California 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR12 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/03/2023

                    Enrolled  April 03, 2023 Passed IN  Senate  March 30, 2023 Passed IN  Assembly  March 09, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 12Introduced by Assembly Member Stephanie Nguyen(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner Horvath, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, McKinnor, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)February 09, 2023 Relative to Trisomy Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 12, Stephanie Nguyen. Trisomy Awareness Month.This measure would declare the month of March 2023 as Trisomy Awareness Month in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, During the month of March, Trisomy Awareness Month is observed to encourage citizens to increase their awareness of trisomy, a genetic disorder that deeply affects families; andWHEREAS, Trisomy is the presence within a persons cells of a single extra chromosome, yielding a total of three chromosomes instead of a pair. As a type of aneuploidy, trisomy can occur with any of the 23 pairs of chromosomes individuals have; andWHEREAS, The most common trisomies in newborns are trisomy 21, or Down syndrome, trisomy 18, or Edwards syndrome, and trisomy 13, or Patau syndrome; andWHEREAS, Local support groups, medical professionals, and online communities offer education, encouragement, and counseling for those managing trisomy pregnancies or raising trisomy-affected children; andWHEREAS, Now is the time for all Californians to educate themselves on all forms of trisomy, support families currently experiencing trisomy, and participate in helping people with developmental disabilities achieve their full potential; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares the month of March 2023 as Trisomy Awareness Month in California and commends this observation to all or our citizens; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  April 03, 2023 Passed IN  Senate  March 30, 2023 Passed IN  Assembly  March 09, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 12Introduced by Assembly Member Stephanie Nguyen(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner Horvath, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, McKinnor, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)February 09, 2023 Relative to Trisomy Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 12, Stephanie Nguyen. Trisomy Awareness Month.This measure would declare the month of March 2023 as Trisomy Awareness Month in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  April 03, 2023 Passed IN  Senate  March 30, 2023 Passed IN  Assembly  March 09, 2023

Enrolled  April 03, 2023
Passed IN  Senate  March 30, 2023
Passed IN  Assembly  March 09, 2023

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Concurrent Resolution 

No. 12

Introduced by Assembly Member Stephanie Nguyen(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner Horvath, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, McKinnor, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)February 09, 2023

Introduced by Assembly Member Stephanie Nguyen(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner Horvath, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, McKinnor, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)
February 09, 2023

 Relative to Trisomy Awareness Month. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 12, Stephanie Nguyen. Trisomy Awareness Month.

This measure would declare the month of March 2023 as Trisomy Awareness Month in California.

This measure would declare the month of March 2023 as Trisomy Awareness Month in California.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, During the month of March, Trisomy Awareness Month is observed to encourage citizens to increase their awareness of trisomy, a genetic disorder that deeply affects families; and

WHEREAS, Trisomy is the presence within a persons cells of a single extra chromosome, yielding a total of three chromosomes instead of a pair. As a type of aneuploidy, trisomy can occur with any of the 23 pairs of chromosomes individuals have; and

WHEREAS, The most common trisomies in newborns are trisomy 21, or Down syndrome, trisomy 18, or Edwards syndrome, and trisomy 13, or Patau syndrome; and

WHEREAS, Local support groups, medical professionals, and online communities offer education, encouragement, and counseling for those managing trisomy pregnancies or raising trisomy-affected children; and

WHEREAS, Now is the time for all Californians to educate themselves on all forms of trisomy, support families currently experiencing trisomy, and participate in helping people with developmental disabilities achieve their full potential; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares the month of March 2023 as Trisomy Awareness Month in California and commends this observation to all or our citizens; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.