IN Senate May 09, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 349Introduced by Assembly Member Ramos(Coauthors: Assembly Members Bains, Davies, Dixon, Stephanie Nguyen, Petrie-Norris, Rodriguez, and Wilson)(Coauthor: Senator Rubio)January 31, 2023 An act to amend Section 14672.95 of the Government Code, relating to state property.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 349, Ramos. Patton State Hospital: lease: housing and mental health services for homeless individuals.Existing law authorizes the Department of General Services to perform various duties relating to state real property, including by authorizing the Director of General Services to let a building located at Patton State Hospital to a nonprofit corporation or local government, for a period not to exceed 20 years, for the purpose of providing services to elderly persons.This bill would delete the 20-year lease maximum and would additionally authorize the Director of General Services to lease the building described above for the purposes of providing housing to homeless individuals and providing mental health services to those individuals.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Enrolled September 11, 2023 Passed IN Senate September 05, 2023 Passed IN Assembly September 07, 2023 Amended IN Senate June 19, 2023 Amended IN Senate May 09, 2023 Enrolled September 11, 2023 Passed IN Senate September 05, 2023 Passed IN Assembly September 07, 2023 Amended IN Senate June 19, 2023 Amended IN Senate May 09, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 349 Introduced by Assembly Member Ramos(Coauthors: Assembly Members Bains, Davies, Dixon, Stephanie Nguyen, Petrie-Norris, Rodriguez, and Wilson)(Coauthor: Senator Rubio)January 31, 2023 Introduced by Assembly Member Ramos(Coauthors: Assembly Members Bains, Davies, Dixon, Stephanie Nguyen, Petrie-Norris, Rodriguez, and Wilson)(Coauthor: Senator Rubio) January 31, 2023 An act to amend Section 14672.95 of the Government Code, relating to state property. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 349, Ramos. Patton State Hospital: lease: housing and mental health services for homeless individuals. Existing law authorizes the Department of General Services to perform various duties relating to state real property, including by authorizing the Director of General Services to let a building located at Patton State Hospital to a nonprofit corporation or local government, for a period not to exceed 20 years, for the purpose of providing services to elderly persons.This bill would delete the 20-year lease maximum and would additionally authorize the Director of General Services to lease the building described above for the purposes of providing housing to homeless individuals and providing mental health services to those individuals. Existing law authorizes the Department of General Services to perform various duties relating to state real property, including by authorizing the Director of General Services to let a building located at Patton State Hospital to a nonprofit corporation or local government, for a period not to exceed 20 years, for the purpose of providing services to elderly persons. This bill would delete the 20-year lease maximum and would additionally authorize the Director of General Services to lease the building described above for the purposes of providing housing to homeless individuals and providing mental health services to those individuals. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 14672.95 of the Government Code is amended to read:14672.95. Notwithstanding Section 14670, the Director of General Services may, with the consent of the State Department of State Hospitals, let a building located at Patton State Hospital to a nonprofit corporation or local government for either of the following purposes:(a) Providing services to elderly persons.(b) Providing housing to homeless individuals and providing mental health services to those individuals. The people of the State of California do enact as follows: ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows: SECTION 1. Section 14672.95 of the Government Code is amended to read:14672.95. Notwithstanding Section 14670, the Director of General Services may, with the consent of the State Department of State Hospitals, let a building located at Patton State Hospital to a nonprofit corporation or local government for either of the following purposes:(a) Providing services to elderly persons.(b) Providing housing to homeless individuals and providing mental health services to those individuals. SECTION 1. Section 14672.95 of the Government Code is amended to read: ### SECTION 1. 14672.95. Notwithstanding Section 14670, the Director of General Services may, with the consent of the State Department of State Hospitals, let a building located at Patton State Hospital to a nonprofit corporation or local government for either of the following purposes:(a) Providing services to elderly persons.(b) Providing housing to homeless individuals and providing mental health services to those individuals. 14672.95. Notwithstanding Section 14670, the Director of General Services may, with the consent of the State Department of State Hospitals, let a building located at Patton State Hospital to a nonprofit corporation or local government for either of the following purposes:(a) Providing services to elderly persons.(b) Providing housing to homeless individuals and providing mental health services to those individuals. 14672.95. Notwithstanding Section 14670, the Director of General Services may, with the consent of the State Department of State Hospitals, let a building located at Patton State Hospital to a nonprofit corporation or local government for either of the following purposes:(a) Providing services to elderly persons.(b) Providing housing to homeless individuals and providing mental health services to those individuals. 14672.95. Notwithstanding Section 14670, the Director of General Services may, with the consent of the State Department of State Hospitals, let a building located at Patton State Hospital to a nonprofit corporation or local government for either of the following purposes: (a) Providing services to elderly persons. (b) Providing housing to homeless individuals and providing mental health services to those individuals.