Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1228 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/22/2022

                    Page 1 
February 22, 2022   HB 22-1228  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0324  
Rep. Roberts; Bockenfeld 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
February 22, 2022 
House Judiciary  
Annie Scott | 303-866-5851 
Annie.Scott@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: SUNSET CONTINUE REGULATE PRENEED FUNERAL CONTRACTS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☒ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
Sunset Bill.  This bill continues the regulation of preneed funeral contracts in the 
Department of Regulatory Agencies, which is scheduled to repeal on 
September 1, 2022.  State fiscal impacts include a possible increase in revenue and 
expenditures from changes to the program under the bill, and the continuation of the 
program's current revenue and expenditures.  The program is continued through 
September 1, 2029. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 22-1228
1
 
 
New Impacts 
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue 	Cash Funds 	-       	-       
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	-       	-       
 	New FTE 	-       	-       
Other Budget Impacts 
 
-       	-       
 
Continuing Impacts   
Revenue 	Cash Funds 	-       $52,200       
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	-       $19,732       
 	Continuing FTE 	-       0.3 FTE       
1
 Table 1 shows the new impacts resulting from changes to the program under the bill and the continuing impacts 
from extending the program beyond its current repeal date.  The continuing program impacts will end if the bill is 
not passed and the program is allowed to repeal.   Page 2 
February 22, 2022   HB 22-1228  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The regulation of preneed funeral contacts by the Division of Insurance in the Department of 
Regulatory Agencies (DORA) is scheduled to repeal on September 1, 2022.  This bill continues the 
regulation until September 1, 2029, and implements recommendations in the 2021 Sunset Review. The 
bill makes several changes to the program, including: 
 
 directing the Commissioner of Insurance (commissioner) to set net worth and bond requirements 
in rule; 
 allowing the commissioner to investigate records of the seller;  
 requiring that fees be set by the commissioner based on the cost of regulating the industry; 
 requiring that unused funds be transferred to the Unclaimed Property Trust Fund; and   
 requiring that funeral establishments attest as to whether they sell preneed contracts. 
Background 
Preneed funeral contracts are agreements where individuals prepay for funeral goods and services.  
The contracts can be backed by a trust or a life insurance policy.  Contracts are sold by funeral homes, 
brokers, or life insurance agents.  Applicants for licensure pay a $500 licensing fee, show proof of their 
net worth or post a surety bond, and complete a fingerprint-based criminal history background check.  
Renewal fees range from $100 to $2,000 based on the aggregate preneed contract price outstanding.  
As of December 31, 2020, there were 68 licensees representing a total amount of outstanding preneed 
contracts of $246,535,326. 
 
To review the 2021 Sunset Review, see:  
https://drive.google.com/file/d/1t55Rc1eUWaFHC-d1VLcW6sxXC-PaxvW_/view 
Continuing Program Impacts 
Based on the 2021 Sunset Review of Preneed Funeral Contracts, DORA is expected to have annual 
revenue of $52,200 and expenditures of $19,732 to administer the preneed funeral contracts program.  
If this bill is enacted, current revenue and expenditures will continue for the program starting in 
FY 2023-24.  This continuing revenue is subject to the state TABOR limits.  If this bill is not enacted, 
the program will end on September 1, 2023, following a wind-down period, and state revenue and 
expenditures will decrease starting in FY 2023-24 by the amounts shown in Table 1.  The impact from 
the changes to the program are discussed in the State Revenue and Expenditures section below. 
State Revenue and Expenditures 
Although the bill allows the commissioner to set fees, no fee increase has been estimated. The bill may 
increase funds sent to the Unclaimed Property Trust Fund.  The bill will increase workload in DORA 
related to rulemaking, investigations and administration, but this is not expected to require additional 
appropriations.   
   Page 3 
February 22, 2022   HB 22-1228  
 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming no 
referendum petition is filed. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Information Technology Regulatory Agencies  Treasury 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.