California 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB705 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/30/2023

                    Enrolled  June 30, 2023 Passed IN  Senate  June 29, 2023 Passed IN  Assembly  April 17, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 705Introduced by Assembly Member LowenthalFebruary 13, 2023 An act to amend Section 175 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 705, Lowenthal. Autoettes.Existing law defines an autoette as a motor vehicle, located on a natural island with an area in excess of 20,000 acres and that is within a county having a population in excess of 4,000,000, and meeting all of several other requirements, including, but not limited to, the vehicle having a length of no more than 120 inches, including the front and rear bumpers. Existing law requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to register an autoette as a motor vehicle.This bill would expand the allowable length of a vehicle that could be defined as an autoette to 130 inches, including the front and rear bumpers.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 175 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read:175. An autoette is a motor vehicle, located on a natural island with an area in excess of 20,000 acres and that is within a county having a population in excess of 4,000,000, that meets all of the following requirements:(a) Has three or more wheels in contact with the ground.(b) Has an unladed weight of no greater than 1,800 pounds.(c) Has an overall length of no more than 130 inches, including the front and rear bumpers.(d) Has a width of no more than 55 inches, as measured from its widest part.

 Enrolled  June 30, 2023 Passed IN  Senate  June 29, 2023 Passed IN  Assembly  April 17, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 705Introduced by Assembly Member LowenthalFebruary 13, 2023 An act to amend Section 175 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 705, Lowenthal. Autoettes.Existing law defines an autoette as a motor vehicle, located on a natural island with an area in excess of 20,000 acres and that is within a county having a population in excess of 4,000,000, and meeting all of several other requirements, including, but not limited to, the vehicle having a length of no more than 120 inches, including the front and rear bumpers. Existing law requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to register an autoette as a motor vehicle.This bill would expand the allowable length of a vehicle that could be defined as an autoette to 130 inches, including the front and rear bumpers.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  June 30, 2023 Passed IN  Senate  June 29, 2023 Passed IN  Assembly  April 17, 2023

Enrolled  June 30, 2023
Passed IN  Senate  June 29, 2023
Passed IN  Assembly  April 17, 2023

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Bill 

No. 705

Introduced by Assembly Member LowenthalFebruary 13, 2023

Introduced by Assembly Member Lowenthal
February 13, 2023

 An act to amend Section 175 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 705, Lowenthal. Autoettes.

Existing law defines an autoette as a motor vehicle, located on a natural island with an area in excess of 20,000 acres and that is within a county having a population in excess of 4,000,000, and meeting all of several other requirements, including, but not limited to, the vehicle having a length of no more than 120 inches, including the front and rear bumpers. Existing law requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to register an autoette as a motor vehicle.This bill would expand the allowable length of a vehicle that could be defined as an autoette to 130 inches, including the front and rear bumpers.

Existing law defines an autoette as a motor vehicle, located on a natural island with an area in excess of 20,000 acres and that is within a county having a population in excess of 4,000,000, and meeting all of several other requirements, including, but not limited to, the vehicle having a length of no more than 120 inches, including the front and rear bumpers. Existing law requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to register an autoette as a motor vehicle.

This bill would expand the allowable length of a vehicle that could be defined as an autoette to 130 inches, including the front and rear bumpers.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 175 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read:175. An autoette is a motor vehicle, located on a natural island with an area in excess of 20,000 acres and that is within a county having a population in excess of 4,000,000, that meets all of the following requirements:(a) Has three or more wheels in contact with the ground.(b) Has an unladed weight of no greater than 1,800 pounds.(c) Has an overall length of no more than 130 inches, including the front and rear bumpers.(d) Has a width of no more than 55 inches, as measured from its widest part.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 175 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read:175. An autoette is a motor vehicle, located on a natural island with an area in excess of 20,000 acres and that is within a county having a population in excess of 4,000,000, that meets all of the following requirements:(a) Has three or more wheels in contact with the ground.(b) Has an unladed weight of no greater than 1,800 pounds.(c) Has an overall length of no more than 130 inches, including the front and rear bumpers.(d) Has a width of no more than 55 inches, as measured from its widest part.

SECTION 1. Section 175 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

175. An autoette is a motor vehicle, located on a natural island with an area in excess of 20,000 acres and that is within a county having a population in excess of 4,000,000, that meets all of the following requirements:(a) Has three or more wheels in contact with the ground.(b) Has an unladed weight of no greater than 1,800 pounds.(c) Has an overall length of no more than 130 inches, including the front and rear bumpers.(d) Has a width of no more than 55 inches, as measured from its widest part.

175. An autoette is a motor vehicle, located on a natural island with an area in excess of 20,000 acres and that is within a county having a population in excess of 4,000,000, that meets all of the following requirements:(a) Has three or more wheels in contact with the ground.(b) Has an unladed weight of no greater than 1,800 pounds.(c) Has an overall length of no more than 130 inches, including the front and rear bumpers.(d) Has a width of no more than 55 inches, as measured from its widest part.

175. An autoette is a motor vehicle, located on a natural island with an area in excess of 20,000 acres and that is within a county having a population in excess of 4,000,000, that meets all of the following requirements:(a) Has three or more wheels in contact with the ground.(b) Has an unladed weight of no greater than 1,800 pounds.(c) Has an overall length of no more than 130 inches, including the front and rear bumpers.(d) Has a width of no more than 55 inches, as measured from its widest part.



175. An autoette is a motor vehicle, located on a natural island with an area in excess of 20,000 acres and that is within a county having a population in excess of 4,000,000, that meets all of the following requirements:

(a) Has three or more wheels in contact with the ground.

(b) Has an unladed weight of no greater than 1,800 pounds.

(c) Has an overall length of no more than 130 inches, including the front and rear bumpers.

(d) Has a width of no more than 55 inches, as measured from its widest part.