Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1068 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/17/2022

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-third General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REENGROSSED
This Version Includes All Amendments
Adopted in the House of Introduction
LLS NO. 22-0116.01 Shelby Ross x4510
HOUSE BILL 22-1068
House Committees Senate Committees
Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services
Appropriations
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING MEDICAID REIMBURSEMENT FOR THERAPY USING EQUINE101
MOVEMENT.102
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov
.)
Subject to federal authorization and federal financial participation,
on or after January 1, 2023, medicaid reimbursement is available for
therapy using equine movement when provided by a physical therapist,
an occupational therapist, or a speech-language pathologist.
HOUSE
3rd Reading Unamended
March 17, 2022
HOUSE
Amended 2nd Reading
March 16, 2022
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
McCormick and Lynch, Amabile, Bernett, Bird, Boesenecker, Caraveo, Cutter, Esgar,
Exum, Froelich, Geitner, Gonzales-Gutierrez, Gray, Hooton, Jodeh, Kipp, Lindsay, Lontine,
McCluskie, McKean, Michaelson Jenet, Mullica, Pelton, Pico, Ricks, Roberts, Sirota, Snyder,
Tipper, Titone, Valdez A., Valdez D., Will, Woodrow, Young
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Jaquez Lewis, 
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing statute.
Dashes through the words indicate deletions from existing statute. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. Legislative declaration. (1)  The general assembly2
finds that:3
(a)  Therapy using equine movement, often referred to as4
hippotherapy, is regarded as standard practice for occupational therapists,5
physical therapists, and speech-language pathologists and is used to6
engage sensory, neuromotor, and cognitive systems to promote functional7
treatment outcomes. Therapy practitioners use equine movement as a tool8
integrated with the use of other standard therapy tools, equipment, and9
activities during a treatment session.10
(b)  Since the 1980s, the American Occupational Therapy11
Association, the American Physical Therapy Association, and the12
American Speech-Language-Hearing Association have recognized that13
the use of equine movement is included in each respective scope of14
practice and is an effective therapy tool that can be utilized in patient15
treatment plans;16
(c)  Currently, there are 102 peer review journal articles, 12 peer17
review case studies, and 13 meta-analyses that support the value of using18
equine movement as a treatment tool to improve function within a therapy19
plan of care for patients with cerebral palsy, multiple sclerosis, Down20
syndrome, postural instability, spinal cord injury, traumatic brain injury,21
language-learning disability, and stroke; and22
(d)  Across the United States, there are at least 37 states that23
provide medicaid reimbursement for the use of equine movement as a24
treatment tool. These states recognize that it is within the role of the25
treating professional to select the appropriate treatment tools and26
activities to meet each client's needs.27
1068
-2- (2)  Therefore, the general assembly declares that occupational1
therapists, physical therapists, and speech-language pathologists should2
not be penalized and denied medicaid reimbursement for therapy services3
using equine movement as part of their respective practices.4
SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, add 25.5-5-332 as5
follows:6
25.5-5-332.  Therapy using equine movement - federal7
authorization - definition. (1)  S
UBJECT TO FEDERAL AUTHORIZATION8
AND FEDERAL FINANCIAL PARTICIPATION , ON OR AFTER 
JULY 1, 2024,9
THERAPY USING EQUINE MOVEMENT MAY BE PROVIDED BY A PHYSICAL10
THERAPIST LICENSED PURSUANT TO ARTICLE 285 OF TITLE 12, AN11
OCCUPATIONAL THERAPIST LICENSED PURSUANT TO ARTICLE 270 OF TITLE12
12,
 OR A SPEECH-LANGUAGE PATHOLOGIST CERTIFIED PURSUANT TO13
ARTICLE 305 OF TITLE 12.14
(2)  A
S USED IN THIS SECTION, UNLESS THE CONTEXT OTHERWISE15
REQUIRES, "THERAPY USING EQUINE MOVEMENT " MEANS THERAPEUTIC16
ACTIVITIES THAT LEVERAGE HORSE-HUMAN INTERACTIONS TO FACILITATE17
PROGRESSION TOWARD MEETING THERAPEUTIC GOALS .18
SECTION 3. Safety clause. The general assembly hereby finds,19
determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate20
preservation of the public peace, health, or safety.21
1068
-3-