Amended IN Senate May 01, 2023 Amended IN Senate April 10, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 20Introduced by Senator Umberg(Coauthor: Senator Rubio)(Coauthors: Senators Archuleta and Rubio)February 07, 2023Relative to peace officers.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 20, as amended, Umberg. California Peace Officers Memorial Day.This measure would proclaim Monday, May 8, 2023, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Monday, May 8, 2023, is California Peace Officers Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of the noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; andWHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of our peace officers bravery and dedication, and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers Memorial Day; andWHEREAS, Peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; andWHEREAS, California peace officers have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, state regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; andWHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same peace officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; andWHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic individuals who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in 2022:Officer Tyler Ryan Lenehan, Elk Grove Police Department, End of Watch: January 21, 2022.Officer Nicholas J. Vella, Huntington Beach Police Department, End of Watch: February 19, 2022.Correctional Lieutenant Steven M. Taylor, Riverside County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: February 24, 2022.Officer Jorge David Alvarado, Jr., Salinas Police Department, End of Watch: February 25, 2022.Officer Houston Ryan Tipping, Los Angeles Police Department, End of Watch: May 29, 2022.Sergeant Michael Paredes, El Monte Police Department, End of Watch: June 14, 2022.Officer Joseph A. Santana, El Monte Police Department, End of Watch: June 14, 2022.Deputy Isaiah A. Cordero, Riverside County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: December 29, 2022; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature also recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in prior years, but not yet enrolled:Officer Michael Edward Wall, Los Angeles County Probation Department, End of Watch, April 30, 2021; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature designates Monday, May 8, 2023, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place to live and raise our families; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. Amended IN Senate May 01, 2023 Amended IN Senate April 10, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 20Introduced by Senator Umberg(Coauthor: Senator Rubio)(Coauthors: Senators Archuleta and Rubio)February 07, 2023Relative to peace officers.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 20, as amended, Umberg. California Peace Officers Memorial Day.This measure would proclaim Monday, May 8, 2023, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Amended IN Senate May 01, 2023 Amended IN Senate April 10, 2023 Amended IN Senate May 01, 2023 Amended IN Senate April 10, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 20 Introduced by Senator Umberg(Coauthor: Senator Rubio)(Coauthors: Senators Archuleta and Rubio)February 07, 2023 Introduced by Senator Umberg(Coauthor: Senator Rubio)(Coauthors: Senators Archuleta and Rubio) February 07, 2023 Relative to peace officers. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 20, as amended, Umberg. California Peace Officers Memorial Day. This measure would proclaim Monday, May 8, 2023, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day. This measure would proclaim Monday, May 8, 2023, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text WHEREAS, Monday, May 8, 2023, is California Peace Officers Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of the noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; and WHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of our peace officers bravery and dedication, and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers Memorial Day; and WHEREAS, Peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; and WHEREAS, California peace officers have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, state regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; and WHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same peace officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; and WHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic individuals who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in 2022: Officer Tyler Ryan Lenehan, Elk Grove Police Department, End of Watch: January 21, 2022. Officer Nicholas J. Vella, Huntington Beach Police Department, End of Watch: February 19, 2022. Correctional Lieutenant Steven M. Taylor, Riverside County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: February 24, 2022. Officer Jorge David Alvarado, Jr., Salinas Police Department, End of Watch: February 25, 2022. Officer Houston Ryan Tipping, Los Angeles Police Department, End of Watch: May 29, 2022. Sergeant Michael Paredes, El Monte Police Department, End of Watch: June 14, 2022. Officer Joseph A. Santana, El Monte Police Department, End of Watch: June 14, 2022. Deputy Isaiah A. Cordero, Riverside County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: December 29, 2022; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature also recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in prior years, but not yet enrolled: Officer Michael Edward Wall, Los Angeles County Probation Department, End of Watch, April 30, 2021; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature designates Monday, May 8, 2023, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place to live and raise our families; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.