California 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR23 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/14/2025

                    Enrolled  March 14, 2025 Passed IN  Senate  March 13, 2025 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20252026 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 23Introduced by Senators Rubio and WienerFebruary 25, 2025 Relative to Long COVID Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 23, Rubio. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, The COVID-19 pandemic has affected millions of individuals globally, leading to unprecedented health, social, and economic challenges; andWHEREAS, While many individuals recover from COVID-19 within weeks, a significant number of people experience lingering symptoms and complications that persist for months, commonly referred to as Long COVID or post-acute sequelae of SARS-CoV-2 infection (PASC); andWHEREAS, Long COVID manifests through a wide range of symptoms, including, but not limited to, fatigue, cognitive difficulties, respiratory problems, cardiovascular issues, and mental health challenges, impacting the quality of life and daily functioning of affected individuals; andWHEREAS, Current research indicates that Long COVID can affect people of all ages, including children, regardless of the severity of their initial COVID-19 infection; andWHEREAS, There is evidence that vaccination against COVID-19 significantly reduces the risk of severe illness and complications, including the likelihood of developing Long COVID; andWHEREAS, It is crucial to continue promoting COVID-19 vaccinations to protect individuals from severe disease and to potentially mitigate the long-term impacts of the virus; andWHEREAS, There is a critical need for increased public awareness and understanding of Long COVID to support those affected, promote early recognition, and encourage the development of effective treatments and interventions; andWHEREAS, Health care providers, researchers, and public health officials must collaborate to improve diagnostic criteria, treatment protocols, and support systems for individuals suffering from Long COVID; andWHEREAS, It is essential to support and advocate for Long COVID patients in their journey toward recovery, ensuring they have access to appropriate health care, rehabilitation services, and workplace accommodations; andWHEREAS, Raising awareness about Long COVID will foster greater empathy, reduce stigma, and enhance the collective efforts to address this emerging public health challenge; andWHEREAS, The first Monday in March marks COVID-19 Memorial Day, an opportunity for remembrance of those we lost, recognition of caregivers efforts, and reflection on lessons learned for future preparedness; andWHEREAS, The Legislature urges all residents to educate themselves about Long COVID, support those who are affected, get vaccinated against COVID-19, and contribute to the ongoing efforts to combat this condition through research, advocacy, and community engagement; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the day of March 15, 2025, is Long COVID Awareness Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  March 14, 2025 Passed IN  Senate  March 13, 2025 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20252026 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 23Introduced by Senators Rubio and WienerFebruary 25, 2025 Relative to Long COVID Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 23, Rubio. Digest Key

 Enrolled  March 14, 2025 Passed IN  Senate  March 13, 2025

Enrolled  March 14, 2025
Passed IN  Senate  March 13, 2025

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20252026 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 23

Introduced by Senators Rubio and WienerFebruary 25, 2025

Introduced by Senators Rubio and Wiener
February 25, 2025

 Relative to Long COVID Awareness Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 23, Rubio. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The COVID-19 pandemic has affected millions of individuals globally, leading to unprecedented health, social, and economic challenges; and

WHEREAS, While many individuals recover from COVID-19 within weeks, a significant number of people experience lingering symptoms and complications that persist for months, commonly referred to as Long COVID or post-acute sequelae of SARS-CoV-2 infection (PASC); and

WHEREAS, Long COVID manifests through a wide range of symptoms, including, but not limited to, fatigue, cognitive difficulties, respiratory problems, cardiovascular issues, and mental health challenges, impacting the quality of life and daily functioning of affected individuals; and

WHEREAS, Current research indicates that Long COVID can affect people of all ages, including children, regardless of the severity of their initial COVID-19 infection; and

WHEREAS, There is evidence that vaccination against COVID-19 significantly reduces the risk of severe illness and complications, including the likelihood of developing Long COVID; and

WHEREAS, It is crucial to continue promoting COVID-19 vaccinations to protect individuals from severe disease and to potentially mitigate the long-term impacts of the virus; and

WHEREAS, There is a critical need for increased public awareness and understanding of Long COVID to support those affected, promote early recognition, and encourage the development of effective treatments and interventions; and

WHEREAS, Health care providers, researchers, and public health officials must collaborate to improve diagnostic criteria, treatment protocols, and support systems for individuals suffering from Long COVID; and

WHEREAS, It is essential to support and advocate for Long COVID patients in their journey toward recovery, ensuring they have access to appropriate health care, rehabilitation services, and workplace accommodations; and

WHEREAS, Raising awareness about Long COVID will foster greater empathy, reduce stigma, and enhance the collective efforts to address this emerging public health challenge; and

WHEREAS, The first Monday in March marks COVID-19 Memorial Day, an opportunity for remembrance of those we lost, recognition of caregivers efforts, and reflection on lessons learned for future preparedness; and

WHEREAS, The Legislature urges all residents to educate themselves about Long COVID, support those who are affected, get vaccinated against COVID-19, and contribute to the ongoing efforts to combat this condition through research, advocacy, and community engagement; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the day of March 15, 2025, is Long COVID Awareness Day; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.