Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1221 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/24/2022

                    Page 1 
February 23, 2022  HB 22-1221  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0366  
Rep. Michaelson Jenet 
Sen. Fields  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
February 23, 2022 
House HHS  
Erin Reynolds | 303-866-4146 
Erin.Reynolds@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: COUNTY CORONER & MORTUARY MENTAL HEALTH PROGRAM  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☒ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates the County Coroner and Mortuary Mental Health and Wellness 
Program in the Behavioral Health Administration to provide mental health services to 
county coroner offices, funeral directors, and mortuary science practitioners where 
existing health insurance plans do not include coverage. From FY 2022-23 to 
FY 2029-30, the bill increases state expenditures and may increase state revenue. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires an appropriation of $197,214 to the Department of 
Human Services 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 22-1221 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue 
 
-       	-       
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$197,214 	$261,664 
 	Centrally Appropriated 	$16,829 	$17,449 
 	Total Expenditures 	$214,043 	$279,113 
 	Total FTE 	1.0 FTE 	1.0 FTE 
Transfers  	-       	-       
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$29,582 	$39,250 
 
 
 
   Page 2 
February 23, 2022  HB 22-1221  
 
Summary of Legislation 
By January 31, 2023, the bill requires the Behavioral Health Administration (BHA) to administer or 
contract for the administration of the County Coroner and Mortuary Mental Health and Wellness 
Program.  The program will provide mental health and wellness services to county coroners and their 
staff, volunteers as determined by a county coroner, funeral directors, and mortuary science 
practitioners where existing health insurance does not include these services, or where the person has 
no health insurance.  Funeral directors and mortuary science practitioners that request to participate 
in the program must have their employer pay the actual costs of services if not covered by the 
employer health insurance plan. The BHA may conduct rulemaking as necessary.   
 
The BHA is required to provide program information to eligible individuals by April 1, 2023.  The 
program repeals on September 1, 2029, pending a sunset review. 
State Revenue 
State revenue to the BHA will increase to the extent that funeral directors and mortuary science 
practitioners participate in the program and pay for services.  The revenue amount has not been 
estimated.  This revenue is subject to TABOR.   
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the Department of Human Services by $214,043 in FY 2022-23 
and $279,113 in FY 2023-24 from the General Fund.  Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed 
below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 22-1221 
 
 	FY 2022-23 FY 2023-24 
Department of Human Services   
Personal Services 	$75,914 $82,814  
Operating Expenses 	$1,350 $1,350  
Capital Outlay Costs 	$6,200  
Contract Program Services 	$63,750 $127,500  
Marketing, Education, and Outreach 	$50,000 $50,000  
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$16,829 $17,449  
Total Cost $214,043  $279,113  
Total FTE 1.0 FTE 1.0 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
   
  Page 3 
February 23, 2022  HB 22-1221  
 
Department of Human Services —Behavioral Health Administration. The bill increases 
expenditures in the BHA to procure and provide mental health services for eligible individuals 
 
 Data and assumptions.  There are approximately 100 mortuaries, crematoriums, and funeral 
homes in the state licensed by the Department of Regulatory Agencies, and 63 county coroner 
offices. Assuming staffing varies at each organization, from at least 3 up to 15 employees, 
eligibility is estimated at between 492 and 2,460 individuals.  In 2019, 19.2 percent of Colorado 
adults received mental health treatment. Applying that percentage to this population, the 
program would serve between 94 and 472 individuals per year.  
 
 Staff and contractor.  Staff includes 0.5 FTE Program Management and 0.5 FTE Contracts 
Administrator.  The BHA will create a competitive solicitation process to procure a contract 
administrator to coordinate access to a licensed mental health professional at an assumed rate of 
$85,000 per year, plus 50 percent of salary for fringe and overhead costs. The mental health 
professional  will provide the required trauma-based services to county coroners and their staff, 
funeral homes and their staff, and local volunteers. First year contract costs are prorated for a 
half-year impact. First year staffing costs assume a July 1 start date and have been prorated for 
the General Fund pay date shift. 
 
 Marketing campaign.  Marketing costs, estimated at $50,000 annually, are based on past 
marketing, media, and education campaigns initiated by the Office of Behavioral Health.   
 
Department of Regulatory Agencies. The department will provide education and outreach to 
mortuaries, crematoriums and funeral home licensees within existing resources. 
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated 
with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long 
Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These costs, which include employee 
insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 2. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve beginning in FY 2022-23.  Based 
on this fiscal note, the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the 
amounts shown in Table 1, which will decrease the amount of General Fund available for other 
purposes. 
Local Government  
County coroner office staff, who are eligible to receive services under the program, may have an 
increase in workload to communicate staff and volunteer eligibility with the BHA. 
 
   Page 4 
February 23, 2022  HB 22-1221  
 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2022-23, the Behavioral Health Administration in the Department of Human Services requires 
a General Fund appropriation of $197,214 with 1.0 FTE 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Counties County Coroners 
Human Services Information Technology 
Law  Personnel  
Public Health and Environment Regulatory Agencies  
Treasury 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.