Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1109 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/09/2022

                    Page 1 
February 8, 2022  HB 22-1109  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0537  
Rep. Woog; Bird 
Sen. Liston; Kolker  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
February 8, 2022 
House Business  
David Hansen | 303-866-2633 
David.Hansen@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: ON-DEMAND AIR CARRIER AIRCRAFT SALES TAX EXEMPTION  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☒ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill exempts aircraft purchases by or for use by on-demand air carriers in the state 
from sales and use tax from January 1, 2023, to December 31, 2030.  Beginning in 
FY 2022-23, the bill decreases state and local revenue from sales and use tax and 
increases state workload. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 22-1109 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue 	General Fund ($47,920 to $119,800)     ($98,593 to $246,480)     
Expenditures 
 
-     	-     
Transfers  	-     	-     
Other Budget Impacts TABOR Refund ($47,920 to $119,800)     ($98,593 to $246,480)     
    
 
 
    Page 2 
February 8, 2022  HB 22-1109  
 
Summary of Legislation 
Beginning January 1, 2023, through December 31, 2030, the bill exempts aircraft purchases by or for 
use by on-demand air carriers in the state from sales and use tax. 
Background 
On-demand air carriers are authorized by the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) to 
operate on-demand, unscheduled air service through a certification process.  Based on a 2019 analysis 
of the state’s on-demand aircraft used outside the state sales tax exemption by the Office of the 
State Auditor (OSA), an on-demand air carrier includes services such as air charter, cargo, air 
ambulance, and firefighting services on flights not scheduled in advance, or those that have four or 
fewer scheduled flights per route, per week.  The analysis found there were about 38 on-demand 
air carriers based in Colorado operating about 115 aircraft primarily within the state. The OSA review 
of the tax expenditure is available on the General Assembly’s website at: 
https://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2019-te6_on-demand_aircraft.pdf 
 
The on-demand aircraft used outside the state sales tax exemption was created by House Bill 14-1374, 
and applies to sales of new or used aircraft purchased from July 1, 2014 to June 30, 2019. 
State Revenue 
The bill is expected to decrease General Fund revenue between $47,920 and $119,800 in FY 2022-23 
(half-year impact), and between $98,590 and $246,480 in FY 2023-24, with similar reductions in future 
years.  Based on sales in prior years, the analysis assumes sales of three on-demand aircraft each year 
with sales prices between $1.1 million and $2.7 million in FY 2022-23.  In FY 2023-24, sales prices are 
increased 2.9 percent based on Legislative Council Staff’s December 2021 forecast for the 
Denver-Aurora-Lakewood consumer price index. To the extent that sales and prices differ from the 
assumptions used in this fiscal note, actual revenue impacts will be higher or lower.  Sales and use tax 
revenue is subject to TABOR. 
State Expenditures 
The bill will minimally increase workload for the Department of Revenue to update guidance, forms, 
and process aircraft-related returns.  The fiscal note assumes that workload impacts can be met with 
existing resources. 
Other Budget Impacts 
TABOR refunds.  The bill is expected to decrease the amount of state revenue required to be refunded 
to taxpayers by the amounts shown in the State Revenue section above.  This estimate assumes the 
December 2021 LCS revenue forecast.  A forecast of state revenue subject to TABOR is not available 
beyond FY 2023-24. 
  Page 3 
February 8, 2022  HB 22-1109  
 
Because TABOR refunds are paid from the General Fund, decreased General Fund revenue will lower 
the TABOR refund obligation, but result in no net change to the amount of General Fund otherwise 
available to spend or save. 
Local Government 
The bill will decrease sales and use tax revenue for state-collected local governments that incorporate 
the exemption and conform to the state tax base.  The bill includes the exemption among other optional 
sales and use tax exemptions for state-collected local governments.  The impact to local governments 
cannot be estimated due to data availability. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming no 
referendum petition is filed, except that the provisions relating to the sales and use tax exemption take 
effect on January 1, 2023. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Counties Information Technology Municipalities  
Personnel  Regional Transportation District  Revenue  
State Auditor   Special Districts Transportation 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.