California 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR159 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/05/2024

                    Enrolled  September 05, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  August 12, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  August 31, 2024 Amended IN  Senate  June 27, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 159Introduced by Senator HurtadoJune 10, 2024Relative to Tachi Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 159, Hurtado. Tachi Highway.This measure would designate the portion of State Route 41 between Kent Avenue and Bush Street, in the County of Kings, as Tachi Highway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, All of todays major roads were originally native trails; and WHEREAS, State Route 41, as we know it today, would not exist without the native peoples who traveled its path down from the Sierra Nevada Mountains toward the sloughs, including Paashi, also known as Tulare Lake, to share in the bounty of these remnants of the creation of the world; andWHEREAS, Historic maps show Tulare Lake, formerly known as Tache Lake or Tachi Lake, and native trails, including the trail that has become the State Route 41 connection to the Central Valley; andWHEREAS, The trail that has become State Route 41 has significant ties to the Tachi Yokut; andWHEREAS, Native peoples, including the Tachi Yokuts, in the Central Valley region would travel to Tulare Lake using their trails during seasonal trips to access the bountiful flora and fauna that gathered and grew around the lake, and would travel on those same trails back as the seasons progressed; andWHEREAS, These trails also served as an extensive trade route system, established long before white settlers arrived in the area; andWHEREAS, The significant cultural, religious, and historical relationship between the Tachi people and this route deserves to be recognized by the state and by the many people who travel State Route 41 every day; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Route 41 between Kent Avenue (postmile 35.700) and Bush Street at UC 45-100 R/L (postmile R40.950), in the County of Kings, as Tachi Highway; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  September 05, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  August 12, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  August 31, 2024 Amended IN  Senate  June 27, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 159Introduced by Senator HurtadoJune 10, 2024Relative to Tachi Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 159, Hurtado. Tachi Highway.This measure would designate the portion of State Route 41 between Kent Avenue and Bush Street, in the County of Kings, as Tachi Highway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES 

 Enrolled  September 05, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  August 12, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  August 31, 2024 Amended IN  Senate  June 27, 2024

Enrolled  September 05, 2024
Passed IN  Senate  August 12, 2024
Passed IN  Assembly  August 31, 2024
Amended IN  Senate  June 27, 2024

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Concurrent Resolution 

No. 159

Introduced by Senator HurtadoJune 10, 2024

Introduced by Senator Hurtado
June 10, 2024

Relative to Tachi Highway. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 159, Hurtado. Tachi Highway.

This measure would designate the portion of State Route 41 between Kent Avenue and Bush Street, in the County of Kings, as Tachi Highway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.

This measure would designate the portion of State Route 41 between Kent Avenue and Bush Street, in the County of Kings, as Tachi Highway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, All of todays major roads were originally native trails; and 

WHEREAS, State Route 41, as we know it today, would not exist without the native peoples who traveled its path down from the Sierra Nevada Mountains toward the sloughs, including Paashi, also known as Tulare Lake, to share in the bounty of these remnants of the creation of the world; and

WHEREAS, Historic maps show Tulare Lake, formerly known as Tache Lake or Tachi Lake, and native trails, including the trail that has become the State Route 41 connection to the Central Valley; and

WHEREAS, The trail that has become State Route 41 has significant ties to the Tachi Yokut; and

WHEREAS, Native peoples, including the Tachi Yokuts, in the Central Valley region would travel to Tulare Lake using their trails during seasonal trips to access the bountiful flora and fauna that gathered and grew around the lake, and would travel on those same trails back as the seasons progressed; and

WHEREAS, These trails also served as an extensive trade route system, established long before white settlers arrived in the area; and

WHEREAS, The significant cultural, religious, and historical relationship between the Tachi people and this route deserves to be recognized by the state and by the many people who travel State Route 41 every day; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Route 41 between Kent Avenue (postmile 35.700) and Bush Street at UC 45-100 R/L (postmile R40.950), in the County of Kings, as Tachi Highway; and be it further

Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.