Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1044 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/21/2022

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-third General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REREVISED
This Version Includes All Amendments
Adopted in the Second House
LLS NO. 22-0631.01 Pierce Lively x2059
HOUSE BILL 22-1044
House Committees Senate Committees
State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING THE SELECTION OF MEMBERS OF VACANCY COMMITTEES101
BY CENTRAL COMMITTEES .102
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov
.)
Under current law, a vacancy in the office of many political
officials is filled by a vacancy committee. A vacancy committee is
selected by the relevant central committee. The bill requires central
committees to include on the vacancy committee at least all of the
precinct committeepersons of the central committee's political party for
each election precinct within the district administered by the central
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
March 21, 2022
SENATE
2nd Reading Unamended
March 18, 2022
HOUSE
3rd Reading Unamended
February 22, 2022
HOUSE
Amended 2nd Reading
February 18, 2022
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Williams and Kennedy, Boesenecker, Duran, Gray, Jodeh, Kipp, Lontine, Neville, Tipper
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Bridges, 
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing statute.
Dashes through the words indicate deletions from existing statute. committee and the delegates selected at the most recent caucus meeting
to the county assemblies of the central committee's political party for each
county within the district administered by the central committee.
The bill also requires that, in the case where a central committee
fails to select a vacancy committee, the vacancy consists of all of the
precinct committeepersons of the central committee's political party for
each election precinct within the district administered by the central
committee and the delegates selected at the most recent caucus meeting
to the county assemblies of the central committee's political party for each
county within the district administered by the central committee.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 1-3-103, add (13) as2
follows:3
1-3-103. Party committees. (13) IN SELECTING THE MEMBERS OF4
A VACANCY COMMITTEE AUTHORIZED TO FILL VACANCIES IN OFFICE5
PURSUANT TO THIS SECTION, THE CENTRAL COMMITTEE OF A JURISDICTION6
SHALL SELECT, AT A MINIMUM, THE MEMBERS OF THE JURISDICTION'S7
CENTRAL COMMITTEE.8
SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 1-12-206, amend (2)9
and (3) as follows:10
1-12-206. Vacancies in the office of county commissioner.11
(2) If the vacating commissioner was elected by the electors of the whole12
county, whether at large or from a district, the successor shall be13
appointed by a vacancy committee constituted of those persons selected14
at the county central committee organizational meeting of the same15
political party as the vacating commissioner. IN SELECTING THE MEMBERS16
OF A VACANCY COMMITTEE, THE CENTRAL COMMITTEE OF A JURISDICTION17
SHALL SELECT, AT A MINIMUM, THE MEMBERS OF THE JURISDICTION'S18
CENTRAL COMMITTEE.19
(3) If the vacating commissioner was elected only by the electors20
1044-2- of the district from which the vacating commissioner was elected, the1
county commissioner district central committee of the same district and2
political party as the vacating commissioner shall appoint a vacancy3
committee whose sole purpose shall be to name a successor to the4
position of county commissioner. IN SELECTING THE MEMBERS OF A5
VACANCY COMMITTEE, THE CENTRAL COMMITTEE OF A JURISDICTION6
SHALL SELECT, AT A MINIMUM, THE MEMBERS OF THE JURISDICTION'S7
CENTRAL COMMITTEE. In the event the county commissioner district8
central committee fails to appoint a vacancy committee, the vacancy9
committee shall consist of the chairperson and the vice-chairperson of the10
county commissioner district central committee, and a third person11
designated by the chairperson and vice-chairperson from among the12
precinct committeepersons of the same district and the same political13
party as the vacating commissioner THE MEMBERS OF THE JURISDICTION'S14
CENTRAL COMMITTEE.15
SECTION 3. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 22-2-105.5, amend16
(3)(a) as follows:17
22-2-105.5.  State board of education - definitions - vacancies18
- procedure for filling. (3) (a) Any vacancy occurring on the state board,19
other than a vacancy in a seat filled by a member elected from the state20
at large, shall be filled by the vacancy committee of the party21
congressional central committee of the same political party as the22
vacating board member for the congressional district represented by the23
vacating board member. FOR PURPOSES OF THIS SECTION, IN SELECTING24
THE MEMBERS OF A VACANCY COMMITTEE, THE CENTRAL COMMITTEE OF25
A JURISDICTION SHALL SELECT, AT A MINIMUM, THE MEMBERS OF THE26
JURISDICTION'S CENTRAL COMMITTEE. If no vacancy committee of the27
1044
-3- party congressional central committee exists, the party congressional1
central committee shall perform the functions of the vacancy committee. 2
SECTION 4. Act subject to petition - effective date -3
applicability. (1) This act takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following4
the expiration of the ninety-day period after final adjournment of the5
general assembly; except that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant6
to section 1 (3) of article V of the state constitution against this act or an7
item, section, or part of this act within such period, then the act, item,8
section, or part will not take effect unless approved by the people at the9
general election to be held in November 2022 and, in such case, will take10
effect on the date of the official declaration of the vote thereon by the11
governor.12
(2) This act applies to vacancies occurring on or after the13
applicable effective date of this act.14
1044
-4-