Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1209 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/28/2022

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-third General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REVISED
This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted
on Second Reading in the Second House
LLS NO. 22-0333.01 Jane Ritter x4342
HOUSE BILL 22-1209
House Committees Senate Committees
Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Health & Human Services
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING THE CONTINUATION OF THE STRATEGIC ACTION101
PLANNING GROUP ON AGING , AND, IN CONNECTION THEREWITH ,102
IMPLEMENTING THE RECOMME NDATION CONTAINED IN THE103
2021
 SUNSET REPORT BY THE DEPARTMENT OF REGULATORY104
AGENCIES TO SUNSET THE STRA TEGIC ACTION PLANNING GROUP105
ON AGING.106
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov/
.)
Sunset Process - House Public and Behavioral Health and
SENATE
Amended 2nd Reading
March 28, 2022
HOUSE
3rd Reading Unamended
March 9, 2022
HOUSE
2nd Reading Unamended
March 8, 2022
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Bradfield and Young, Amabile, Michaelson Jenet, Pelton, Bird, Bockenfeld, Cutter,
Duran, Esgar, Exum, Froelich, Gray, Herod, Hooton, Jodeh, Kennedy, Lindsay, Lontine,
McCluskie, Titone, Valdez A., Valdez D.
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Woodward, 
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing statute.
Dashes through the words indicate deletions from existing statute. Human Services Committee. The bill implements the recommendation
of the department of regulatory agencies' sunset review and report
concerning the strategic action planning group on aging by repealing the
planning group.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-32-3407, amend
2
(2) as follows:3
24-32-3407.  Strategic action plan on aging cash fund. (2)  The4
state treasurer may invest any moneys MONEY in the fund not expended5
for the purpose of this part 34 as provided by law. The state treasurer6
shall credit all interest and income derived from the investment and7
deposit of moneys MONEY in the fund to the fund. Any unexpended and8
unencumbered moneys MONEY remaining in the fund at the end of a fiscal9
year remain in the fund and shall not be credited or transferred to the10
general fund or another fund AS OF JUNE 30, 2022, SHALL BE11
TRANSFERRED TO THE OLDER COLORADANS CASH FUND , CREATED IN12
SECTION 26-11-205.5 (5). MONEY TRANSFERRED TO THE OLDER13
C
OLORADANS CASH FUND PURSUANT TO THIS SUBSECTION (2) MAY BE
14
USED BY THE DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE COLORADO15
COMMISSION ON AGING TO IMPLEMENT THE RECOMMENDATIONS MADE BY16
THE STRATEGIC ACTION PLANNING GROUP ON AGING , AS THAT GROUP17
EXISTED PRIOR TO JULY 1, 2022.18
SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 2-3-1203, repeal19
(13)(a)(II) as follows:20
2-3-1203.  Sunset review of advisory committees - legislative21
declaration - definition - repeal. (13) (a)  The following statutory22
authorizations for the designated advisory committees are scheduled for23
1209-2- repeal on September 1, 2022:1
(II)  The strategic action planning group on aging created in2
section 24-32-3404, C.R.S.;3
SECTION 3. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 26-11-101, amend4
as amended by House Bill 22-1035 (1)(a) introductory portion as5
follows:6
26-11-101.  Commission on aging - created - definition.7
(1) (a)  There is created in the state department the Colorado commission8
on aging, referred to in this article 11 as the "commission", for the9
purpose of coordinating and guiding the implementation of the strategic10
action plan on aging, developed pursuant to section 24-32-3406, 
AS THAT
11
SECTION EXISTED PRIOR TO JUNE 30, 2022, and other strategies the12
commission may identify that support older Coloradans. The commission13
shall consist of nineteen members who must be appointed as follows: 14
SECTION 4. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 26-11-102, amend15
as amended by House Bill 22-1035 (2)(a) introductory portion as16
follows:17
26-11-102.  Organization of commission. (2) (a)  The18
commission may establish standing subcommittees to support the19
implementation of the strategic action plan on aging, developed pursuant20
