Enrolled June 14, 2024 Passed IN Senate May 06, 2024 Passed IN Assembly June 13, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 110Introduced by Senator UmbergFebruary 07, 2024 Relative to peace officers.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 110, Umberg. California Peace Officers Memorial Day.This measure would proclaim Monday, May 6, 2024, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Monday, May 6, 2024, is California Peace Officers Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of those noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; andWHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of our peace officers bravery and dedication, and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers Memorial Day; andWHEREAS, Peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; andWHEREAS, California peace officers have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; andWHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same peace officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; andWHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic individuals who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in 2023:Deputy Darnell Andrew Calhoun, Riverside County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: January 13, 2023.Officer Gonzalo Carrasco, Jr., Selma Police Department, End of Watch: January 31, 2023.Deputy Ryan M. Clinkunbroomer, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: September 16, 2023.Officer Tuan Q. Le, Oakland Police Department, End of Watch: December 29, 2023; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature also recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in prior years, but not yet enrolled:Officer Philip T. Sudario, Los Angeles Police Department, End of Watch: January 25, 2021.Sergeant Patricia Elena Guillen, Los Angeles Police Department, End of Watch: January 28, 2021.Sergeant Anthony White, Los Angeles Police Department, End of Watch: April 15, 2021; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature also recognizes Californias distant past honored officer:Detective Donald A. Mason, San Bernardino County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: December 23, 1959; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature designates Monday, May 6, 2024, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place to live and raise our families; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. Enrolled June 14, 2024 Passed IN Senate May 06, 2024 Passed IN Assembly June 13, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 110Introduced by Senator UmbergFebruary 07, 2024 Relative to peace officers.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 110, Umberg. California Peace Officers Memorial Day.This measure would proclaim Monday, May 6, 2024, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Enrolled June 14, 2024 Passed IN Senate May 06, 2024 Passed IN Assembly June 13, 2024 Enrolled June 14, 2024 Passed IN Senate May 06, 2024 Passed IN Assembly June 13, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 110 Introduced by Senator UmbergFebruary 07, 2024 Introduced by Senator Umberg February 07, 2024 Relative to peace officers. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 110, Umberg. California Peace Officers Memorial Day. This measure would proclaim Monday, May 6, 2024, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day. This measure would proclaim Monday, May 6, 2024, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text WHEREAS, Monday, May 6, 2024, is California Peace Officers Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of those noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; and WHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of our peace officers bravery and dedication, and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers Memorial Day; and WHEREAS, Peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; and WHEREAS, California peace officers have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; and WHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same peace officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; and WHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic individuals who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in 2023: Deputy Darnell Andrew Calhoun, Riverside County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: January 13, 2023. Officer Gonzalo Carrasco, Jr., Selma Police Department, End of Watch: January 31, 2023. Deputy Ryan M. Clinkunbroomer, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: September 16, 2023. Officer Tuan Q. Le, Oakland Police Department, End of Watch: December 29, 2023; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature also recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in prior years, but not yet enrolled: Officer Philip T. Sudario, Los Angeles Police Department, End of Watch: January 25, 2021. Sergeant Patricia Elena Guillen, Los Angeles Police Department, End of Watch: January 28, 2021. Sergeant Anthony White, Los Angeles Police Department, End of Watch: April 15, 2021; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature also recognizes Californias distant past honored officer: Detective Donald A. Mason, San Bernardino County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: December 23, 1959; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature designates Monday, May 6, 2024, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place to live and raise our families; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.