California 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR106 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/09/2024

                    Enrolled  April 09, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  February 29, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  April 04, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 106Introduced by Senator Padilla(Coauthors: Senators Allen, Dodd, Hurtado, Jones, Limn, Seyarto, and Skinner)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Connolly, Davies, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, McCarty, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)February 05, 2024 Relative to GM1 Gangliosidosis Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 106, Padilla. GM1 Gangliosidosis Awareness Day.This measure would declare May 23, 2024, as GM1 Gangliosidosis Awareness Day in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, GM1 Gangliosidosis is a rare inherited disease that results in neurodegeneration and a progressive loss of abilities until death, leaving children, adolescents, and adults impaired with significant physical and developmental disabilities; andWHEREAS, GM1 Gangliosidosis is severely underdiagnosed and misdiagnosed and occurs in only one in every 100,000 to 200,000 live births; andWHEREAS, Lack of public awareness and visibility of GM1 Gangliosidosis contributes to underdiagnosis and difficulties in accessing specialized services and proper rehabilitation and support; andWHEREAS, Early diagnosis of GM1 Gangliosidosis is important to ensure timely management of clinical complications, genetic counseling, and, when available, treatment and therapeutic remedies; andWHEREAS, The goal is to raise awareness and increase the accurate and timely diagnosis of this rare inherited lysosomal disorder known as GM1 Gangliosidosis; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares May 23, 2024, as GM1 Gangliosidosis Awareness Day in California; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  April 09, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  February 29, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  April 04, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 106Introduced by Senator Padilla(Coauthors: Senators Allen, Dodd, Hurtado, Jones, Limn, Seyarto, and Skinner)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Connolly, Davies, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, McCarty, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)February 05, 2024 Relative to GM1 Gangliosidosis Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 106, Padilla. GM1 Gangliosidosis Awareness Day.This measure would declare May 23, 2024, as GM1 Gangliosidosis Awareness Day in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  April 09, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  February 29, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  April 04, 2024

Enrolled  April 09, 2024
Passed IN  Senate  February 29, 2024
Passed IN  Assembly  April 04, 2024

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Concurrent Resolution 

No. 106

Introduced by Senator Padilla(Coauthors: Senators Allen, Dodd, Hurtado, Jones, Limn, Seyarto, and Skinner)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Connolly, Davies, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, McCarty, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)February 05, 2024

Introduced by Senator Padilla(Coauthors: Senators Allen, Dodd, Hurtado, Jones, Limn, Seyarto, and Skinner)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Connolly, Davies, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, McCarty, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)
February 05, 2024

 Relative to GM1 Gangliosidosis Awareness Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 106, Padilla. GM1 Gangliosidosis Awareness Day.

This measure would declare May 23, 2024, as GM1 Gangliosidosis Awareness Day in California.

This measure would declare May 23, 2024, as GM1 Gangliosidosis Awareness Day in California.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, GM1 Gangliosidosis is a rare inherited disease that results in neurodegeneration and a progressive loss of abilities until death, leaving children, adolescents, and adults impaired with significant physical and developmental disabilities; and

WHEREAS, GM1 Gangliosidosis is severely underdiagnosed and misdiagnosed and occurs in only one in every 100,000 to 200,000 live births; and

WHEREAS, Lack of public awareness and visibility of GM1 Gangliosidosis contributes to underdiagnosis and difficulties in accessing specialized services and proper rehabilitation and support; and

WHEREAS, Early diagnosis of GM1 Gangliosidosis is important to ensure timely management of clinical complications, genetic counseling, and, when available, treatment and therapeutic remedies; and

WHEREAS, The goal is to raise awareness and increase the accurate and timely diagnosis of this rare inherited lysosomal disorder known as GM1 Gangliosidosis; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares May 23, 2024, as GM1 Gangliosidosis Awareness Day in California; and be it further 

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.