to section 24-32-3406, 
AS THAT SECTION EXISTED PRIOR TO JUNE 30, 2022,
21
and work related to the lifelong Colorado initiative established in part 322
of this article 11. The subcommittee topics may include, but are not23
limited to:24
SECTION 5. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 26-11-105, amend25
as amended by House Bill 22-1035 (1)(b) and (1)(g) as follows:26
26-11-105.  Duties of commission - report. (1)  The commission,27
1209
-3- through its executive committee described in section 26-11-102 (1); in1
coordination with the state department liaison to the commission,2
appointed pursuant to section 26-11-104; and in coordination with3
independent staff, contracted pursuant to section 26-11-104, shall carry4
out the following duties:5
(b)  Coordinate and implement the strategic action plan on aging6
recommendations, developed pursuant to section 24-32-3406, 
AS THAT
7
SECTION EXISTED PRIOR TO JUNE 30, 2022, and additional8
recommendations the commission makes;9
(g)  Review existing policies and programs across state agencies,10
and on or before September 1, 2023, and on or before September 1 each11
year thereafter, draft an annual report of issues and recommendations12
developed by the commission that support the implementation of13
strategies in alignment with the strategic action plan on aging developed14
pursuant to section 24-32-3406, 
AS THAT SECTION EXISTED PRIOR TO JUNE
15
30,
 2022, the lifelong Colorado initiative created pursuant to section
16
26-11-302, and other recommendations that the commission makes. The17
commission shall submit the annual report to the governor, executive18
directors of impacted agencies, and the general assembly.19
SECTION 6. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 26-11-203, amend20
as amended by House Bill 22-1035 (1)(k) and (1)(l) as follows:21
26-11-203.  Duties of the state office. (1)  In addition to such22
other duties and functions as the executive director may allocate to the23
state office, the state office shall have the following duties and functions:24
(k)  To convene and coordinate a technical advisory committee25
comprised of key state department representatives, including but not26
limited to the department of human services, department of labor and27
1209
-4- employment, department of higher education, department of health care1
policy and financing, department of transportation, department of public2
health and environment, and department of local affairs, to direct the3
implementation of recommendations and strategies provided in the4
strategic action plan on aging developed pursuant to section 24-32-3406,5
AS THAT SECTION EXISTED PRIOR TO JUNE 30, 2022, and recommendations6
the commission makes as set forth in section 26-11-105; and7
(l)  To coordinate with the technical advisory committee and8
commission to develop, maintain, and make publicly available on the9
state department's website a collection of available data sets; metrics10
specific to the implementation of strategies in alignment with the strategic11
action plan on aging developed pursuant to section 24-32-3406, 
AS THAT
12
SECTION EXISTED PRIOR TO JUNE 30, 2022, and the lifelong Colorado13
initiative created pursuant to section 26-11-302; and other14
recommendations that the commission makes as set forth in section15
26-11-105.16
SECTION 7. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 26-11-301, amend17
as added by House Bill 22-1035 (4) as follows:18
26-11-301.  Definitions. As used in this part 3, unless the context19
otherwise requires:20
(4)  "Strategic action plan on aging" means the strategic action21
plan on aging developed pursuant to section 24-32-3406, 
AS THAT
22
SECTION EXISTED PRIOR TO JUNE 30, 2022.23
SECTION 8. Effective date. (1)  Except as other otherwise24
provided in subsection (2) of this section, this act takes effect upon25
passage.26
(2)  Sections (2), (3), (4), (5), (6), and (7) of this act take effect27
1209
-5- only if House Bill 22-1035 becomes law, in which case sections (2), (3),1
(4), (5), (6), and (7) take effect upon the effective date of this act or the2
effective date of House Bill 22-1035, whichever is later.3
SECTION 9.  Safety clause. The general assembly hereby finds,4
determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate5
preservation of the public peace, health, or safety.6
1209
-6-