Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1228 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/21/2022

                    Page 1 
March 21, 2022  HB 22-1228  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated February 22, 2022)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0324  
Rep. Roberts; Bockenfeld 
Sen. Coram  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
March 21, 2022 
Senate Judiciary 
Annie Scott | 303-866-5851 
Annie.Scott@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: SUNSET CONTINUE REGULATE PRENEED FUNERAL CONTRACTS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☒ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
Sunset Bill.  This bill continues the regulation of preneed funeral contracts in the 
Department of Regulatory Agencies, which is scheduled to repeal on 
September 1, 2022.  State fiscal impacts include an increase in revenue and 
expenditures from changes to the program under the bill, and the continuation of the 
program's current revenue and expenditures.  The program is continued through 
September 1, 2029. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires an appropriation of $81,958 to the Department of 
Regulatory Agencies.   
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The revised fiscal note reflects the reengrossed bill.  
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 22-1228
1
 
 
New Impacts 
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue 	Cash Funds 	$105,560       $106,600       
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	$81,958        $81,596        
 	Centrally Appropriated 	$23,492 	$24,971 
 	Total Expenditures 	$105,450 	$106,567 
 	Total FTE 	0.9 FTE        1.0 FTE        
Other Budget Impacts TABOR Refund 	$105,560       $106,600       
 
Continuing Impacts   
Revenue 	Cash Funds 	-       $52,200        
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	-       $20,051        
 	Continuing FTE 	-       0.3 FTE        
1
 Table 1 shows the new impacts resulting from changes to the program under the bill and the continuing impacts 
from extending the program beyond its current repeal date.  The continuing program impacts will end if the bill is 
not passed and the program is allowed to repeal.   Page 2 
March 21, 2022  HB 22-1228  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The regulation of preneed funeral contacts by the Division of Insurance (DOI) in the Department of 
Regulatory Agencies (DORA) is scheduled to repeal on September 1, 2022.  This bill continues the 
regulation until September 1, 2029, and implements recommendations in the 2021 Sunset Review. The 
bill makes several changes to the program, including: 
 
 directing the Commissioner of Insurance (commissioner) to set net worth and bond requirements 
in rule; 
 allowing the commissioner to investigate records of the seller;  
 requiring that fees be set by the commissioner based on the cost of regulating the industry; 
 requiring that unclaimed funds be transferred to the Unclaimed Property Trust Fund; and   
 requiring that funeral establishments attest as to whether they sell preneed contracts. 
Background 
Preneed funeral contracts are agreements where individuals prepay for funeral goods and services.  
The contracts can be backed by a trust or a life insurance policy.  Contracts are sold by funeral homes, 
brokers, or life insurance agents (sellers).  Applicants for licensure to sell preneed funeral contracts 
pay a $500 licensing fee, show proof of their net worth or post a surety bond, and complete a 
fingerprint-based criminal history background check.  Renewal fees range from $100 to $2,000 based 
on the aggregate preneed contract price outstanding.  As of December 31, 2020, there were 68 licensees 
representing a total amount of outstanding preneed contracts of $246,535,326. 
 
To review the 2021 Sunset Review, see:  
https://drive.google.com/file/d/1t55Rc1eUWaFHC-d1VLcW6sxXC-PaxvW_/view 
Continuing Program Impacts 
Based on the 2021 Sunset Review of Preneed Funeral Contracts, DORA is expected to have annual 
revenue of $52,200 and expenditures of $20,051 to administer the preneed funeral contracts program.  
If this bill is enacted, current revenue and expenditures will continue for the program starting in 
FY 2023-24.  This continuing revenue is subject to the state TABOR limits.  If this bill is not enacted, 
the program will end on September 1, 2023, following a wind-down period, and state revenue and 
expenditures will decrease starting in FY 2023-24 by the amounts shown in Table 1.  The impact from 
the changes to the program are discussed in the State Revenue and Expenditures sections below. 
Assumptions 
This fiscal note assumes that the bill will generate approximately 193 new applications from sellers 
with multiple locations.  Though sellers are currently allowed to file applications that include multiple 
locations, under the bill each seller will be required to file an application for each location beginning 
in FY 2022-23 to enable increased monitoring.  It is also assumed that proactive monitoring is allowed 
under the bill, a change from current law, under which monitoring is performed only at the time of a 
complaint or other indication of noncompliance     Page 3 
March 21, 2022  HB 22-1228  
 
State Revenue 
Fee impact on pre-need funeral contract sellers. Colorado law requires legislative service agency 
review of measures which create or increase any fee collected by a state agency.  These fee amounts 
are estimates only, actual fees will be set administratively by DORA based on cash fund balance, 
estimated program costs, and the estimated number of licenses subject to the fee.  Current fees 
are based on a tiered system and only apply to the 67 licensees that exist under current law. It is 
assumed that the current fee structure will remain in place for current licensees and will apply to new 
licensees under the bill until rulemaking takes place to set a new fee structure that will reflect the 
updated costs to regulate the industry.  It is assumed that an average fee of $406 in FY 2022-23 and 
$410 in FY 2023-24 will be required, equating to annual revenue of $105,560 in FY 2022-23 and $106,600 
in FY 2023-24.   
 
In addition, the bill may increase funds sent to the Unclaimed Property Trust Fund.   
State Expenditures 
The bill increases cash fund expenditures in DORA by $105,450 in FY 2022-23 and $106,567 in 
FY 2023-24 from the Division of Insurance Cash Fund.  Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed 
below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 22-1228 
 
Cost Components 	FY 2022-23 FY 2023-24 
Department of Regulatory Agencies               
Personal Services 	$74,543  $80,246  
Operating Expenses 	$1,215  $1,350  
Capital Outlay Costs 	$6,200  	-  
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$23,492  $24,971  
Total $105,450 $106,567 
Total FTE 0.9 FTE 1.0 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
 
Department of Regulatory Agencies.  Beginning in 2022-23, the DOI will require 0.1 FTE to complete 
the rulemaking necessary the bill.   In addition, 0.5 FTE will be required to review applications for 
compliance, and to communicate with applicants regarding discrepancies.  Proactive monitoring and 
oversight of sellers will require 0.5 FTE.  Costs are adjusted to a September 1, 2022, start date.   
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated 
with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long 
Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These costs, which include employee 
insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 2. 
  Page 4 
March 21, 2022  HB 22-1228  
 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming no 
referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
In FY 2022-23, the bill requires an appropriation of $81,858 from the Division of Insurance Cash Fund 
the Department of Regulatory Agencies, and 0.9 FTE. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Information Technology Regulatory Agencies    Treasury 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.