California 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR158 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/09/2024

                    Enrolled  August 09, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  June 27, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  August 08, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 158Introduced by Senator NielloJune 05, 2024 Relative to Chiari Malformation Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 158, Niello. Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.This measure would declare September 2024 as Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Chiari malformation is a serious neurological disorder affecting more than 300,000 people in the United States; andWHEREAS, Chiari malformation was first identified by Austrian pathologist Professor Hans Chiari in the 1890s and categorized into four types, in order of severity; andWHEREAS, Chiari malformation is a congenital malformation in which the bottom of the brain, known as the cerebellum, is crowded in the skull cavity and forces the lower tips of the cerebellar hemispheres, or tonsils, into the hole in the bottom of the skull, or foramen magnum; andWHEREAS, Chiari malformations are defects in the cerebellum, the part of the brain that controls balance, and this creates pressure on the cerebellum and brain stem and may block the normal flow of cerebral spinal fluid to and from the brain; andWHEREAS, Symptoms usually appear during adolescence or early adulthood and can include severe head and neck pain, vertigo, muscle weakness, balance problems, blurred or double vision, difficulty swallowing, and sleep apnea; and WHEREAS, Individuals who have Chiari malformation may often have related conditions, such as hydrocephalus, spina bifida, syringomyelia, tethered spinal cord syndrome, and spinal curvature; andWHEREAS, The National Institute of Neurological Disorders and Stroke within the National Institutes of Health, is conducting research to find alternative surgical options and to identify the cause of Chiari malformations to create improved treatment and prevention plans; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares September 2024 as Chiari Malformation Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. 

 Enrolled  August 09, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  June 27, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  August 08, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 158Introduced by Senator NielloJune 05, 2024 Relative to Chiari Malformation Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 158, Niello. Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.This measure would declare September 2024 as Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  August 09, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  June 27, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  August 08, 2024

Enrolled  August 09, 2024
Passed IN  Senate  June 27, 2024
Passed IN  Assembly  August 08, 2024

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Concurrent Resolution 

No. 158

Introduced by Senator NielloJune 05, 2024

Introduced by Senator Niello
June 05, 2024

 Relative to Chiari Malformation Awareness Month. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 158, Niello. Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.

This measure would declare September 2024 as Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.

This measure would declare September 2024 as Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Chiari malformation is a serious neurological disorder affecting more than 300,000 people in the United States; and

WHEREAS, Chiari malformation was first identified by Austrian pathologist Professor Hans Chiari in the 1890s and categorized into four types, in order of severity; and

WHEREAS, Chiari malformation is a congenital malformation in which the bottom of the brain, known as the cerebellum, is crowded in the skull cavity and forces the lower tips of the cerebellar hemispheres, or tonsils, into the hole in the bottom of the skull, or foramen magnum; and

WHEREAS, Chiari malformations are defects in the cerebellum, the part of the brain that controls balance, and this creates pressure on the cerebellum and brain stem and may block the normal flow of cerebral spinal fluid to and from the brain; and

WHEREAS, Symptoms usually appear during adolescence or early adulthood and can include severe head and neck pain, vertigo, muscle weakness, balance problems, blurred or double vision, difficulty swallowing, and sleep apnea; and 

WHEREAS, Individuals who have Chiari malformation may often have related conditions, such as hydrocephalus, spina bifida, syringomyelia, tethered spinal cord syndrome, and spinal curvature; and

WHEREAS, The National Institute of Neurological Disorders and Stroke within the National Institutes of Health, is conducting research to find alternative surgical options and to identify the cause of Chiari malformations to create improved treatment and prevention plans; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares September 2024 as Chiari Malformation Awareness Month; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.