California 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR46 Introduced / Bill

Filed 07/12/2023

                    CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 46Introduced by Senator LimnJuly 12, 2023 Relative to the anniversary of the Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 46, as introduced, Limn. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, The Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution (Nineteenth Amendment), which legally guaranteed American women the right to vote, was ratified on August 18, 1920; andWHEREAS, Initially introduced to Congress in 1878, suffragists picketed, lobbied states, and challenged male-only voting laws in courts until Congress passed the amendment on June 4, 1919; andWHEREAS, Although the amendment signified the protection against the discrimination of women, women of color were continually excluded for another 45 years until the passage of the Voting Rights Act of 1965; andWHEREAS, Additionally, women with disabilities were only able to secure protections in 1990 after the passage of the Americans with Disabilities Act. Nearly one decade prior, California became the sixth state in the nation to approve political equality; andWHEREAS, The Legislature placed Proposition 4 on the ballot, and voters approved the measure on October 10, 1911; andWHEREAS, Since then, women voters have improved the state by exercising their position at the ballot box, lobbying their representatives, and forming civic leagues statewide; andWHEREAS, The Nineteenth Amendment played a pivotal role in promoting reproductive rights for women. As a result, women experienced economic progress with the increased availability of family planning services and supplies, allowing more women to enroll in higher education and enter professional occupations; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes the 103 years since the passage of the Nineteenth Amendment and urges all Californians to join in celebrating the anniversary of the Nineteenth Amendment; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 46Introduced by Senator LimnJuly 12, 2023 Relative to the anniversary of the Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 46, as introduced, Limn. Digest Key





 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 46

Introduced by Senator LimnJuly 12, 2023

Introduced by Senator Limn
July 12, 2023

 Relative to the anniversary of the Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 46, as introduced, Limn. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution (Nineteenth Amendment), which legally guaranteed American women the right to vote, was ratified on August 18, 1920; and

WHEREAS, Initially introduced to Congress in 1878, suffragists picketed, lobbied states, and challenged male-only voting laws in courts until Congress passed the amendment on June 4, 1919; and

WHEREAS, Although the amendment signified the protection against the discrimination of women, women of color were continually excluded for another 45 years until the passage of the Voting Rights Act of 1965; and

WHEREAS, Additionally, women with disabilities were only able to secure protections in 1990 after the passage of the Americans with Disabilities Act. Nearly one decade prior, California became the sixth state in the nation to approve political equality; and

WHEREAS, The Legislature placed Proposition 4 on the ballot, and voters approved the measure on October 10, 1911; and

WHEREAS, Since then, women voters have improved the state by exercising their position at the ballot box, lobbying their representatives, and forming civic leagues statewide; and

WHEREAS, The Nineteenth Amendment played a pivotal role in promoting reproductive rights for women. As a result, women experienced economic progress with the increased availability of family planning services and supplies, allowing more women to enroll in higher education and enter professional occupations; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes the 103 years since the passage of the Nineteenth Amendment and urges all Californians to join in celebrating the anniversary of the Nineteenth Amendment; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.