Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1210 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/21/2022

                    Page 1 
February 18, 2022   HB 22-1210  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0326  
Rep. Benavidez; Duran 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
February 18, 2022  
House Judiciary  
Matt Bishop | 303-866-4796 
Matt.Bishop@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: SUNSET DOMESTIC VIOLENCE MANAGEMENT BOARD  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☒ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
Sunset Bill.  This bill continues the Domestic Violence Offender Management Board in 
the Department of Public Safety, which is scheduled to repeal on September 1, 2022. 
State fiscal impacts include both increased expenditures from changes to the program 
under the bill, as well as the continuation of the program's current revenue and 
expenditures.  The program is continued through September 1, 2033. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires an appropriation of $51,703 to the Department of 
Public Safety. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 22-1210
1
 
 
New Impacts 
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue 
 
-       -       
Expenditures 	General Fund $51,703 $60,581       
 	Centrally Appropriated $17,890 $22,234 
 	Total New Expenditures $69,593 $82,815 
 	New FTE 0.8 FTE       1.0 FTE 
Other Budget Impacts 	General Fund Reserve $7,755 $9,087 
 
Continuing Impacts   
Revenue 	Cash Funds -       $29,744 
Expenditures 	General Fund and Cash Funds -       $359,518 
 	Continuing FTE -       2.9 FTE        
1
 Table 1 shows the new impacts resulting from changes to the program under the bill and the continuing impacts 
from extending the program beyond its current repeal date.  The continuing program impacts will end if the bill is 
not passed and the program is allowed to repeal.   Page 2 
February 18, 2022   HB 22-1210  
 
Summary of Legislation 
This sunset bill continues the Domestic Violence Offender Management Board in the Department of 
Public Safety (CDPS) until September 1, 2033.  It is currently scheduled to repeal on September 1, 2022.  
The bill also implements two recommendations from the sunset report.  First, the board must conduct 
compliance reviews on at least five percent of approved treatment providers each year.  Second, the 
bill updates background check requirements in statute to conform to current practice. 
Background 
When an adult is convicted of a crime involving domestic violence, that person is required to complete 
domestic violence treatment, unless sentenced to the Department of Corrections. The Domestic 
Violence Offender Management Board develops and maintains standards for the evaluation and 
treatment of domestic violence offenders, develops processes to approve treatment providers, and 
analyzes the effectives of evaluation and treatment standards.  Treatment providers pay a fee to apply 
for placement on the approved provider list.  While this fee revenue defrays a portion of the board’s 
operating costs, most of the its funding comes from the General Fund.  For more information on the 
board’s duties and activities, see the sunset report compiled by the Department of Regulatory 
Agencies at https://coprrr.colorado.gov/archive-of-reviews. 
Continuing Program Impacts 
Based on the department's FY 2021-22 budget request, the Department of Public Safety is expected to 
have revenue of about $30,000 and expenditures of about $360,000 to administer the board.  If this bill 
is enacted, current revenue and expenditures will continue for the program starting in FY 2023-24.  
This continuing revenue is subject to the state TABOR limits.  If this bill is not enacted, the program 
will end on September 1, 2023, following a wind-down period, and state revenue and expenditures 
will decrease starting in FY 2023-24 by the amounts shown in Table 1.  The changes to the program 
that drive additional costs are discussed in the State Expenditures section below. 
   Page 3 
February 18, 2022   HB 22-1210  
 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in CDPS by $69,593 in FY 2022-23 and $82,815 in FY 2023-24 from 
the General Fund.  Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 22-1210 
 
 	FY 2022-23 FY 2023-24 
Department of Public Safety   
Personal Services 	$44,423 $59,231 
Operating Expenses 	$1,080        $1,350 
Capital Outlay Costs 	$6,200        -       
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$17,890        $22,234       
Total Cost $69,593 $82,815 
Total FTE 0.8 FTE 1.0 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
   
Department of Public Safety.  The bill requires the department to additional compliance checks each 
year.  Because the sunset report notes that the department has not kept up with checks as currently 
required, the fiscal note estimates that the bill requires 1.0 FTE in additional staff to communicate with 
stakeholders, conduct the additional compliance checks, and follow up on compliance outcomes.  
Expenditures are prorated for the bill’s effective date and account for the General Fund pay date shift 
in FY 2022-23.  
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated 
with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long 
Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These costs, which include employee 
insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 2. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve beginning in FY 2022-23.  Based 
on the new appropriations estimated in the fiscal note, the bill is expected to increase the amount of 
General Fund held in reserve by the amounts in Table 1, which will decrease the amount of General 
Fund available for other purposes. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming no 
referendum petition is filed.  Page 4 
February 18, 2022   HB 22-1210  
 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires a General Fund appropriation of $51,703 to the Department of Public 
Safety, and 0.8 FTE. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Information Technology Law  
Public Safety  Regulatory Agencies 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.