Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1230 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 05/05/2022

                    Page 1  
May 4, 2022  HB 22-1230  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated February 23, 2022)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0394  
Rep. Duran; Exum 
Sen. Fields; Priola  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
May 4, 2022 
Senate Appropriations 
Erin Reynolds | 303-866-4146 
Erin.Reynolds@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: EMPLOYMENT SUPPORT AND JOB RETENTION SERVICES  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☒ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill expands and extends the Employment Support and Job Retention Program in 
the Department of Labor and Employment through September 2029.  Beginning in 
FY 2022-23, it creates an ongoing state transfer and increases state expenditures.   
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2022-23, the bill includes an appropriation of $250,000 to the Department of 
Labor and Employment. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The revised fiscal note reflects the reengrossed bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 22-1230 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	$250,000  	$250,000  
 	Centrally Appropriated 	$8,309  	$8,309  
 	Total Expenditures 	$258,309  	$258,309  
 	Total FTE 	0.5 FTE 	0.5 FTE 
Transfers
1
 	General Fund ($250,000) ($250,000) 
 	Cash Funds 	$250,000  	$250,000  
 	Net Transfer 	$0  	$0  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$37,500  	$37,500  
1
 The bill transfers $250,000 per year to the Employment Support and Job Retention Program Cash Fund via a required 
appropriation from the General Fund. 
   Page 2  
May 4, 2022  HB 22-1230  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
This bill expands and extends until September 1, 2029, the Employment Support and Job Retention 
program in the Department of Labor and Employment (CDLE).  The bill expands the types of 
organizations that may provide the services of the program, changes the eligibility criteria, modifies 
the reporting requirements, and requires an annual appropriation of $250,000 to the Employment 
Support and Job Retention Services Program Cash Fund. 
Background 
House Bill 19-1107 created the Employment Support and Job Retention Services Program in the CDLE, 
which was set to expire at the end of this fiscal year.  The program provides funding for employment 
preparation and pursuit, job training, and job retention.  CDLE developed a competitive solicitation 
process to contract with an outside nonprofit entity to administer the program. 
State Transfers 
The bill transfers $250,000 from the General Fund to the Employment Support and Job Retention 
Program Cash Fund in FY 2022-23 and each fiscal year thereafter.  This transfer is made via an 
appropriation from the General Fund to the cash fund. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the CDLE by $258,309 beginning in FY 2022-23 and ongoing 
from the Employment Support and Job Retention Program Cash Fund. Expenditures are shown in 
Table 2 and detailed below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 22-1230 
 
 	FY 2022-23 FY 2023-24 
Department of Labor and Employment   
Personal Services 	$36,785  $36,785  
Operating Expenses 	$675  $675  
Program Funding 	$212,540  $212,540  
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$8,309  $8,309  
Total Cost $258,309  $258,309  
Total FTE 0.5 FTE 0.5 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
 
   Page 3  
May 4, 2022  HB 22-1230  
 
 
Program funding. The bill appropriates $250,000 annually to the Employment Support and Job 
Retention Services program Cash Fund.  The funds are allocated to various organizations that meet 
the requirements of the program through a competitive selection process designed by the CDLE.   
 
Staffing.  The program currently has a grant specialist that oversees and administers the existing 
program.  This position, which is scheduled to expire under current law, will be continued under the 
bill.  Standard operating and capital outlay costs are included for this staff. 
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated 
with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long 
Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These costs, which include employee 
insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 2. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve beginning in FY 2022-23.   
Based on this fiscal note, the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve 
by the amounts in Table 1, which will decrease the amount of General Fund available for other 
purposes.  
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2022. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2022-23, the bill includes an appropriation of $250,000 from the General Fund to the 
Employment Support and Job Retention Program Cash Fund, which is further appropriated to the 
CDLE with 0.5 FTE.   
State and Local Government Contacts 
Counties Information Technology Labor 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.