California 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR129 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/24/2024

                    Enrolled  May 24, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  April 18, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  May 22, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 129Introduced by Senator PadillaApril 01, 2024 Relative to California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 129, Padilla. California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.This measure would declare the week of April 14, 2024, to April 20, 2024, inclusive, as California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, When an emergency occurs, the prompt response of public safety personnel is critical to the protection of life and preservation of property; andWHEREAS, Thousands of dedicated public safety dispatchers serve the citizens of the State of California on a daily basis by answering emergency and nonemergency calls for assistance and coordinating public safety field units; and WHEREAS, These career professionals answer over 27,000,000 911 calls in California annually; and WHEREAS, These professionals measure their success in the lives that are saved by the 911 system each and every day; andWHEREAS, Public safety dispatchers have contributed substantially to the apprehension of criminals, suppression of fires, and helping of others during a critical time of need; and WHEREAS, Public safety communications professionals work under challenging and stressful circumstances; and WHEREAS, Public safety communications professionals dedicate their lives and careers to helping others; andWHEREAS, Effective January 1, 2021, Chapter 68 of the Statutes of 2020 recognized public safety dispatchers as first responders in the State of California; and WHEREAS, In 1991, the United States Congress designated the second week in April as National Public Safety Telecommunicators Week; andWHEREAS, California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week will recognize all public safety dispatchers who are an integral part of Californias first responder team, who work 24 hours per day, seven days per week, and serve as the first critical contact our citizens have with emergency services; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares the week of April 14, 2024, to April 20, 2024, inclusive, to be California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week, and honors and recognizes the importance and contributions of Californias public safety communications professionals and commends them for their continued commitment and service to the residents of California; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. 

 Enrolled  May 24, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  April 18, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  May 22, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 129Introduced by Senator PadillaApril 01, 2024 Relative to California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 129, Padilla. California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.This measure would declare the week of April 14, 2024, to April 20, 2024, inclusive, as California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  May 24, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  April 18, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  May 22, 2024

Enrolled  May 24, 2024
Passed IN  Senate  April 18, 2024
Passed IN  Assembly  May 22, 2024

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Concurrent Resolution 

No. 129

Introduced by Senator PadillaApril 01, 2024

Introduced by Senator Padilla
April 01, 2024

 Relative to California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 129, Padilla. California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.

This measure would declare the week of April 14, 2024, to April 20, 2024, inclusive, as California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.

This measure would declare the week of April 14, 2024, to April 20, 2024, inclusive, as California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, When an emergency occurs, the prompt response of public safety personnel is critical to the protection of life and preservation of property; and

WHEREAS, Thousands of dedicated public safety dispatchers serve the citizens of the State of California on a daily basis by answering emergency and nonemergency calls for assistance and coordinating public safety field units; and 

WHEREAS, These career professionals answer over 27,000,000 911 calls in California annually; and 

WHEREAS, These professionals measure their success in the lives that are saved by the 911 system each and every day; and

WHEREAS, Public safety dispatchers have contributed substantially to the apprehension of criminals, suppression of fires, and helping of others during a critical time of need; and 

WHEREAS, Public safety communications professionals work under challenging and stressful circumstances; and 

WHEREAS, Public safety communications professionals dedicate their lives and careers to helping others; and

WHEREAS, Effective January 1, 2021, Chapter 68 of the Statutes of 2020 recognized public safety dispatchers as first responders in the State of California; and 

WHEREAS, In 1991, the United States Congress designated the second week in April as National Public Safety Telecommunicators Week; and

WHEREAS, California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week will recognize all public safety dispatchers who are an integral part of Californias first responder team, who work 24 hours per day, seven days per week, and serve as the first critical contact our citizens have with emergency services; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares the week of April 14, 2024, to April 20, 2024, inclusive, to be California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week, and honors and recognizes the importance and contributions of Californias public safety communications professionals and commends them for their continued commitment and service to the residents of California; and be it further 

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.