California 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR75 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/23/2024

                    Enrolled  February 23, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  September 01, 2023 Passed IN  Assembly  February 22, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 75Introduced by Senator Ochoa Bogh(Principal coauthors: Senators Ashby and Seyarto)(Coauthors: Senators Allen, Alvarado-Gil, Archuleta, Becker, Blakespear, Bradford, Caballero, Cortese, Dahle, Dodd, Durazo, Eggman, Glazer, Gonzalez, Hurtado, Jones, Laird, Limn, McGuire, Menjivar, Newman, Nguyen, Niello, Padilla, Roth, Skinner, Smallwood-Cuevas, Stern, Umberg, Wahab, and Wiener)June 05, 2023 Relative to California Emergency Preparedness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 75, Ochoa Bogh. California Emergency Preparedness Month.This measure would declare the month of September 2023 as California Emergency Preparedness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Launched in 2004, National Preparedness Month is the Federal Emergency Management Agencys national annual preparedness outreach; andWHEREAS, National Preparedness Month aims to educate and empower Americans during the month and throughout the year to prepare for and respond to all types of emergencies, including natural disasters and manmade emergencies; andWHEREAS, California has experienced an uptick over the last decade in emergency situations that require individuals to prepare in advance; andWHEREAS, These disasters include wildfires, earthquakes, snowstorms, floods, mudslides, and other incidents that can leave Californians without power, food, or other essential items for days; andWHEREAS, In 2022, there were 11 declared emergency situations in California, including 7,490 wildfires, hundreds of earthquakes, numerous blackouts, extensive flooding, and a massive snowstorm; andWHEREAS, In response to emergencies and disasters, hundreds of thousands of Californians have been subject to mandatory evacuations and displacements; andWHEREAS, It is vital that all levels of government and residents have a comprehensive plan in place before an emergency or natural disaster occurs; andWHEREAS, These plans should include access to adequate shelter, reserves of food, water, and medical supplies, backup power sources, strategies for protecting animals, and access to transportation; andWHEREAS, September is celebrated as National Preparedness Month; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of September 2023 as California Emergency Preparedness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature encourages Californians to acknowledge the importance of planning for emergencies to protect themselves, their families, and their communities; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  February 23, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  September 01, 2023 Passed IN  Assembly  February 22, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 75Introduced by Senator Ochoa Bogh(Principal coauthors: Senators Ashby and Seyarto)(Coauthors: Senators Allen, Alvarado-Gil, Archuleta, Becker, Blakespear, Bradford, Caballero, Cortese, Dahle, Dodd, Durazo, Eggman, Glazer, Gonzalez, Hurtado, Jones, Laird, Limn, McGuire, Menjivar, Newman, Nguyen, Niello, Padilla, Roth, Skinner, Smallwood-Cuevas, Stern, Umberg, Wahab, and Wiener)June 05, 2023 Relative to California Emergency Preparedness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 75, Ochoa Bogh. California Emergency Preparedness Month.This measure would declare the month of September 2023 as California Emergency Preparedness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  February 23, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  September 01, 2023 Passed IN  Assembly  February 22, 2024

Enrolled  February 23, 2024
Passed IN  Senate  September 01, 2023
Passed IN  Assembly  February 22, 2024

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Concurrent Resolution 

No. 75

Introduced by Senator Ochoa Bogh(Principal coauthors: Senators Ashby and Seyarto)(Coauthors: Senators Allen, Alvarado-Gil, Archuleta, Becker, Blakespear, Bradford, Caballero, Cortese, Dahle, Dodd, Durazo, Eggman, Glazer, Gonzalez, Hurtado, Jones, Laird, Limn, McGuire, Menjivar, Newman, Nguyen, Niello, Padilla, Roth, Skinner, Smallwood-Cuevas, Stern, Umberg, Wahab, and Wiener)June 05, 2023

Introduced by Senator Ochoa Bogh(Principal coauthors: Senators Ashby and Seyarto)(Coauthors: Senators Allen, Alvarado-Gil, Archuleta, Becker, Blakespear, Bradford, Caballero, Cortese, Dahle, Dodd, Durazo, Eggman, Glazer, Gonzalez, Hurtado, Jones, Laird, Limn, McGuire, Menjivar, Newman, Nguyen, Niello, Padilla, Roth, Skinner, Smallwood-Cuevas, Stern, Umberg, Wahab, and Wiener)
June 05, 2023

 Relative to California Emergency Preparedness Month. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 75, Ochoa Bogh. California Emergency Preparedness Month.

This measure would declare the month of September 2023 as California Emergency Preparedness Month.

This measure would declare the month of September 2023 as California Emergency Preparedness Month.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Launched in 2004, National Preparedness Month is the Federal Emergency Management Agencys national annual preparedness outreach; and

WHEREAS, National Preparedness Month aims to educate and empower Americans during the month and throughout the year to prepare for and respond to all types of emergencies, including natural disasters and manmade emergencies; and

WHEREAS, California has experienced an uptick over the last decade in emergency situations that require individuals to prepare in advance; and

WHEREAS, These disasters include wildfires, earthquakes, snowstorms, floods, mudslides, and other incidents that can leave Californians without power, food, or other essential items for days; and

WHEREAS, In 2022, there were 11 declared emergency situations in California, including 7,490 wildfires, hundreds of earthquakes, numerous blackouts, extensive flooding, and a massive snowstorm; and

WHEREAS, In response to emergencies and disasters, hundreds of thousands of Californians have been subject to mandatory evacuations and displacements; and

WHEREAS, It is vital that all levels of government and residents have a comprehensive plan in place before an emergency or natural disaster occurs; and

WHEREAS, These plans should include access to adequate shelter, reserves of food, water, and medical supplies, backup power sources, strategies for protecting animals, and access to transportation; and

WHEREAS, September is celebrated as National Preparedness Month; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of September 2023 as California Emergency Preparedness Month; and be it further

Resolved, That the Legislature encourages Californians to acknowledge the importance of planning for emergencies to protect themselves, their families, and their communities; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.