California 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR70 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/02/2023

                    Enrolled  June 02, 2023 Passed IN  Senate  June 01, 2023 Passed IN  Assembly  May 15, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 70Introduced by Assembly Members Pellerin and Cervantes(Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Jackson)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Bauer-Kahan, Davies, Dixon, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)May 01, 2023 Relative to Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 70, Pellerin. Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month.This measure would proclaim May 2023 as Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, In the United States, maternal depression is the most common complication of pregnancy. Maternal mental health disorders encompass a range of mental health conditions, such as depression, anxiety, and postpartum psychosis; andWHEREAS, Maternal mental health affects one in five women during or after pregnancy, but all women are at risk of suffering from maternal mental health disorders. Specifically, in California, one in five Californian mothers suffers from pregnancy-related depression; andWHEREAS, Fewer than 15 percent of identified cases of maternal mental health disorders are treated as a result of personal, structural, and systemic barriers within the health care system; andWHEREAS, Untreated maternal mental health disorders significantly and negatively impact the short- and long-term health and well-being of affected women and their children; andWHEREAS, Untreated maternal mental health disorders cause adverse birth outcomes, impaired maternal-infant bonding, poor infant growth, childhood emotional and behavioral problems, and significant medical and economic costs, estimated to be $22,500 per mother; andWHEREAS, Lack of understanding and social stigma of mental health disorders prevent women and families from understanding the signs, symptoms, and risks involved with maternal mental health and disproportionately affect women who lack access to social support networks; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature dedicates the month of May 2023 as Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  June 02, 2023 Passed IN  Senate  June 01, 2023 Passed IN  Assembly  May 15, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 70Introduced by Assembly Members Pellerin and Cervantes(Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Jackson)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Bauer-Kahan, Davies, Dixon, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)May 01, 2023 Relative to Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 70, Pellerin. Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month.This measure would proclaim May 2023 as Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  June 02, 2023 Passed IN  Senate  June 01, 2023 Passed IN  Assembly  May 15, 2023

Enrolled  June 02, 2023
Passed IN  Senate  June 01, 2023
Passed IN  Assembly  May 15, 2023

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Concurrent Resolution 

No. 70

Introduced by Assembly Members Pellerin and Cervantes(Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Jackson)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Bauer-Kahan, Davies, Dixon, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)May 01, 2023

Introduced by Assembly Members Pellerin and Cervantes(Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Jackson)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Bauer-Kahan, Davies, Dixon, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)
May 01, 2023

 Relative to Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 70, Pellerin. Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month.

This measure would proclaim May 2023 as Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month.

This measure would proclaim May 2023 as Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, In the United States, maternal depression is the most common complication of pregnancy. Maternal mental health disorders encompass a range of mental health conditions, such as depression, anxiety, and postpartum psychosis; and

WHEREAS, Maternal mental health affects one in five women during or after pregnancy, but all women are at risk of suffering from maternal mental health disorders. Specifically, in California, one in five Californian mothers suffers from pregnancy-related depression; and

WHEREAS, Fewer than 15 percent of identified cases of maternal mental health disorders are treated as a result of personal, structural, and systemic barriers within the health care system; and

WHEREAS, Untreated maternal mental health disorders significantly and negatively impact the short- and long-term health and well-being of affected women and their children; and

WHEREAS, Untreated maternal mental health disorders cause adverse birth outcomes, impaired maternal-infant bonding, poor infant growth, childhood emotional and behavioral problems, and significant medical and economic costs, estimated to be $22,500 per mother; and

WHEREAS, Lack of understanding and social stigma of mental health disorders prevent women and families from understanding the signs, symptoms, and risks involved with maternal mental health and disproportionately affect women who lack access to social support networks; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature dedicates the month of May 2023 as Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.