California 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB462 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/06/2023

                    Enrolled  July 06, 2023 Passed IN  Senate  April 20, 2023 Passed IN  Assembly  July 03, 2023 Amended IN  Senate  March 23, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 462Introduced by Senator Wahab(Coauthors: Senators Blakespear, Cortese, Dodd, Limn, Ochoa Bogh, Roth, and Umberg)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Wallis, Lackey, Ortega, Pellerin, and Ting)February 13, 2023 An act to add Section 17006.1 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 462, Wahab. General assistance.Existing law requires each county to provide aid to its indigent residents not supported by other means. These county programs are known as general assistance programs. Existing law requires the board of supervisors of every county to, among other things, investigate every application for relief from the funds of the county, to supervise every person receiving that relief, and to keep full and complete records of the investigation, supervision, relief, and rehabilitation. Existing law requires those records to be confidential and not be open to examination or inspection, except as specified.This bill would provide that those provisions do not prohibit sharing of confidential information for purposes directly connected with the administration of relief or with the administration of public social services, as defined.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 17006.1 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read:17006.1. Section 17006 does not prohibit sharing of confidential information for purposes directly connected with the administration of relief from the funds of any California county or for purposes directly connected with the administration of public social services as defined by Section 10051.

 Enrolled  July 06, 2023 Passed IN  Senate  April 20, 2023 Passed IN  Assembly  July 03, 2023 Amended IN  Senate  March 23, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 462Introduced by Senator Wahab(Coauthors: Senators Blakespear, Cortese, Dodd, Limn, Ochoa Bogh, Roth, and Umberg)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Wallis, Lackey, Ortega, Pellerin, and Ting)February 13, 2023 An act to add Section 17006.1 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 462, Wahab. General assistance.Existing law requires each county to provide aid to its indigent residents not supported by other means. These county programs are known as general assistance programs. Existing law requires the board of supervisors of every county to, among other things, investigate every application for relief from the funds of the county, to supervise every person receiving that relief, and to keep full and complete records of the investigation, supervision, relief, and rehabilitation. Existing law requires those records to be confidential and not be open to examination or inspection, except as specified.This bill would provide that those provisions do not prohibit sharing of confidential information for purposes directly connected with the administration of relief or with the administration of public social services, as defined.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  July 06, 2023 Passed IN  Senate  April 20, 2023 Passed IN  Assembly  July 03, 2023 Amended IN  Senate  March 23, 2023

Enrolled  July 06, 2023
Passed IN  Senate  April 20, 2023
Passed IN  Assembly  July 03, 2023
Amended IN  Senate  March 23, 2023

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Bill 

No. 462

Introduced by Senator Wahab(Coauthors: Senators Blakespear, Cortese, Dodd, Limn, Ochoa Bogh, Roth, and Umberg)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Wallis, Lackey, Ortega, Pellerin, and Ting)February 13, 2023

Introduced by Senator Wahab(Coauthors: Senators Blakespear, Cortese, Dodd, Limn, Ochoa Bogh, Roth, and Umberg)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Wallis, Lackey, Ortega, Pellerin, and Ting)
February 13, 2023

 An act to add Section 17006.1 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SB 462, Wahab. General assistance.

Existing law requires each county to provide aid to its indigent residents not supported by other means. These county programs are known as general assistance programs. Existing law requires the board of supervisors of every county to, among other things, investigate every application for relief from the funds of the county, to supervise every person receiving that relief, and to keep full and complete records of the investigation, supervision, relief, and rehabilitation. Existing law requires those records to be confidential and not be open to examination or inspection, except as specified.This bill would provide that those provisions do not prohibit sharing of confidential information for purposes directly connected with the administration of relief or with the administration of public social services, as defined.

Existing law requires each county to provide aid to its indigent residents not supported by other means. These county programs are known as general assistance programs. Existing law requires the board of supervisors of every county to, among other things, investigate every application for relief from the funds of the county, to supervise every person receiving that relief, and to keep full and complete records of the investigation, supervision, relief, and rehabilitation. Existing law requires those records to be confidential and not be open to examination or inspection, except as specified.

This bill would provide that those provisions do not prohibit sharing of confidential information for purposes directly connected with the administration of relief or with the administration of public social services, as defined.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 17006.1 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read:17006.1. Section 17006 does not prohibit sharing of confidential information for purposes directly connected with the administration of relief from the funds of any California county or for purposes directly connected with the administration of public social services as defined by Section 10051.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 17006.1 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read:17006.1. Section 17006 does not prohibit sharing of confidential information for purposes directly connected with the administration of relief from the funds of any California county or for purposes directly connected with the administration of public social services as defined by Section 10051.

SECTION 1. Section 17006.1 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

17006.1. Section 17006 does not prohibit sharing of confidential information for purposes directly connected with the administration of relief from the funds of any California county or for purposes directly connected with the administration of public social services as defined by Section 10051.

17006.1. Section 17006 does not prohibit sharing of confidential information for purposes directly connected with the administration of relief from the funds of any California county or for purposes directly connected with the administration of public social services as defined by Section 10051.

17006.1. Section 17006 does not prohibit sharing of confidential information for purposes directly connected with the administration of relief from the funds of any California county or for purposes directly connected with the administration of public social services as defined by Section 10051.



17006.1. Section 17006 does not prohibit sharing of confidential information for purposes directly connected with the administration of relief from the funds of any California county or for purposes directly connected with the administration of public social services as defined by Section 10051.