Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1158 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/14/2022

                    Page 1 
February 14, 2022  HB 22-1158  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated February 10, 2022)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0718  
Rep. Sandridge; Snyder 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
February 14, 2022 
House HHS 
Erin Reynolds | 303-866-4146 
Erin.Reynolds@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: ESTABLISH SUBSTANCE USE COUNSELING C ENTER COLO SPRINGS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill requires the University of Colorado at Colorado Springs to establish the 
CARE Center by December 1, 2022, to provide accessible substance use prevention 
and treatment services to the community, train counselors, and collect research data. 
It will increase state expenditures on an ongoing basis beginning in FY 2022-23. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires an appropriation of $146,432 to the Department of 
Higher Education. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. It has been updated to correct out year 
costs. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 22-1158 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$146,432     $133,632  
Transfers  	-     	-     
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$21,965  	$20,045  
 
 
    Page 2 
February 14, 2022  HB 22-1158  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill requires the University of Colorado at Colorado Springs to establish the CARE Center by 
December 1, 2022, to provide accessible substance use prevention and treatment services to the 
community, train competent and culturally responsive substance use counselors, and collect data that 
will contribute to research regarding the efficacy of substance use interventions.  The center is required 
to submit a report on its work and data collected to the General Assembly by December 30, 2027. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state General Fund expenditures for the University of Colorado at Colorado Springs 
in the Department of Higher Education by $146,432 in FY 2022-23 and $133,632 in FY 2023-24 and 
ongoing, as shown in Table 2 and detailed below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 22-1158 
 
 	FY 2022-23 FY 2023-24 
Personnel Costs 	$129,932 	$129,932 
Operating Costs 	$3,700 	$3,700 
Capital Outlay 	$12,800 	- 
Total Cost 	$146,432 	$133,632 
   
University of Colorado at Colorado Springs.  The CARE Center will have the following costs. 
 
 Personnel costs.  Annual staffing costs include fringe benefits calculated at UCCS' federally 
negotiated rate of 30.7 percent for faculty and 38.5 percent for university staff, and include: a 
full-time program director at a cost of $81,715; one summer month per year for two associate 
directors at a cost of $38,917; a graduate assistant at a cost of $6,300; and faculty payments for 
clinical supervision of counselors-in-training at $6,000 per year. 
 
 Operating costs.  Operating costs include a $2,500 annual software fee for electronic health records 
access and a telehealth platform, and $1,200 for assessments and office supplies. 
 
 Capital outlay.  In FY 2022-23, the center requires $5,000 in one-time furnishings costs, and $7,800 
for computers, which are expected to be replaced on a four-year cycle. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve beginning in FY 2022-23.  Based 
on this fiscal note, the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the 
amounts shown in Table 1, which will decrease the amount of General Fund available for other 
purposes.  Page 3 
February 14, 2022  HB 22-1158  
 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires an appropriation of $146,432 to the Department of Higher Education 
to be distributed to the University of Colorado at Colorado Springs. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Higher Education  Human Services 
Information Technology Municipalities 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.